Janet E Carpenter et al v. 3M Company, et al
Plaintiff: Brian H Carpenter, Tanya D Hardin, Teri D Carpenter, Janet E Carpenter and Michael S Carpenter
Defendant: Warren Pumps, LLC, Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc., BP Amoco Chemical Company, Morse Tec, LLC, ViacomCBS, Inc., BP Products North America, Inc., Superior Lidgerwood Mundy Corporation, Honeywell International, Inc., Foster Wheeler, LLC, Gardner Denver, Inc., Union Carbide Corporation, Crane Co., Carver Pump Company, BW/IP, Inc., A.W. Chesterton Co., Does 1-350, inclusive, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Viacom, Inc., successor by merger to CBS Corporation, a Pennsylvania corporation, Autozone, Inc., The Pep Boys-Manny, Moe & Jack of California, Inc., Asco Valve, Inc., Westinghouse Electric Corporation, Crosby Valves, LLC, M. Slayen & Associates, Inc., Syd Carpenter Marine Contractor, Amoco Chemicals Corp., General Electric Company, Copes-Vulcan, Inc., Aurora Pump Company, Howden Buffalo, Inc., Genuine Parts Company, 3M Company, Taco, Inc., Nibco, Inc., Metalclad Insulation, LLC, Lidgerwood Manufacturing Co., Goulds Pumps, LLC, Armstrong International, Inc., Flowserve U.S., Inc., O'Reilly Automotive Stores, Inc., Atwood & Morrill Co., Inc., Borgwarner Morse Tec, LLC, John Crane, Inc., Grinnell, LLC, Allied Signal, Inc., J.T. Thorpe & Son, Inc., FMC Corp., Crown Cork & Seal USA, Inc., O'Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC, CBS Corporation, a Delaware corporation, Velan Valve Corporation, Chevron USA, Inc. formerly doing business as Standard Oil Company of California, U.S., Amoco Oil Company and Imo Industries, Inc.
Petitioner: Flowserve US Inc.
Consolidated Defendant: Spirax Sarco, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv11797
Filed: December 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Maria A Audero
Referring Judge: Michael W Fitzgerald
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2021 Filing 156 INITIAL DISCLOSURE filed by Defendant A.W. Chesterton Co. (Miller, Anthony)
February 26, 2021 Filing 155 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 15-20 days (not including voir dire and deliberations), filed by Defendant Metalclad Insulation, LLC.. (Carpenter, Erin)
February 26, 2021 Filing 154 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Nibco, Inc., FOSTER WHEELER LLC (Hugo, Edward)
February 26, 2021 Filing 153 DISCLOSURE INITIAL DISCLOSURES (Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)) filed by Defendant Nibco, Inc. (Hugo, Edward)
February 26, 2021 Filing 152 DISCLOSURE INITIAL DISCLOSURES (Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)) filed by Defendant Foster Wheeler, LLC (Hugo, Edward)
February 26, 2021 Filing 151 INITIAL DISCLOSURE of DEFENDANT CROSBY VALVE, LLCS INITIAL DISCLOSURES PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P 26(A)(1) filed by Defendant Crosby Valves, LLC (Carpenter, Elizabeth)
February 26, 2021 Filing 150 INITIAL DISCLOSURE of DEFENDANT ASCO VALVE, INC.S INITIAL DISCLOSURES PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 26(A)(1) filed by Defendant Asco Valve, Inc. (Carpenter, Elizabeth)
February 26, 2021 Filing 149 Initial DISCLOSURE Pursuant to Federal rule of Civil procedure 26(a)(1) filed by Defendants O'Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC, O'Reilly Automotive Stores, Inc. (Baltes, Daniel)
February 26, 2021 Filing 148 INITIAL DISCLOSURE filed by Defendant Honeywell International, Inc. (Elford, Katherine)
February 26, 2021 Filing 147 INITIAL DISCLOSURE of Defendant Metalclad Insulation LLC's Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Rule 26 filed by Defendant Metalclad Insulation, LLC (Carpenter, Erin)
February 26, 2021 Filing 146 INITIAL DISCLOSURE of Defendant J.T. Thorpe & Son, Inc.'s Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosure filed by Defendant J.T. Thorpe & Son, Inc. (Carpenter, Erin)
February 26, 2021 Filing 145 INITIAL DISCLOSURE of Defendant The Pep Boys-Manny, Moe & Jack of California Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Rule 26(a)(1) filed by Defendant The Pep Boys-Manny, Moe & Jack of California, Inc. (Carpenter, Erin)
February 26, 2021 Filing 144 INITIAL DISCLOSURE of Defendant Morse Tec LLC f/k/a Borgwarner LLC as successor-by-merger to Borgwarner Corporation's Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Rule 26 filed by Defendant Morse Tec, LLC (Carpenter, Erin)
