Brian Whitaker v. Prime Oil Management, L.L.C. et al
Plaintiff: Brian Whitaker
Defendant: Prime Oil Management, L.L.C. and Sinaco Oil 2 Corporation
Case Number: 2:2020cv10649
Filed: November 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael W Fitzgerald
Referring Judge: John E McDermott
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 20, 2021 Filing 17 DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Sinaco Oil 2 Corporation. (iv)
January 19, 2021 Filing 16 REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against defendant Sinaco Oil 2 Corporation filed by plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proof of Service) (Gutierrez, Faythe)
January 8, 2021 Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker, upon Defendant Sinaco Oil 2 Corporation served on 12/18/2020, answer due 1/8/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Hugo Cruz. (Cashier ) in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Handy, Russell)
January 6, 2021 Filing 14 DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Prime Oil Management, L.L.C. (iv)
January 5, 2021 Filing 13 REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against defendant Prime Oil Management, L.L.C. filed by plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proof of Service) (Gutierrez, Faythe)
January 5, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Faythe Elizabeth Gutierrez on behalf of Plaintiff Brian Whitaker (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Attorney Faythe Elizabeth Gutierrez added to party Brian Whitaker(pty:pla))(Gutierrez, Faythe)
December 17, 2020 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker, upon Defendant Prime Oil Management, L.L.C. served on 12/3/2020, answer due 12/24/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent for Service of Process: FEREYDOON KHODADADI in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Handy, Russell)
December 13, 2020 Filing 10 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Brian Whitakerto Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,, Set/Reset Deadlines,, #9 (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration)(Handy, Russell)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SUPPLEMENTAL JURISDICTION by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Plaintiff is ORDERED to SHOW CAUSE in writing as to why this Court should exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the Unruh Act claim and the other state law claims alleged by Plaintiff. The Response shall be filed on or before DECEMBER 14, 2020. Failure to timely or adequately respond to this Order to Show Cause may, without further warning, result in the dismissal of the entire action without prejudice or the Court's declining to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the Unruh Act claim and the dismissal of that claim pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1367(c). (iv)
November 30, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE to Parties Re (ADR-20) ADA Disability Access Litigation/Application for Stay and Early Mediation: PLAINTIFF IS DIRECTED to serve the ADA Packet on Defendant(s) at the same time the summons and complaint are served, if possible. If, upon receipt of this Notice to Parties, Plaintiff has already served Defendant(s), Plaintiff must serve the ADA Packet no later than fourteen (14) days after this Notice to Parties is filed by the Court. Within three (3) days of serving Defendant(s), Plaintiff must file with the Court a proof of service indicating that the ADA Packet was served on Defendant(s). *See Notice for further details.* (smom)
November 25, 2020 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Prime Oil Management, L.L.C., Sinaco Oil 2 Corporation. (lh)
November 25, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
November 25, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (lh)
November 23, 2020 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Handy, Russell)
November 23, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker, (Handy, Russell)
November 23, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Handy, Russell)
November 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-29147937 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Attorney Russell C Handy added to party Brian Whitaker(pty:pla))(Handy, Russell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brian Whitaker v. Prime Oil Management, L.L.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prime Oil Management, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sinaco Oil 2 Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Whitaker
Represented By: Russell C Handy
Represented By: Amanda Lockhart Seabock
Represented By: Raymond George Ballister, Jr
Represented By: Dennis Jay Price, II
Represented By: Faythe Elizabeth Gutierrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?