Gregory Torres et al v. Honeywell, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Melinda C. Green, Gregory Torres and Samantha Walker Perry
Defendant: Honeywell TurboTechnologies, Turbo 2000 Corporation, Honeywell Engine Control Systems, Does 1-100, Inclusive, Lycoming Engines, Approved Turbo Components, Inc., Fly in Vacations, Honeywell Engines & Systems, Inc., Honeywell Aerospace, Honeywell International, Inc., Camarillo Aircraft Service, Garrett by Honeywell doing business as Garrett Airesearch doing business as Allied Corp. doing business as Allied Signal, Honeywell, Inc., Honeywell Transportation Systems, Garrett Engine Boosting Systems, Avco Corporation, Fine Line Designs, Turbo-Flight and Flitecraft Turbo Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv10879
Filed: November 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: R Gary Klausner
Referring Judge: Karen L Stevenson
Nature of Suit: Airplane Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2021 Filing 39 TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles County Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles County Superior Court - Stanley Mosk Courthouse. Case number: BC661236. (jp)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 (IN CHAMBERS) Order Re: Plaintiff's Motion to Remand and for Attorneys' Fees [DE #23 ]; Avco Corporation's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction [DE #14 ] by Judge R. Gary Klausner: the Court GRANTS Plaintiffs' Motion and remands this case to thestate court. The Court DENIES Plaintiffs' request for attorneys' fees and costs. Given the Court'sremand order, the Court DENIES as moot Avco's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (jp)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 SCHEDULING NOTICE (IN CHAMBERS) NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES AND ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Plaintiff's Motion to Remand #23 ; and Defendant AVCO Corporation's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction #14 , calendared for hearing on January 25, 2021, have been taken under submission and off the motion calendar. No appearances by counsel are necessary. The Court will issue a ruling after full consideration of properly submitted pleadings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 12, 2021 Filing 36 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by plaintiff Gregory Torres pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) with prejudice as to Garrett by Honeywell and as to Honeywell Aerospace, Honeywell Engine Control Systems, Honeywell Engines & Systems, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc., Honeywell TurboTechnologies, Honeywell, Inc.. (Loranger, Timothy)
January 11, 2021 Filing 35 REPLY in support of motion NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #23 filed by Plaintiff Gregory Torres. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael S. Miska in Support of Reply to Motion to Remand, #2 Exhibit (A) 11-9-20 Arizona Ruling, #3 Exhibit (B) 2-3-20 Minute Entry CA, #4 Exhibit (C) 9-15-20 Notice of Ruling CA, #5 Exhibit (D) Plaintiff RFPs to All Defendants 6-29-18-AZ, #6 Exhibit (E) Plaintiff RFPs to All Defendants 6-21-19, #7 Exhibit (F) Plaintiff RFP-ROGS to All Defendants 9-18-19, #8 Exhibit (G) Stipulation for Dismissal-Camarillo Aircraft Service)(Loranger, Timothy)
January 4, 2021 Filing 34 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #23 filed by Defendant Avco Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrew S. Green, #2 Exhibit 1 - 2017 0512 CA Complaint, #3 Exhibit 2 - 2019 9739 Memo ISO M to Remand Case, #4 Exhibit 3 - 2019 1004 Order re Pltfs' Motion to Remand Case, #5 Exhibit 4 - Case Summary, #6 Exhibit 5 - 2020 1109 Req for Dismiss of Approved Turbo, #7 Exhibit 6 - FL Corp Records, #8 Exhibit 7 - 2017 0512 AZ Complaint, #9 Exhibit 8 - 2019 0918 Ps' Motion to Enforce Compliance with Subpoena)(Green, Andrew)
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS APPLICATION TO CONTINUE MOTION TO DISMISS (DOC NO. 14) TO JANUARY 25, 2021 #30 by Judge R. Gary Klausner that plaintiffs application to continue the hearing of defendants' motion to dismiss (Doc #14 ) is GRANTED. The hearing is continued to 1/25/2021 at 9:00 a.m., when plaintiffs' motion for remand (Doc #23 ) is also scheduled. (jp)
December 29, 2020 Filing 32 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #14 filed by Defendant Avco Corporation. (Green, Andrew)
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER TO STRIKE ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENT(S) by Judge R. Gary Klausner: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: Reply #29 , for the following reasons: Document contains single-spaced text. LR 11-3.6 (jp)
December 29, 2020 Filing 30 APPLICATION to Continue defendants' motion to dismiss (Doc #14) from January 11, 2021 to January 25, 2021 Re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #14 filed by plaintiff Gregory Torres. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Application to Continue Motion to Dismiss (Doc #14) to January 25, 2021) (Loranger, Timothy)
December 28, 2020 Filing 29 [DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER ORDER DATED ON 12/29/2020, SEE DOCKET ENTRY NO. 61 ] - REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #14 filed by Defendant Avco Corporation. (Green, Andrew). Modified on 12/29/2020 (jp).
