Jamie Ann Ivey et al v. Serrano Post Accute, LLC
Plaintiff: Sandra Dee Ivey, James Edward Ivey, Jr. and Jamie Ann Ivey
Defendant: Serrano Post Accute, LLC a California limited liability company doing business as Hollywood Premier Healthcare Center and Does 1-100, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2020cv11773
Filed: December 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale S Fischer
Referring Judge: Steve Kim
2 Judge: Alexander F MacKinnon
3 Judge: Mark C Scarsi
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TAKING MOTION OFF CALENDAR AND UNDER SUBMISSION by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Court, on its own motion, takes the Motion #20 set for March 1, 2021 off calendar and under submission. The Court will set a new hearing date if it decides oral argument would be helpful. A written order will follow. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rfi) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 23, 2021 Filing 28 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority ISO Opposition to Motion to Remand filed by defendant Serrano Post Accute, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Garcia v. Welltower Opco Group LLC)(Cruz, Kim)
February 19, 2021 Filing 27 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jody C Moore counsel for Plaintiffs Jamie Ann Ivey, Sandra Dee Ivey, James Edward Ivey, Jr.. Adding Nicolette Paullin as counsel of record for Plaintiffs for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Jaime Ann Ivey, et al.. (Moore, Jody)
February 12, 2021 Filing 26 REPLY In Support of Motion For Remand NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Stanley Mosk Courthouse #20 filed by Plaintiffs Jamie Ann Ivey, Sandra Dee Ivey, James Edward Ivey, Jr.. (Moore, Jody)
February 11, 2021 Filing 25 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Evan J. Topol counsel for Defendant Serrano Post Accute, LLC. Adding Evan J. Topol as counsel of record for SERRANO POST ACUTE, LLC dba HOLLYWOOD PREMIER HEALTHCARE CENTER for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant SERRANO POST ACUTE, LLC dba HOLLYWOOD PREMIER HEALTHCARE CENTER. (Attorney Evan J. Topol added to party Serrano Post Accute, LLC(pty:dft))(Topol, Evan)
February 8, 2021 Filing 24 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Stanley Mosk Courthouse #20 in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand filed by Defendant Serrano Post Accute, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit B-Complaint, #3 Exhibit C-Prep Act Dec, #4 Exhibit D-Amended Dec Invoking Prep Act, #5 Exhibit E-Second amended Dec Invoking Prep Act, #6 Exhibit F-4th Amended HHS Dec, #7 Exhibit G-Advisory Op by HHS Dec General Counsel, #8 Exhibit H-List of Covered Countermeasures, #9 Exhibit I-HHS Advisory Opinion 10-22-20, #10 Exhibit J-HHS Letter Pre Act 8-14-20, #11 Exhibit K-Dec of Jamie Ann Ivey as SII, #12 Exhibit L-CDC Jan 8, 2020, #13 Exhibit M-CDC Jan 17, 2020, #14 Exhibit N-CDC Jan 24, 2020, #15 Exhibit O-CDC Feb 1, 2020 Updated Guidance, #16 Exhibit P-CDPH AFL Jan & Feb 2020, #17 Exhibit Q-CMS Feb 6, 2020 Memo, #18 Exhibit R-CDC Feb 28, 2020 updated interim guidance, #19 Exhibit S-March 2020 CDC Strategies, #20 Exhibit T-CDPH AFL March 3, 2020, #21 Exhibit U-CMS March 4, 2020 Memo, #22 Exhibit V-CDC March 8, 2020 updated guidance, #23 Exhibit W-CDC March 10, 2020, #24 Exhibit X-CMS March 10 2020 Memo, #25 Exhibit Y-CDPH AFL 20-22 March 11, 2020, #26 Exhibit Z-CMS March 13, 2020 Memo, #27 Exhibit AA-March 17, 2020 CDC Memos, #28 Exhibit BB-CMS March 2020 QSO 20-20, #29 Exhibit CC-March 21, 2020 Prep for Covid 19, #30 Exhibit DD-April 2, 2020 CMS Covid 19 LTCF Guidance, #31 Exhibit EE-HHS Jan 8, 2020 Advisory Opinion, #32 Exhibit FF-HHS Dec Fifth Amendment, #33 Exhibit GG-Statement of Interest, #34 Exhibit HH-FAC in Martin v. Serrano Post Acutge, #35 Exhibit LL-3-30-20 CMS Survey)(Cruz, Kim)
February 8, 2021 Filing 23 Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Stanley Mosk Courthouse #20 filed by Defendant Serrano Post Accute, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Debbie Layoen, #2 Exhibit II to Dec of Debbie Layoen, #3 Exhibit JJ to Dec of Debbie Layoen, #4 Declaration of Nerissa Viejo, #5 Declaration of Kim S. Cruz, #6 Exhibit KK to Dec of Kim S. Cruz, #7 Declaration of Ryan G. Canavan, #8 Exhibit MM to Dec of Ryan G. Canavan, #9 Exhibit NN to Dec of Ryan G. Canavan)(Cruz, Kim)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 TEXT ONLY ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Dale S. Fischer re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Stanley Mosk Courthouse #20 . The hearing on the Motion was incorrectly set for 9:00 am and is hereby reset for 3/1/2021, at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. Counsel should note the complete case number as 2:20-cv-11773 DSF (SKx).THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jre) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 2, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE OF MOTION re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Stanley Mosk Courthouse #20 filed by Plaintiffs Jamie Ann Ivey, Sandra Dee Ivey, James Edward Ivey, Jr.. Motion set for hearing on 3/1/2021 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Moore, Jody)
January 29, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Stanley Mosk Courthouse filed by Jaime Ann Ivey, et al. Jamie Ann Ivey, Sandra Dee Ivey, James Edward Ivey, Jr.. Motion set for hearing on 3/1/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit Exhibit H) (Moore, Jody)
January 28, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendant Serrano Post Accute, LLC. correcting Request for Judicial Notice,,,,,, #4 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E-4th Amended Declaration)(Cruz, Kim)
