American Guarantee and Liability Co. et al v. Nibco Inc. et al
Plaintiff: HDI Global Specialty SE, Everest Insurance Co., XL Insurance America, Inc., Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, American Guarantee and Liability Co., GeneraliU.S. Branch d/b/a The General Insurance Company of Trieste & VeniceU.S. Branch, Subscribing to Policy # GCC-PS-0016-17-01, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London subscribing to policy number BOWPNI700364, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London and Generali-U.S. Branch U.S. Branch, Subscribing to Policy No. GCC-PS-0016-17-01 doing business as The General Insurance Company of Trieste and Venice
Defendant: Nibco Inc. and Does 1 through 50
Case Number: 2:2020cv11051
Filed: December 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: R Gary Klausner
Referring Judge: Alexander F MacKinnon
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2021 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Lexington Insurance Company identifying American International Group UK Limited as Corporate Parent. (Denton, David)
January 21, 2021 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff XL Insurance America, Inc. identifying Axa S.A. as Corporate Parent. (Denton, David)
January 21, 2021 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff American Guarantee and Liability Co. identifying Zurich Insurance Group, LTD as Corporate Parent. (Denton, David)
January 21, 2021 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Generali-U.S. Branch (Denton, David)
January 21, 2021 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Liberty Mutual Insurance Company identifying Liberty Mutual Group, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Denton, David)
January 21, 2021 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff HDI Global Specialty SE identifying Hannover Ruck SE as Corporate Parent. (Denton, David)
December 17, 2020 Filing 9 DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by plaintiff American Guarantee and Liability Co., Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London, Everest Insurance Co., Generali-U.S. Branch, HDI Global Specialty SE, Lexington Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, XL Insurance America, Inc... (Denton, David)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Scheduling Conference set for 4/19/2021 at 09:00 AM. See order for further details. (jre)
December 11, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Amended Complaint, filed by Defendant Nibco Inc..(Jaeger, Michael)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (jre)
December 7, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
December 7, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (et)
December 4, 2020 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, Nibco Inc. amending Complaint #1 , filed by Plaintiffs XL Insurance America, Inc., Everest Insurance Co., Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London, Generali-U.S. Branch, Lexington Insurance Company, American Guarantee and Liability Co., HDI Global Specialty SE, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 11/3/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT A TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ]. (et)
December 4, 2020 CONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Nibco Inc., Does 1 through 50. Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiffs XL Insurance America, Inc., Everest Insurance Co., Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London, Generali-U.S. Branch, Lexington Insurance Company, American Guarantee and Liability Co., HDI Global Specialty SE, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 10/23/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT B TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ]. (et)
December 4, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Nibco Inc., (Jaeger, Michael)
December 4, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Nibco Inc.. (Jaeger, Michael)
December 4, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 20STCV40810 Receipt No: ACACDC-29363467 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Nibco Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - First Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Proof of Service of S&C, #3 Certificate of Service) (Attorney Michael Jaeger added to party Nibco Inc.(pty:dft))(Jaeger, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Guarantee and Liability Co. et al v. Nibco Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nibco Inc.
Represented By: Michael Jaeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HDI Global Specialty SE
Represented By: Zachary P Marks
Represented By: David R Denton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Everest Insurance Co.
Represented By: Zachary P Marks
Represented By: David R Denton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: XL Insurance America, Inc.
Represented By: Zachary P Marks
Represented By: David R Denton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Zachary P Marks
Represented By: David R Denton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lexington Insurance Company
Represented By: Zachary P Marks
Represented By: David R Denton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Guarantee and Liability Co.
Represented By: Zachary P Marks
Represented By: David R Denton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GeneraliU.S. Branch d/b/a The General Insurance Company of Trieste & VeniceU.S. Branch, Subscribing to Policy # GCC-PS-0016-17-01
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London subscribing to policy number BOWPNI700364
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London
Represented By: Zachary P Marks
Represented By: David R Denton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Generali-U.S. Branch U.S. Branch, Subscribing to Policy No. GCC-PS-0016-17-01 doing business as The General Insurance Company of Trieste and Venice
Represented By: Zachary P Marks
Represented By: David R Denton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?