Orlando Garcia v. Welcome El Segundo, LLC
Plaintiff: Orlando Garcia
Defendant: Welcome El Segundo, LLC and Does 1-10
Case Number: 2:2020cv11442
Filed: December 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dolly M Gee
Referring Judge: John E McDermott
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case for Failure To State A Claim filed by Defendant Welcome El Segundo, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 3/12/2021 at 09:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Proposed Order) (Stillman, Philip)
December 28, 2020 Filing 8 Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (kti)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03 (Related Case) filed. Transfer of case DECLINED by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. 2:20-cv-10389-MWF-AGRx (aco)
December 21, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jp)
December 21, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (jp)
December 18, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL ELECTRONICALLY FILED COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, Welcome El Segundo, LLC, filed by plaintiff Orlando Garcia. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 11/20/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED OF EXHIBIT 1 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ). (jp)
December 18, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Welcome El Segundo, LLC, identifying Welcome El Segundo, LLC. (Stillman, Philip)
December 18, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movant Welcome El Segundo, LLC. (Stillman, Philip)
December 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 20TRCV00865 Receipt No: ACACDC-29601549 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Welcome El Segundo, LLC. (Attorney Philip H Stillman added to party Welcome El Segundo, LLC(pty:bkmov))(Stillman, Philip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Orlando Garcia v. Welcome El Segundo, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Welcome El Segundo, LLC
Represented By: Philip H Stillman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Orlando Garcia
Represented By: Amanda Lockhart Seabock
Represented By: Raymond George Ballister, Jr
Represented By: Zachary Manning Best
Represented By: Russell C Handy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?