December 28, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Gregory Torres, identifying Non-Applicable. (Loranger, Timothy)
December 28, 2020 Filing 27 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #23 . Plaintiff shall file a requisite Notice of Interested Parties no later than 12/31/2020 or risk the striking of its Motion to Remand. (jre)
December 28, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case filed by plaintiff Gregory Torres #23 . The following error(s) was/were found: (1) No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. (2) Counsel must comply with Local Rule 7.1-1 (3) The event to be use is: Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties - under Category - "NOTICES". In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (jp)
December 21, 2020 Filing 25 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Portions of Response Memorandum and Exhibits B, C, E, H, J, K, X, and Y under seal #24 filed by Plaintiff Gregory Torres. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO AVCO CORPORATIONS MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION, #2 Unredacted Document Exhibit B, #3 Unredacted Document Exhibit C, #4 Unredacted Document Exhibit E, #5 Unredacted Document Exhibit H, #6 Unredacted Document Exhibit J, #7 Unredacted Document Exhibit K, #8 Unredacted Document Exhibit X, #9 Unredacted Document Exhibit Y)(Loranger, Timothy)
December 21, 2020 Filing 24 APPLICATION to file document Portions of Response Memorandum and Exhibits B, C, E, H, J, K, X, and Y under seal filed by Plaintiff Gregory Torres. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael S. Miska In Support of Application to Seal, #2 Proposed Order Granting Application to Seal, #3 Redacted Document PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO AVCO CORPORATIONS MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION, #4 Declaration of Michael S. Miska in Support of Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, #5 Exhibit (A), #6 Exhibit (D), #7 Exhibit (F), #8 Exhibit (G), #9 Redacted Document Exhibit (H), #10 Exhibit (I), #11 Redacted Document Exhibit (J), #12 Redacted Document Exhibit (K), #13 Exhibit (L), #14 Exhibit (M), #15 Exhibit (N), #16 Exhibit (O), #17 Exhibit (P), #18 Exhibit (Q), #19 Exhibit (R), #20 Exhibit (S), #21 Exhibit (T), #22 Exhibit (U), #23 Exhibit (V), #24 Exhibit (W), #25 Redacted Document Exhibit (X), #26 Redacted Document Exhibit (Y))(Loranger, Timothy)
December 21, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by plaintiff Gregory Torres. Motion set for hearing on 1/25/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Remand, #2 Declaration of Michael S. Miska in Support of Motion to Remand, #3 Appendix Index of Exhibits A-S to Miska Declaration, #4 Exhibit (A) ATC Dissolution, #5 Exhibit (B) Remand Order GRANTED 10-4-19, #6 Exhibit (C) California Proof of Service ATC, #7 Exhibit (D) Arizona Proof of Service ATC, #8 Exhibit (E) Arizona Subpoena to ATC, #9 Exhibit (F) Whittall Depo, #10 Exhibit (G) Rogers Depo, #11 Exhibit (H) ATC Document production, #12 Exhibit (I) Whittall Declaration, #13 Exhibit (J) Arizona Complaint, #14 Exhibit (K) Approved Turbo Invoice 2002, #15 Exhibit (L) Logbook entry, #16 Exhibit (M) GAS0047-49, #17 Exhibit (N) Avco Supplemental Disclosure, #18 Exhibit (O) NPF Avco, #19 Exhibit (P) Fleck Depo, #20 Exhibit (Q) NOD ATC, #21 Exhibit (R) Order enforcing subpoena ATC, #22 Exhibit (S) NPF CSTEC, #23 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Remand to State Court) (Loranger, Timothy)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE GRANTING by Judge R. Gary Klausner: GRANTING #17 #20 Non-Resident Attorney Michael S. Miska APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Melinda C. Green, Samantha Walker Perry and Gregory Torres, designating Timothy A. Loranger as local counsel. (Thrasher, Lupe)
December 10, 2020 Filing 20 Amended APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Michael S. Miska to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Gregory Torres (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 12/8/2020, Receipt No. 29414024) filed by plaintiff Gregory Torres. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Applicant Attorney Michael S. Miska re compliance with deputy clerk's notice and COVID-caused delay in obtaining current certificates of good standing, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing-New Jersey, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing-Pennsylvania, #4 Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission to Michael S. Miska) (Loranger, Timothy)
December 10, 2020 Filing 19 Amendment to APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Tracy H. Fowler to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Avco Corporation, Lycoming Engines (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-29335705) #10 Addendum filed by Defendants Avco Corporation, Lycoming Engines. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Good Standing (Idaho))(Green, Andrew)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge R. Gary Klausner: GRANTING #10 Non-Resident Attorney Tracy H. Fowler APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Avco Corporation and Lycoming Engines, designating Alina Mooradian as local counsel. (Thrasher, Lupe)
December 9, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Michael S. Miska to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Gregory Torres (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-29414024) #17 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. A declaration is required by the applicant regarding unavailability to provide GSC due to COVID-19. See Court's website on Coronavirus (COVID-19) Guidance. (Thrasher, Lupe)