February 26, 2021 Filing 143 INITIAL DISCLOSURE of UNDER RULE 26(a)(1)(A) filed by Plaintiffs Brian H Carpenter, Janet E Carpenter, Michael S Carpenter, Teri D Carpenter, Tanya D Hardin (Kim, George)
February 26, 2021 Filing 142 INTIAL DISCLOSURE filed by Defendant Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc. (Bergstrom, Emily)
February 26, 2021 Filing 141 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Michael A Graham counsel for Defendant Genuine Parts Company. Zorik "Rick" Haruthunian is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Genuine Parts Company. (Graham, Michael)
February 24, 2021 Filing 140 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery),,,,, Notice of Re-Filing Answer filed by Defendant Crown Cork & Seal USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Answer)(Olson, Dean)
February 24, 2021 Filing 139 INITIAL DISCLOSURE filed by Defendant Crown Cork & Seal USA, Inc. (Olson, Dean)
February 24, 2021 Filing 138 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Crown Cork & Seal USA, Inc., identifying Crown Americas, Inc.. (Olson, Dean)
February 24, 2021 Filing 137 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Dean A Olson counsel for Defendant Crown Cork & Seal USA, Inc.. Adding Dean A. Olson as counsel of record for Crown Cork & Seal for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Crown Cork & Seal. (Attorney Dean A Olson added to party Crown Cork & Seal USA, Inc.(pty:dft))(Olson, Dean)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 136 SCHEDULING NOTICE and ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Pursuant to General Order 20-09, the Court VACATES the Scheduling Conference set for 3/1/2021 at 11:00 a.m. No appearances shall be made. The Court will review the parties' Joint Rule 26(f) Report and issue pretrial and trial dates by separate order. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (smom) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 23, 2021 Filing 135 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Copes-Vulcan, Inc., identifying Electrolux Home Products, Inc.; Electrolux Holdings, Inc.; AB Electrolux. (Gage, Nicole)
February 23, 2021 Filing 134 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT and Certification of Interested Entities and Persons filed by Consol Defendant Spirax Sarco, Inc. (Gage, Nicole)
February 22, 2021 Filing 133 INITIAL DISCLOSURE of Rule 26(a)(1) filed by Defendant Armstrong International, Inc. (Barba, Luis)
February 17, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant The Pep Boys-Manny, Moe & Jack of California, Inc. (FILED IN STATE COURT (December 30,2020) SUBMITTED AS ATTACHED EXHIBIT A TO NOTICE #131 .) (iv)
February 17, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant Morse Tec, LLC. (FILED IN STATE COURT (December 30, 2020) SUBMITTED AS ATTACHED EXHIBIT A TO NOTICE #130 .) (iv)
February 17, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant J.T. Thorpe & Son, Inc. (FILED IN STATE COURT (December 30,2020) SUBMITTED AS ATTACHED EXHIBIT A TO NOTICE #129 .) (iv)
February 17, 2021 Filing 132 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Taline R Gettas counsel for Defendant BW/IP, Inc.. Adding Taline R. Gettas as counsel of record for BW/IP, Inc. and Its Wholly-Owned Subsidiaries for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant BW/IP, Inc. and Its Wholly-Owned Subsidiaries. (Attorney Taline R Gettas added to party BW/IP, Inc.(pty:dft))(Gettas, Taline)
February 17, 2021 Filing 131 NOTICE by Defendant The Pep Boys - Manny, Moe & Jack of California of Refiling State Court Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant The Pep Boys-Manny, Moe & Jack of California, Inc.. (Carpenter, Erin)
February 17, 2021 Filing 130 NOTICE by Defendant Morse Tec LLC F/K/A Borgwarner Morse Tec LLC, as successor-by-merger to Borg-Warner Corporation, of Refiling State Court Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant Morse Tec, LLC. (Carpenter, Erin)
February 17, 2021 Filing 129 NOTICE by Defendant J.T. Thorpe & Son, Inc. of Refiling State Court Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant J.T. Thorpe & Son, Inc.. (Carpenter, Erin)
February 15, 2021 Filing 128 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 15-20 days, filed by Plaintiffs Brian H Carpenter, Janet E Carpenter, Michael S Carpenter, Teri D Carpenter, Tanya D Hardin.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Kim, George)
February 12, 2021 Filing 127 NOTICE filed by Defendant 3M Company. Re Partial Resolution Of This Matter (Fahr, Samantha)
