Honey Bum, LLC v. Fashion Nova, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Honey Bum, LLC
Defendant: DOE, FASHION NOVA, INC., a California corporation, Richard D. Saghian, Does 1 through 10 and Fashion Nova, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv11233
Filed: December 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: R Gary Klausner
Referring Judge: Alka Sagar
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 0001
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/10/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 5/17/2021 at 9:00 am. (sw)
February 2, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Honey Bum, LLC's Complaint ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Defendants Fashion Nova, Inc., Richard D. Saghian. Motion set for hearing on 3/15/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Exhibit A to Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Exhibit B to Request for Judicial Notice, #4 Exhibit C to Request for Judicial Notice, #5 Proposed Order) (Hummel, Chad)
January 26, 2021 Filing 15 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Richard D. Saghian answer now due 2/2/2021; Fashion Nova, Inc. answer now due 2/2/2021, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants Richard D. Saghian; Fashion Nova, Inc..(Tutundjian, Anna)
January 26, 2021 Filing 14 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Fashion Nova, Inc., Richard D. Saghian, (Tutundjian, Anna)
January 6, 2021 Filing 13 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Chad S Hummel counsel for Defendants Fashion Nova, Inc., Richard D. Saghian. Adding Chad S. Hummel as counsel of record for Fashion Nova, Inc. and Richard D. Saghian for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Fashion Nova, Inc. and Richard D. Saghian. (Attorney Chad S Hummel added to party Fashion Nova, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Chad S Hummel added to party Richard D. Saghian(pty:dft))(Hummel, Chad)
January 6, 2021 Filing 12 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Anna Tutundjian counsel for Defendants Fashion Nova, Inc., Richard D. Saghian. Adding Anna Tutundjian as counsel of record for Fashion Nova, Inc. and Richard D. Saghian for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Fashion Nova, Inc. and Richard D. Saghian. (Tutundjian, Anna)
January 6, 2021 Filing 11 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Richard D. Saghian answer now due 1/26/2021; Fashion Nova, Inc. answer now due 1/26/2021, filed by Defendants Richard D. Saghian; Fashion Nova, Inc..(Attorney Anna Tutundjian added to party Fashion Nova, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Anna Tutundjian added to party Richard D. Saghian(pty:dft))(Tutundjian, Anna)
December 22, 2020 Filing 10 SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Honey Bum, LLC, upon Defendant Richard D. Saghian served on 12/18/2020, answer due 1/8/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Service of Summons and Complaint executed upon Vivian Veck-Girlfriend/Co-Occupant authorized to accept service for Defendant Richard D. Saghian in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service) (Maxwell, Grant)
December 21, 2020 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Honey Bum, LLC, upon Defendant Fashion Nova, Inc. served on 12/16/2020, answer due 1/6/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Daisy Montenegro accepting on behalf of CT Corporation-Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Maxwell, Grant)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (jre)
December 11, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachments 1 Civil Cover Sheet is attached to the Complaint. Each of these documents should have been filed and entered separately under its correct event/relief. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ghap)
December 11, 2020 Filing 6 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Fashion Nova, Inc., Richard D. Saghian. (ghap)
December 11, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
December 11, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (ghap)
December 11, 2020 FILING FEE PAID for new civil case. Receipt No. ACACDC-29478217 for $402 filing fee. (Maxwell, Grant)
December 10, 2020 Filing 3 (Certification and Notice of Interested Parties) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Honey Bum, LLC, (Maxwell, Grant)
December 10, 2020 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Honey Bum, LLC. (Maxwell, Grant)
December 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by Plaintiff Honey Bum, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Attorney Grant James Maxwell added to party Honey Bum, LLC(pty:pla))(Maxwell, Grant)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Honey Bum, LLC v. Fashion Nova, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FASHION NOVA, INC., a California corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard D. Saghian
Represented By: Chad S Hummel
Represented By: Anna Tutundjian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fashion Nova, Inc.
Represented By: Chad S Hummel
Represented By: Anna Tutundjian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Honey Bum, LLC
Represented By: Grant James Maxwell
Represented By: Jeffery D McFarland
Represented By: Jon Dean
Represented By: Michelle Lowery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?