December 8, 2020 Filing 17 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Michael S. Miska to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Gregory Torres (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-29414024) filed by plaintiff Gregory Torres. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Vicki Greco re compliance with court Notice re Pro Hac Vice Application, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing-New Jersey, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing-Pennsylvania, #4 Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission to Michael S. Miska) (Loranger, Timothy)
December 8, 2020 Filing 16 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Timothy A. Loranger counsel for Plaintiff Gregory Torres. Adding Timothy A. Loranger as counsel of record for Plaintiffs Gregory Torres, Melinda Green, Samantha Walker Perry for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff Gregory Torres. (Attorney Timothy A. Loranger added to party Gregory Torres(pty:pla))(Loranger, Timothy)
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SETTING INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Scheduling Conference set for 4/12/2021 at 09:00 AM. See order for further details. (jre)
December 7, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by defendants Avco Corporation, Lycoming Engines. Motion set for hearing on 1/11/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Motion, #2 Declaration Andrew Green, #3 Exhibit 1 2017 0512 Complaint, #4 Exhibit 2 2017 0830 Affidavit of M. Folk, #5 Exhibit 3 2019 0321 AVCO 3rd Supp Discl Stmt, #6 Exhibit 4 2019 0326 Depo Trans of M. Folk, #7 Exhibit 5 2019 0227 Depo Trans of R. Vincent, #8 Exhibit 6 2019 0322 Depo Trans of R. Fleck, #9 Exhibit 7 2019 0618 Minute Entry re AVCO Mtn to Dismiss, #10 Exhibit 8 2020 1130 Order Affirming AVCO Dismissal, #11 Exhibit 9 2020 1109 Req for Dismissal Approved for Turbo Components, #12 Exhibit 10 P-000554-000564, #13 Declaration of Brian Hudson, #14 Declaration of Judson Rubert, #15 Proposed Order) (Green, Andrew)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (jre)
December 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE Pursuant General Order 19-03 (identical case) by Judge Jesus G. Bernal, Case Management and Assignment Committee Chair. Case transferred to the calendar of Judge R. Gary Klausner for all further proceedings. All discovery matters are transferred to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. Case number now reads as 2:20-cv-10879 RGK(KSx). (rn)
December 4, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Tracy H. Fowler to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Avco Corporation, Lycoming Engines (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-29335705) #10 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. Other error(s) with document(s): A declaration is required regarding unavailability to provide GSC due to COVID-19. See Court's website on Coronavirus (COVID-19) Guidance. (Thrasher, Lupe)
December 3, 2020 Filing 10 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Tracy H. Fowler to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Avco Corporation, Lycoming Engines (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-29335705) filed by defendants Avco Corporation, Lycoming Engines. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing - Utah, #2 Proposed Order) (Mooradian, Alina)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT upon filing of the complaint by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. The Court thanks the parties and their counsel for their anticipated cooperation in carrying out these requirements. (vv)
December 2, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Michael S. Miska. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
December 2, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Tracy H. Fowler. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
December 2, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
December 2, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (lh)
December 1, 2020 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants Avco Corporation, Lycoming Engines identifying Textron Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Green, Andrew)
November 30, 2020 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS Executed by Plaintiff Melinda C. Green, Gregory Torres, Samantha Walker Perry, upon Defendant Avco Corporation served on 7/12/2019, answer due 8/2/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Gabriela Sanchez, Intake Specialist in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned.(FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 7/18/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
November 30, 2020 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Approved Turbo Components, Inc., Avco Corporation, Camarillo Aircraft Service, Does, Fine Line Designs, Fly in Vacations, Garrett by Honeywell, Honeywell Aerospace, Honeywell Engine Control Systems, Honeywell Engines & Systems, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc., Honeywell TurboTechnologies, Honeywell, Inc., Lycoming Engines, Turbo 2000 Corporation. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiffs Melinda C. Green, Gregory Torres, Samantha Walker Perry. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 5/17/2017 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
November 30, 2020 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS Executed by Plaintiff Approved Turbo Components, Inc., upon Defendant Approved Turbo Components, Inc. served on 7/16/2019, answer due 8/6/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Mary Whittall, Agent for Service in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 7/18/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