February 10, 2021 Filing 126 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Defendants BP Products North America, Inc., BP Amoco Chemical Company pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to BP Products North America, Inc., BP Amoco Chemical Company. (Kim, Jason)
February 8, 2021 Filing 125 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Rule 7.1 filed by Defendant Superior Lidgerwood Mundy Corporation (Baravarian, Tina)
February 8, 2021 Filing 124 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, #52 filed by Defendant Superior Lidgerwood Mundy Corporation. (Baravarian, Tina)
February 8, 2021 Filing 123 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery),,,,, filed by Defendant Superior Lidgerwood Mundy Corporation.(Baravarian, Tina)
February 3, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant Copes-Vulcan, Inc. (FILED IN STATE COURT (December 30, 2020) SUBMITTED AS ATTACHED EXHIBIT A TO NOTICE #117 .) (iv)
February 3, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant Spirax Sarco, Inc. (FILED IN STATE COURT (Dated December 22, 2020) SUBMITTED AS ATTACHED EXHIBIT A TO NOTICE #116 .) (iv)
February 3, 2021 Filing 122 INITIAL DISCLOSURE of RULE 26(A)(1)(A) filed by Defendant Aurora Pump Company (Barba, Luis)
February 3, 2021 Filing 121 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant A.W. Chesterton Co., identifying A.W. Chesterton Company. (Miller, Anthony)
February 3, 2021 Filing 120 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Anthony Sinclair Miller counsel for Defendant A.W. Chesterton Co.. Adding Anthony S. Miller as counsel of record for A.W. Chesterton Company for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant A.W. Chesterton Company. (Miller, Anthony)
February 3, 2021 Filing 119 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery),,,,, filed by Defendant A.W. Chesterton Co..(Miller, Anthony)
February 3, 2021 Filing 118 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint #115 . The following error(s) was/were found: Notice of Appearance and Notice of Interested Parties should be filed as separate documents and not attachments to the Answer. In the future, please use the SEARCH feature on the CM/ECF Menu Bar if you are unsure of the events to use. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. (iv)
February 3, 2021 Filing 117 NOTICE filed by Defendant Copes-Vulcan, Inc.. of Filing State Court Answer (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Gage, Nicole)
February 3, 2021 Filing 116 NOTICE filed by Defendant Spirax Sarco, Inc.. of Filing State Court Answer (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Gage, Nicole)
February 2, 2021 Filing 115 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery),,,,, filed by Defendant A.W. Chesterton Co.. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appearance, #2 Certification of Interested Parties)(Attorney Anthony Sinclair Miller added to party A.W. Chesterton Co.(pty:dft))(Miller, Anthony)
February 1, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant Honeywell International, Inc. (FILED IN STATE COURT (December 31, 2020) SUBMITTED AS ATTACHED EXHIBIT A TO NOTICE #108 .) (iv)
February 1, 2021 Filing 114 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery),,,,, Notice of Re-Filing of State Court Answer filed by Defendant Flowserve U.S., Inc.(as successor-in-interest to Durametallic Corporation). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Answer)(Attorney Nicole Brown Yuen added to party Flowserve U.S., Inc.(pty:dft))(Yuen, Nicole)
February 1, 2021 Filing 113 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Flowserve US Inc., identifying Durametallic Corporation. (Attorney Nicole Brown Yuen added to party Flowserve US Inc.(pty:bkmov))(Yuen, Nicole)
February 1, 2021 Filing 112 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Nicole Brown Yuen on behalf of Defendant Flowserve U.S., Inc. (Attorney Nicole Brown Yuen added to party Flowserve U.S., Inc.(pty:dft))(Yuen, Nicole)
February 1, 2021 Filing 111 DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL filed by Defendant Honeywell International, Inc. (Elford, Katherine)
February 1, 2021 Filing 110 DISCLOSURE of STATEMENT AND CERTIFICATION AS TO INTERESTED PARTIES filed by Defendant Honeywell International, Inc. (Elford, Katherine)
February 1, 2021 Filing 109 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Katherine C Elford on behalf of Defendant Honeywell International, Inc. (Elford, Katherine)
