Antonio Fernandez v. Dagwood Property Investments, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Antonio Fernandez
Defendant: Dagwood Property Investments, LLC and Tocayo Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv10526
Filed: November 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andre Birotte
Referring Judge: Charles F Eick
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER DISMISSING CIVIL ACTION by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. THE COURT has been advised by counsel that the above-entitled action has been settled #13 . IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that this action is hereby dismissed without costs and without prejudice to the right, upon good cause shown within 60 days, to reopen the action if settlement is not consummated. This Court retains full jurisdiction over this action and this Order shall not prejudice any party to this action. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (iv)
January 5, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Settlement and request to vacate all currently set dates filed by plaintiff Antonio Fernandez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Seabock, Amanda)
December 22, 2020 Filing 12 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Tocayo Solutions, Inc. answer now due 1/29/2021; Dagwood Property Investments, LLC answer now due 1/29/2021, filed by Attorney for Defendants Tocayo Solutions, Inc.; Dagwood Property Investments, LLC.(Attorney Rex T Reeves added to party Dagwood Property Investments, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Rex T Reeves added to party Tocayo Solutions, Inc.(pty:dft))(Reeves, Rex)
December 10, 2020 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez, upon Defendant Tocayo Solutions, Inc. served on 12/10/2020, answer due 12/31/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jasmine Acosta- Person In Charge in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Handy, Russell)
December 10, 2020 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez, upon Defendant Dagwood Property Investments, LLC served on 12/10/2020, answer due 12/31/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Maria Banuelos- Aunt/Person In Charge in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Handy, Russell)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
November 23, 2020 Filing 8 Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (cb)
November 20, 2020 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Dagwood Property Investments, LLC, Tocayo Solutions, Inc.. (car)
November 20, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
November 20, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (car)
November 18, 2020 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Antonio Fernandez. (Handy, Russell)
November 18, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Antonio Fernandez, (Handy, Russell)
November 18, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez. (Handy, Russell)
November 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-29071939 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Antonio Fernandez. (Attorney Russell C Handy added to party Antonio Fernandez(pty:pla))(Handy, Russell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Antonio Fernandez v. Dagwood Property Investments, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dagwood Property Investments, LLC
Represented By: Larry Scott Karlin
Represented By: Michael Joseph Karlin
Represented By: Rex T Reeves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tocayo Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Larry Scott Karlin
Represented By: Michael Joseph Karlin
Represented By: Rex T Reeves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Fernandez
Represented By: Russell C Handy
Represented By: Dennis Jay Price, II
Represented By: Raymond George Ballister, Jr
Represented By: Amanda Lockhart Seabock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?