Alyssa Mueller v. RSCR California Inc et al
Plaintiff: Alyssa Mueller
Defendant: RSCR California Inc, RCSCR California, Inc. and Does 1 through 25, inclusive
Petitioner: Res-Care
Case Number: 2:2020cv10836
Filed: November 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Alka Sagar
Referring Judge: Otis D Wright
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2020 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Alyssa Mueller, re Notice (Other) #12 served on 12-11-20. (Cohen, Sarah)
December 11, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE Order Setting Scheduling Conference filed by Plaintiff Alyssa Mueller. (Cohen, Sarah)
December 8, 2020 Filing 11 SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL [FRCP 16, 26(f)]; SCHEDULING CONFERENCE [FRCP 26(f)] by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. Scheduling Conference set for 4/5/2021 at 1:30 PM before Judge Otis D. Wright II. (iv)
December 7, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint (Discovery) #8 , Answer to Complaint (Discovery) #9 by RCSCR California, Inc. and Res-Care. The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. Other error(s) with document(s): No Certificate of Interest Parities by Defendants at the time of filing the Notice of Removal, nor to date. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
December 7, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Res-Care.(Attorney Phil J. Montoya, Jr added to party Res-Care(pty:bkmov))(Montoya, Phil)
December 7, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant RCSCR California, Inc..(Montoya, Phil)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. Counsel are STRONGLY encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information. The parties may consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge appearing on the voluntary consent list. PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. Please refer to the Judges procedures and schedules for detailed instructions for submission of sealed documents. (lc)
December 2, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: MISC - Notice of Receivership (28 USC 754), #3 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Notice was e-filed under the incorrect event. The clerk has modified the docket entry to reflect the true title of the document. No further action is required unless the Court so directs. (car)
December 2, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
December 2, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (car)
November 30, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 25, inclusive, RCSCR California, Inc. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Alyssa Mueller. Filed in State Court on 10/18/19 Submitted with pg. 15 Exhibit 1 to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
November 30, 2020 Filing 3 [DEFENDANT'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF OF REMOVAL] FILED AS NOTICE OF RECEIVERSHIP (Pursuant to 28 USC 754) with filing fee previously paid (400 paid on 11-30-20, receipt number ACACDC-29262411), filed by Defendant RSCR California Inc.(Montoya, Phil) Modified on 12/2/2020 (car).
November 30, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant RSCR California Inc. (Attachments: #1 Appendix DEFENDANTS LR 7.1-1 DISCLOSURES)(Montoya, Phil)
November 30, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles, case number 20STCV40848 Receipt No: ACACDC-29262411 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant RSCR California Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Phil Montoya, #2 Declaration Eisenmenger) (Attorney Phil J. Montoya, Jr added to party RSCR California Inc(pty:dft))(Montoya, Phil)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alyssa Mueller v. RSCR California Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alyssa Mueller
Represented By: Young W Ryu
Represented By: Alexander Wallin
Represented By: Sarah Hannah Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RSCR California Inc
Represented By: Phil J. Montoya, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RCSCR California, Inc.
Represented By: Phil J. Montoya, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 25, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Res-Care
Represented By: Phil J. Montoya, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?