February 1, 2021 Filing 108 NOTICE OF RE-FILING STATE COURT ANSWER TO COMPLAINT filed by DEFENDANT Honeywell International, Inc.. (Elford, Katherine)
February 1, 2021 Filing 107 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Velan Valve Corporation, identifying Velan, Inc.. (Powell, Glen)
February 1, 2021 Filing 106 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery),,,,, filed by Defendant Velan Valve Corporation.(Attorney Glen R Powell added to party Velan Valve Corporation(pty:dft))(Powell, Glen)
February 1, 2021 Filing 105 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #52 filed by Plaintiffs Brian H Carpenter, Janet E Carpenter, Michael S Carpenter, Teri D Carpenter, Tanya D Hardin. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of George H. Kim, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F)(Kim, George)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This case has been assigned to Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. This matter is set for a scheduling conference 03/01/21 at 11:00 AM. (pg)
January 26, 2021 Filing 103 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Rule 7.1 Certification filed by Defendant Air & Liquid Systems Corporation (Scadden, James)
January 26, 2021 Filing 102 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery),,,,, Affirmative Defenses filed by Defendant Air & Liquid Systems Corporation.(Attorney James G Scadden added to party Air & Liquid Systems Corporation(pty:dft))(Scadden, James)
January 26, 2021 Filing 101 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Crane Co., identifying Crane Co., Globe Indemnity, Liberty Mutual, Hartford, Aetna, Continental, INA, Underwriters at Lloyds of London and London Market Companies, The Employers Reinsurance Corporation of Kansas City, Kansas, The Home Insurance Company, Firemans Fund Insurance Company, American Home Assurance Company, American Reinsurance Company, Aetna Casualty and Surety Company, Midland Insurance Company, Highlands Insurance Company, Granite State Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, Prudential Reinsurance Company, The North River Insurance Company, AIU Insurance Company, Boston Old Colony Insurance Company, Insurance Company of North America, Northbrook Excess and Surplus Insurance Company, Employers Mutual Casualty, American Excess Insurance, Transit Casualty Company, First State Insurance Company, New England Reinsurance Corporation, Employers Insurance of Wausau, Government Employees Insurance Company, Motor Vehicle Casualty Insurance, Mission Insurance Company, Dairyland Insurance Company, Century Indemnity Company, Centaur Insurance Company, Twin City Fire Insurance Company, Transamerica Insurance Company, American Centennial Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania, Pacific Insurance Company, Integrity Insurance Company. (Davis, Geoffrey)
January 26, 2021 Filing 100 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery),,,,, COMPLAINT FOR WRONGFUL DEATH ASBESTOS AND REQUEST FOR JURY TRIAL filed by Defendant Crosby Valves, LLC.(Carpenter, Elizabeth)
January 26, 2021 Filing 99 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Crosby Valve, LLCmakes the following disclosure filed by Defendant Crosby Valves, LLC identifying Crosby Valve, LLC is a wholly owned subsidiary of The J.R. Clarkson Company LLC and an indirect wholly owned subsidiary of Emerson Electric Co. as Corporate Parent. (Carpenter, Elizabeth)
January 26, 2021 Filing 98 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery),,,,, for Wrongful Death; Demand for Jury Trial filed by Defendant Crane Co..(Davis, Geoffrey)
January 26, 2021 Filing 97 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Elizabeth J Carpenter on behalf of Defendant Crosby Valves, LLC (Attorney Elizabeth J Carpenter added to party Crosby Valves, LLC(pty:dft))(Carpenter, Elizabeth)
January 26, 2021 Filing 96 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Anthony Dean Brosamle counsel for Defendant Flowserve U.S., Inc.. Adding Daniel J. Kelly as counsel of record for Flowserve US Inc., solely as successor to Rockwell Manufacturing Company and Nordstrom Valves, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Flowserve US Inc., solely as successor to Rockwell Manufacturing Company and Nordstrom Valves, Inc.. (Brosamle, Anthony)