January 28, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendant Serrano Post Accute, LLC. correcting Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 (Cruz, Kim)
January 28, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs, identifying Jaime Ann Ivey, et al.. (Moore, Jody)
January 28, 2021 Filing 16 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jody C Moore counsel for Plaintiffs Jamie Ann Ivey, Sandra Dee Ivey, James Edward Ivey, Jr.. Adding Jody C. Moore as counsel of record for Plaintiffs for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Jaime Ann Ivey, et al.. (Moore, Jody)
January 20, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney for Plaintiffs filed by defendant Serrano Post Accute, LLC. (Cruz, Kim)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Joint Report must include the completed Schedule of Pretrial and Trial dates. Lead trial counsel are ordered to appear in person unless counsel have been excused by the Court. Scheduling Conference set for 3/22/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (rfi)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (rfi)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:20-cv-05937 DSF(SKx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon and Judge Mark C. Scarsi to Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-11773 DSF(SKx). Signed by Judge Dale S. Fischer (aco)
January 15, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by defendant Serrano Post Accute, LLC. Related Case(s): 2:20-cv-5937 DSF, 2:20-cv-187 FMO (Cruz, Kim)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. Scheduling Conference set for 3/22/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (smo)
January 13, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Serrano Post Accute, LLC.(Cruz, Kim)
January 7, 2021 Filing 8 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Serrano Post Accute, LLC answer now due 1/13/2021, re Complaint - (Discovery), filed by defendant Serrano Post Accute, LLC.(Cruz, Kim)
January 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE MARK C. SCARSI upon filing of the complaint by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (smo)
December 30, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
December 30, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Mark C. Scarsi and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (lh)
December 30, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Serrano Post Accute, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Complaint, #2 Exhibit B-PREP Act Declaration, #3 Exhibit C-Amended Declaration invoking PREP Actt, #4 Exhibit D-2nd Amended Dec invoking PREP Act, #5 Exhibit E-4th Amended HHS Dec, #6 Exhibit F-HHS Letter Prep Act 8-14-20, #7 Exhibit G-HHS Advisory Opinion Oct 22, 2020, #8 Exhibit H-PREP Act advisory opinion by HHS, #9 Exhibit I-PREP Act covered devices and tests, #10 Exhibit J-CDC January 8, 2020, #11 Exhibit K-CDC January 17, 2020, #12 Exhibit L-CDC January 24, 2020, #13 Exhibit M-CDC February 1, 2020 Updated Guidance, #14 Exhibit N-CDPH AFLs Jan and Feb 2020, #15 Exhibit O-CMS Feb 6, 2020 Memo, #16 Exhibit P-CDC Feb 28, 2020 updated interim guidance, #17 Exhibit Q-March 1 or 3 CDC strategies, #18 Exhibit R-CDPH AFL March 3 2020, #19 Exhibit S-CMS March 4, 2020 Memo, #20 Exhibit T-CDC March 8, 2020 Updated Guidance, #21 Exhibit U-CDC March 10, 2020, #22 Exhibit V-CMS March 10, 2020 Memo, #23 Exhibit W-CDPH AFL 20-22 March 11, 2020, #24 Exhibit X-CMS March 13, 2020 Memo, #25 Exhibit Y-March 17, 2020 CDC Memos, #26 Exhibit Z-CMS March 20, 2020 QSO 20-20, #27 Exhibit AA-March 21, 2020 CDC Prep for Covid-19, #28 Exhibit BB-April 2, 2020 CMS Covid-19 LTCF Guidance, #29 Exhibit CC-April 6, 2020 CDC Publication, #30 Exhibit DD-April 13, 2020 CDPH AFL 20-39)(Cruz, Kim)
December 30, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by defendant Serrano Post Accute, LLC. (Cruz, Kim)
December 30, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Serrano Post Accute, LLC. (Cruz, Kim)
December 30, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles, case number 20STCV24087 Receipt No: ACACDC-29788114 - Fee: $402, filed by defendant Serrano Post Accute, LLC. (Attorney Kim Suzanne Cruz added to party Serrano Post Accute, LLC(pty:dft))(Cruz, Kim)
December 30, 2020 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, Serrano Post Accute, LLC. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiffs James Edward Ivey, Jr., Jamie Ann Ivey, Sandra Dee Ivey. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 6/25/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE #4 ) (lh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jamie Ann Ivey et al v. Serrano Post Accute, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Dee Ivey
Represented By: Dmitriy Cherepinskiy
Represented By: Nicolette K Paullin
Represented By: Jody C Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Edward Ivey, Jr.
Represented By: Dmitriy Cherepinskiy
Represented By: Nicolette K Paullin
Represented By: Jody C Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Ann Ivey
Represented By: Dmitriy Cherepinskiy
Represented By: Nicolette K Paullin
Represented By: Jody C Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Serrano Post Accute, LLC a California limited liability company doing business as Hollywood Premier Healthcare Center
Represented By: Kim Suzanne Cruz
Represented By: William C Wilson
Represented By: Evan J. Topol
Represented By: Ryan G. Canavan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-100, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?