November 30, 2020 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS Executed by Plaintiff Melinda C. Green, Gregory Torres, Samantha Walker Perry, upon Defendant Avco Corporation served on 7/26/2019, answer due 8/16/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Zakiya Ray, Authorized Agent for Service in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 7/30/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
November 30, 2020 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS Executed by Plaintiff Melinda C. Green, Gregory Torres, Samantha Walker Perry, upon Defendant Lycoming Engines served on 7/17/2019, answer due 8/7/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Mary Fourney, General Manager of Litigation in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 7/18/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
November 30, 2020 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiffs Melinda C. Green, Gregory Torres, Samantha Walker Perry pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Approved Turbo Components, Inc. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 11/9/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
November 30, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Avco Corporation, Lycoming Engines, identifying Avco Corporation, Lycoming Engines, Gregory Torres, Melinda C. Green, Samantha Walker Perry. (Green, Andrew)
November 30, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Avco Corporation, Lycoming Engines. (Green, Andrew)
November 30, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number BC661236 Receipt No: ACACDC-29274419 - Fee: $400, filed by defendants Avco Corporation, Lycoming Engines. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit A-1 Ex Parte Order Staying Proceedings Pending Resolution of Parallel Arizona Action, #3 Exhibit A-2 Minute Order re Ex Parte Application, #4 Exhibit A-3 Minute Order continuing Status Conference, #5 Exhibit A-4 Minute Order re Hearing on Ex Parte Application, #6 Exhibit A-5 Minute Order Granted in Part to Lift Stay, #7 Exhibit A-6 Minute Order Transferring PI Case to Independent Calendar Court, #8 Exhibit A-7 Minute Order Transferring PI Case to Independent Calendar Court Certificate of Service, #9 Exhibit A-8 Order Transferring Complicated PI case to Independent Calendar Court, #10 Exhibit A-9 Proof of Service of Summons on Avco, #11 Exhibit A-10 Proof of Service of Summons on Approved Turbo, #12 Exhibit A-11 Proof of Service of Summons on Lycoming Engines, #13 Exhibit A-12 Proof of Service of Summons on Avco, #14 Exhibit A-13 Minute Order re Peremptory Challenge, #15 Exhibit A-14 Minute Order re Peremptory Challenge Certificate of Service, #16 Exhibit A-15 Order of Remand, #17 Exhibit A-16 Order Granting Stipulation re Avco Motion for PHV Appl of Fowler, #18 Exhibit A-17 Order re COVID19, #19 Exhibit A-18 Order continuing PHV Appl Hearing of Fowler, #20 Exhibit A-19 Order Granting Stay__Reset MTQ Hearing, #21 Exhibit A-20 Tentative Ruling, #22 Exhibit B Request for Dismissal re Approved Turbo Components, #23 Exhibit C Avco Notice of Removal, #24 Exhibit D Torres Ntc of Mtn to Remand Cse to Los Angeles Superior Court, #25 Exhibit E Minute Order re Plaintiff Mtn to Remand Case, #26 Exhibit F Depo Subpoena on Approved Turbo, #27 Exhibit G Decl of Whitthall re Approved Turbo Components, #28 Declaration Declaration of Tracy Fowler ISO Notice of Removal) (Attorney Andrew Scott Green added to party Avco Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Scott Green added to party Lycoming Engines(pty:dft))(Green, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gregory Torres et al v. Honeywell, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell TurboTechnologies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Turbo 2000 Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell Engine Control Systems
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-100, Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lycoming Engines
Represented By: Andrew Scott Green
Represented By: Alina E Mooradian
Represented By: Tracy H. Fowler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approved Turbo Components, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fly in Vacations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell Engines & Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell Aerospace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Camarillo Aircraft Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garrett by Honeywell doing business as Garrett Airesearch doing business as Allied Corp. doing business as Allied Signal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell Transportation Systems
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garrett Engine Boosting Systems
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avco Corporation
Represented By: Andrew Scott Green
Represented By: Alina E Mooradian
Represented By: Tracy H. Fowler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fine Line Designs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Turbo-Flight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flitecraft Turbo Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melinda C. Green
Represented By: A Ilyas Akbari
Represented By: Michael S. Miska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Torres
Represented By: A Ilyas Akbari
Represented By: Timothy A Loranger
Represented By: Michael S. Miska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samantha Walker Perry
Represented By: A Ilyas Akbari
Represented By: Michael S. Miska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?