January 26, 2021 Filing 95 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Anthony Dean Brosamle counsel for Defendant Flowserve U.S., Inc.. Adding Anthony D. Brosamle as counsel of record for Flowserve US Inc., solely as successor to Rockwell Manufacturing Company and Nordstrom Valves, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Flowserve US Inc., solely as successor to Rockwell Manufacturing Company and Nordstrom Valves, Inc.. (Brosamle, Anthony)
January 26, 2021 Filing 94 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Flowserve U.S., Inc.(solely as successor to Rockwell Manufacturing Company and Nordstrom Valves, Inc.), (Brosamle, Anthony)
January 26, 2021 Filing 93 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery),,,,, filed by Defendant Flowserve U.S., Inc.(solely as successor to Rockwell Manufacturing Company and Nordstrom Valves, Inc.).(Attorney Anthony Dean Brosamle added to party Flowserve U.S., Inc.(pty:dft))(Brosamle, Anthony)
January 25, 2021 Filing 92 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Edward R. Hugo on behalf of Defendant O'Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC (Hugo, Edward)
January 22, 2021 Filing 91 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ryan S Landis counsel for Defendant Union Carbide Corporation. Ryan S. Landis will no longer receive service of documents from the Clerks Office for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Union Carbide Corporation. (Landis, Ryan)
January 19, 2021 Filing 90 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Luis Alfonso Barba on behalf of Defendant Aurora Pump Company (Barba, Luis)
January 19, 2021 Filing 89 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Aurora Pump Company, (Barba, Luis)
January 19, 2021 Filing 88 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Imo Industries, Inc. identifying Colfax Corporation, a publicly traded company, Colfax Fluid Handling LLC, and Imo Holdings, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Bailey, Bobbie)
January 19, 2021 Filing 87 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Bobbie Rae Bailey on behalf of Defendant Imo Industries, Inc. (Bailey, Bobbie)
January 19, 2021 Filing 86 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery),,,,, filed by Defendant Imo Industries, Inc..(Attorney Bobbie Rae Bailey added to party Imo Industries, Inc.(pty:dft))(Bailey, Bobbie)
January 15, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED ANSWER to Complaint filed by defendant Howden Buffalo, Inc (FILED IN STATE COURT (12/21/2020) SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A TO NOTICE #82 .) (iv)
January 15, 2021 Filing 85 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Luis Alfonso Barba on behalf of Defendant Armstrong International, Inc. (Barba, Luis)
January 15, 2021 Filing 84 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Armstrong International, Inc., (Barba, Luis)
January 15, 2021 Filing 83 Initial DISCLOSURE Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(A) filed by Defendant Howden Buffalo, Inc. (Strunk, Christopher)
January 15, 2021 Filing 82 NOTICE Re-Filing State Court Answer filed by Defendant Howden Buffalo, Inc.. (Strunk, Christopher)
January 15, 2021 Filing 81 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Kurt T Putnam counsel for Defendant Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc.. Adding Kurt T. Putnam as counsel of record for Defendant Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc. fka Atwood & Morrill for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc. fka Atwood & Morrill. (Putnam, Kurt)
January 15, 2021 Filing 80 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Emily D Bergstrom counsel for Defendant Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc.. Adding Emily D. Bergstrom as counsel of record for Defendant Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc. fka Atwood & Morrill for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc. fka Atwood & Morrill. (Bergstrom, Emily)
January 15, 2021 Filing 79 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc., identifying The Weir Group PLC. (Putnam, Kurt)
January 15, 2021 Filing 78 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery),,,,, filed by Defendant Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc..(Putnam, Kurt)
January 15, 2021 Filing 77 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice (Other) #17 , Notice (Other) #18 , Notice (Other) #19 , Notice (Other) #20 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
January 15, 2021 Filing 76 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Charles William Jenkins counsel for Defendant Gardner Denver, Inc.. Adding Charles W, Jenkins as counsel of record for Gardner Denver, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Gardner Denver, Inc.. (Jenkins, Charles)
