Daniel Snyder v. Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: DANIEL SNYDER and VANKA SNYDER
Defendant: Venture Travel, LLC, doing business as TAQUAN AIR, Mountain Air Service, LLC doing business as Mountain Air, Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd., doing business as Princess Cruises, Venture Travel, LLC doing business as Taquan Air and Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd. doing business as Princess Cruises
Case Number: 2:2020cv10276
Filed: November 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Chooljian
Referring Judge: Christina A Snyder
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 8, 2020 Filing 13 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendants Mountain Air Service, LLC, Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd., Venture Travel, LLC. (shb)
December 7, 2020 Filing 12 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Daniel Snyder, Vanka Snyder. (Llinas Negret, Carlos)
November 23, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE TO COUNSEL upon filing of the complaint by Judge Christina A. Snyder. (rba)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:20-cv-10274 CAS (JCx). Case transferred from Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim to Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-10276 CAS (JCx). Signed by Judge Christina A. Snyder (esa)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Douglas Latto to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Daniel Snyder, designating Carlos Llimas Negret as local counsel #8 . (iv)
November 13, 2020 Filing 8 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Douglas A. Latto to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Daniel Snyder, Vanka Snyder (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-29013343) filed by Plaintiff Daniel Snyder, Vanka Snyder. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Llinas Negret, Carlos)
November 12, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Jeanne M O'Grady. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (car)
November 12, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Douglas A Latto. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (car)
November 12, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Daniel D Barks. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (car)
November 12, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (car)
November 10, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff DANIEL SNYDER, VANKA SNYDER, (Llinas Negret, Carlos)
November 9, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs DANIEL SNYDER, VANKA SNYDER. (Llinas Negret, Carlos)
November 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-28933981 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff DANIEL SNYDER, VANKA SNYDER. (Attorney Carlos Felipe Llinas Negret added to party DANIEL SNYDER(pty:pla), Attorney Carlos Felipe Llinas Negret added to party VANKA SNYDER(pty:pla))(Llinas Negret, Carlos)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Daniel Snyder v. Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANIEL SNYDER
Represented By: Carlos Felipe Llinas Negret
Represented By: Daniel D Barks
Represented By: Gretchen M Nelson
Represented By: Stuart R Fraenkel
Represented By: Jeanne M O'Grady
Represented By: Douglas A. Latto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VANKA SNYDER
Represented By: Carlos Felipe Llinas Negret
Represented By: Daniel D Barks
Represented By: Gretchen M Nelson
Represented By: Stuart R Fraenkel
Represented By: Jeanne M O'Grady
Represented By: Douglas A. Latto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Venture Travel, LLC, doing business as TAQUAN AIR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mountain Air Service, LLC doing business as Mountain Air
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd., doing business as Princess Cruises
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Venture Travel, LLC doing business as Taquan Air
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd. doing business as Princess Cruises
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?