United States of America v. $38,905.00 .00 in U.S. Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $38,905.00 .00 in U.S. Currency
Claimant: Jarquis Traonne Moss
Case Number: 2:2020cv10712
Filed: November 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Consuelo B Marshall
Referring Judge: Michael R Wilner
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:0881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2021 Filing 11 CLAIM filed by Attorney for Claimant Jarquis Traonne Moss. (Miles, Brian)
December 30, 2020 Filing 10 SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff United States of America, by Publication upon Defendant All Defendants. Publication was made in the official government website: www.forfeiture.gov for 30 consecutive days. (Schonbachler, Katharine)
December 15, 2020 Filing 9 PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN (USM-285) returned executed on 12/2/2020. Remarks: SEIZED $38,905.00 U.S. CURRENCY (20-DEA-658514) ON 12/2/20. (iv)
December 15, 2020 Filing 8 Warrant for seizure returned executed re #7 . (jp)
November 30, 2020 Filing 7 WARRANT for seizure of $38,905.00.00 in U.S. Currency issued. (jtil)
November 25, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Consuelo B. Marshall and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (jtil)
November 24, 2020 Filing 5 Memorandum by US Attorney re: Magistrate Judge Assignment filed by Plaintiff United States of America (Schonbachler, Katharine)
November 24, 2020 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM filed by Plaintiff United States of America for the purpose of determining whether the above-referenced civil matter, being filed on plaintiff, was not pending in the US Attorneys Office before the date on which Judges Andre Birotte, Jr. and Michael W. Fitzgerald began receiving civil matters. (Schonbachler, Katharine)
November 24, 2020 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Warrant for Seizure on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff United States of America. (Schonbachler, Katharine)
November 24, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Schonbachler, Katharine)
November 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT No Fee Required - US Government, filed by plaintiff United States of America. (Attorney Katharine Schonbachler added to party United States of America(pty:pla))(Schonbachler, Katharine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $38,905.00 .00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $38,905.00 .00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Katharine Schonbachler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Jarquis Traonne Moss
Represented By: Cornell LaBrun Hatcher
Represented By: Brian C Miles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?