January 15, 2021 Filing 75 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Gardner Denver, Inc., identifying Ingersoll Rand Inc. and KKR & Co. L.P.. (Jenkins, Charles)
January 15, 2021 Filing 74 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery),,,,, filed by Defendant Gardner Denver, Inc..(Attorney Charles William Jenkins added to party Gardner Denver, Inc.(pty:dft))(Jenkins, Charles)
January 14, 2021 Filing 73 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant 3M Company, identifying None. (Fahr, Samantha)
January 14, 2021 Filing 72 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Samantha E Fahr on behalf of Defendant 3M Company (Fahr, Samantha)
January 14, 2021 Filing 71 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery),,,,, Notice of Re Filing State Court Answer filed by Defendant 3M Company.(Attorney Samantha E Fahr added to party 3M Company(pty:dft))(Fahr, Samantha)
January 14, 2021 Filing 70 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Justin F. Cronin on behalf of Defendant General Electric Company (Attorney Justin F. Cronin added to party General Electric Company(pty:dft))(Cronin, Justin)
January 14, 2021 Filing 69 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Justin F. Cronin on behalf of Defendant ViacomCBS, Inc. (Attorney Justin F. Cronin added to party ViacomCBS, Inc.(pty:dft))(Cronin, Justin)
January 14, 2021 Filing 68 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Erin N Empting on behalf of Defendant General Electric Company (Empting, Erin)
January 14, 2021 Filing 67 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Erin N Empting on behalf of Defendant ViacomCBS, Inc. (Empting, Erin)
January 14, 2021 Filing 66 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery),,,,, and Demand for Jury Trial filed by Defendant General Electric Company.(Attorney Erin N Empting added to party General Electric Company(pty:dft))(Empting, Erin)
January 14, 2021 Filing 65 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery),,,,, and Demand for Jury Trial filed by Defendant ViacomCBS, Inc..(Attorney Erin N Empting added to party ViacomCBS, Inc.(pty:dft))(Empting, Erin)
January 14, 2021 Filing 64 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant General Electric Company, (Jamison, Kevin)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 63 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER CONSOLIDATING RELATED CASES by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The Clerk shall consolidate Janet E. Carpenter et al v. 3M Company et al., Case No. CV-20-11797-MWF, and Janet E. Carpenter et al v. 3M Company et al., Case No. CV-20-11810-MWF for all purposes; The docket in case number CV-20-11797-MWF shall constitute the master docket for the consolidated action and shall be captioned Janet E. Carpenter et al v. 3M Company et al. All future pleadings and correspondence shall use this case name and number. (iv)
January 14, 2021 Filing 62 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant ViacomCBS, Inc., identifying ViacomCBS Inc. and National Amusements, Inc.. (Jamison, Kevin)
January 14, 2021 Filing 61 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Kevin D. Jamison on behalf of Defendant General Electric Company (Attorney Kevin D. Jamison added to party General Electric Company(pty:dft))(Jamison, Kevin)
January 14, 2021 Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Kevin D. Jamison on behalf of Defendant ViacomCBS, Inc. (Attorney Kevin D. Jamison added to party ViacomCBS, Inc.(pty:dft))(Jamison, Kevin)
January 14, 2021 Filing 59 JOINDER filed by Defendant General Electric Company joining in Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Kevin D. Jamison in support of Joinder)(Jamison, Kevin)
January 14, 2021 Filing 58 JOINDER filed by Defendant ViacomCBS, Inc. joining in Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration of Kevin D. Jamison in support of Joinder)(Jamison, Kevin)
January 14, 2021 Filing 57 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Geoffrey M Davis counsel for Defendant Crane Co.. Adding Geoffrey M. Davis as counsel of record for Crane Co. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Crane Co.. (Attorney Geoffrey M Davis added to party Crane Co.(pty:dft))(Davis, Geoffrey)
January 13, 2021 Filing 56 JOINDER filed by Defendant Crane Co. joining in Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Davis, Geoffrey)
