Hector Aceves v. Printograph, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Hector Aceves
Defendant: Printograph, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv10226
Filed: November 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Pedro V Castillo
Referring Judge: Fernando M Olguin
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: STIPULATION TO SUBMIT TO ARBIRATION by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Based on the parties' Stipulation to Submit Matter to Binding Arbitration #10 , IT IS ORDERED THAT this action is stayed pending the completion of the arbitration. The Clerk shall administratively close the case. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (iv)
December 16, 2020 Filing 10 STIPULATION to Stay Case pending Completion of Arbitration filed by Defendant Printograph, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Rothrock, Aaron)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Scheduling Conference set for 2/11/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (vdr)
November 20, 2020 Filing 8 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 10, 2020 Filing 7 Certificate of Service Re: Notice of Removal and Related Documents filed by Defendant Printograph, Inc. (Rothrock, Aaron)
November 10, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
November 10, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (car)
November 6, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Printograph, Inc. Filed in State Court on 11/4/2020 Submitted with Attachment 3 Exhibit C to Notice of Removal #1 .(car)
November 6, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff Hector Aceves, upon Defendant Printograph, Inc. served on 9/29/2020, answer due 10/20/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Sonik Artounian Agent for Service of Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. Filed in State Court on 9/30/2020 Submitted with Attachment 2 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
November 6, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Printograph, Inc. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Hector Aceves. Filed in State Court on 9/16/2020 Submitted with Attachment 1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
November 6, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Printograph, Inc., identifying Printograph, Inc.; Hector Aceves; and Travelers Bond & Specialty Insurance. (Rothrock, Aaron)
November 6, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Printograph, Inc. (Rothrock, Aaron)
November 6, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Printograph, Inc.. (Rothrock, Aaron)
November 6, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 20STCV35404 Receipt No: ACACDC-28895232 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Printograph, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H) (Attorney Aaron M Rothrock added to party Printograph, Inc.(pty:dft))(Rothrock, Aaron)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hector Aceves v. Printograph, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Printograph, Inc.
Represented By: Aaron M Rothrock
Represented By: John A Haubrich
Represented By: John L Barber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hector Aceves
Represented By: Sheena Barzi Tehrani
Represented By: Neama Rahmani
Represented By: Ronald Leornardo Zambrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?