January 13, 2021 Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Robert H Baronian on behalf of Defendant Chevron USA, Inc. (Attorney Robert H Baronian added to party Chevron USA, Inc.(pty:dft))(Baronian, Robert)
January 13, 2021 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Robert H Baronian on behalf of Defendant Syd Carpenter Marine Contractor (Attorney Robert H Baronian added to party Syd Carpenter Marine Contractor(pty:dft))(Baronian, Robert)
January 12, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant Grinnell, LLC. (FILED IN STATE COURT (12/15/2020) SUBMITTED AS ATTACHED EXHIBIT A TO NOTICE #50 .) (iv)
January 12, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant Goulds Pumps, LLC. (FILED IN STATE COURT (12/28/2020) SUBMITTED AS ATTACHED EXHIBIT A TO NOTICE #48 .) (iv)
January 12, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant Taco, Inc. (FILED IN STATE COURT (12/31/2020) SUBMITTED AS ATTACHED EXHIBIT A TO NOTICE #44 .) (iv)
January 12, 2021 Filing 53 Notice of Electronic Filing re Corporate Disclosure Statement #51 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #49 , Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123),, #37 , Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #46 , Notice (Other) #36 , Notice of Appearance #41 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #38 , Notice of Appearance #42 , Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form,, #35 , Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), #45 , Notice (Other) #50 , Add and Terminate Attorneys, NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #52 , Notice (Other) #48 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #43 , Answer to Complaint (Discovery), Notice of Appearance #40 , Answer to Complaint (Discovery) #39 , Notice (Other) #44 , Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #47 e-mailed to Michael Howard Schuck, Andy Justin Goetz, Kenneth B Prindle and Arpi Galfayan bounced due to 5.1.0 - Unknown address error. The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (lmh) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 12, 2021 Filing 52 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendant Superior Lidgerwood Mundy Corporation. Motion set for hearing on 2/22/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Proposed Order) (Attorney Tina Ladan Baravarian added to party Superior Lidgerwood Mundy Corporation(pty:dft)) (Baravarian, Tina)
January 12, 2021 Filing 51 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by Defendant Grinnell, LLC identifying Tyco International plc as Corporate Parent. (Duffy, Joseph)
January 12, 2021 Filing 50 NOTICE - DEFENDANT GRINNELL LLCS NOTICE OF FILING OF STATE COURT ANSWER TO COMPLAINT filed by Defendant Grinnell, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Duffy, Joseph)
January 12, 2021 Filing 49 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by Defendant Goulds Pumps, LLC identifying ITT Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Duffy, Joseph)
January 12, 2021 Filing 48 NOTICE - DEFENDANT GOULDS PUMPS, LLCS NOTICE OF FILING OF STATE COURT ANSWER TO COMPLAINT filed by Defendant Goulds Pumps, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Duffy, Joseph)
January 12, 2021 Filing 47 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Amy Jo Talarico counsel for Defendants Goulds Pumps, LLC, Grinnell, LLC. Adding Amy J. Talarico as counsel of record for Goulds Pumps, LLC and Grinnell LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Goulds Pumps, LLC and Grinnell LLC. (Attorney Amy Jo Talarico added to party Goulds Pumps, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Amy Jo Talarico added to party Grinnell, LLC(pty:dft))(Talarico, Amy)
January 12, 2021 Filing 46 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Joseph Duffy counsel for Defendants Goulds Pumps, LLC, Grinnell, LLC. Adding Joseph Duffy as counsel of record for Goulds Pumps, LLC and Grinnell LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Goulds Pumps, LLC and Grinnell LLC. (Attorney Joseph Duffy added to party Goulds Pumps, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Joseph Duffy added to party Grinnell, LLC(pty:dft))(Duffy, Joseph)
January 12, 2021 Filing 45 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Janet E Carpenter, Tanya D Hardin, Brian H Carpenter, Michael S Carpenter, Teri D Carpenter, upon Defendant All Defendants. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Authorized agent for service of process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 01-46 Proofs of Service)(Kim, George)
January 12, 2021 Filing 44 NOTICE of Def. Taco, Inc.'s Previously Filed State Court Answer filed by Defendant Taco, Inc.. (Bray, Kendra)
January 12, 2021 Filing 43 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Taco, Inc. identifying Taco, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Bray, Kendra)
January 12, 2021 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jeremy David Milbrodt on behalf of Defendant Syd Carpenter Marine Contractor (Attorney Jeremy David Milbrodt added to party Syd Carpenter Marine Contractor(pty:dft))(Milbrodt, Jeremy)
January 12, 2021 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Kendra Bray on behalf of Defendant Taco, Inc. (Attorney Kendra Bray added to party Taco, Inc.(pty:dft))(Bray, Kendra)
January 12, 2021 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Carla Lynn Crochet on behalf of Defendant Syd Carpenter Marine Contractor (Attorney Carla Lynn Crochet added to party Syd Carpenter Marine Contractor(pty:dft))(Crochet, Carla)
January 11, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant BW/IP, Inc. (FILED IN STATE COURT (December 29, 2020) SUBMITTED AS ATTACHED EXHIBIT A TO NOTICE #36 .) (iv)
January 11, 2021 Filing 39 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery),,,,, FOR WRONGFUL DEATH ASBESTOS AND REQUEST FOR JURY TRIAL filed by Defendant Asco Valve, Inc..(Carpenter, Elizabeth)
January 11, 2021 Filing 38 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT AND RULE 7.1-1 CERTIFICATION AS TO INTERESTED PARTIES filed by Defendant BW/IP, Inc. (Etemad, Neusha)
January 11, 2021 Filing 37 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Neusha Etemad counsel for Defendant BW/IP, Inc.. Adding Neusha Etemad as counsel of record for BW/IP, INC. and its Wholly Owned Subsidiaries (improperly named and served as BW/IP, INC., and its wholly owned subsidiaries Byron Jackson Pumps) for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant BW/IP, INC. and its Wholly Owned Subsidiaries (improperly named and served as BW/IP, INC., and its wholly owned subsidiaries Byron Jackson Pumps). (Attorney Neusha Etemad added to party BW/IP, Inc.(pty:dft))(Etemad, Neusha)
January 11, 2021 Filing 36 NOTICE filed by Defendant BW/IP, Inc.. OF RE-FILING STATE COURT ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT (Etemad, Neusha)
January 11, 2021 Filing 35 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance #26 , Notice of Appearance #25 . The following error(s) was/were found: Notice of Appearance missing signature page. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This case has been assigned to Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. This matter is set for a scheduling conference 03/01/21 at 11:00 AM (pg)
January 8, 2021 Filing 33 DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Defendant Genuine Parts Company.. (Haruthunian, Zorik)
January 8, 2021 Filing 32 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiffs Brian H Carpenter, Janet E Carpenter, Michael S Carpenter, Teri D Carpenter, Tanya D Hardin. Amended with correct case number. Related Case(s): 2:20-cv-11810 (Kim, George)
January 7, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED ANSWER to Complaint filed by defendant FMC Corporation (FILED IN STATE COURT (1/4/2021) SUBMITTED AS ATTACHED EXHIBIT 1 TO NOTICE #31 .) (iv)
January 7, 2021 Filing 31 NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT ANSWER AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL filed by Defendant FMC Corp.. (Schatz, Russell)
January 7, 2021 Filing 30 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant FMC Corp., identifying The Vanguard Group. (Schatz, Russell)
January 7, 2021 Filing 29 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiffs Brian H Carpenter, Janet E Carpenter, Michael S Carpenter, Teri D Carpenter, Tanya D Hardin. Related Case(s): 2:20-cv-11810 (Kim, George)
January 7, 2021 Filing 28 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Brian H Carpenter, Janet E Carpenter, Michael S Carpenter, Teri D Carpenter, Tanya D Hardin, identifying Plaintiffs Janet E. Carpenter, Brian H. Carpenter, Michael S. Carpenter, Teri D. Carpenter and Tanya D. Hardin. (Kim, George)
January 7, 2021 Filing 27 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney George H Kim counsel for Plaintiffs Brian H Carpenter, Janet E Carpenter, Michael S Carpenter, Teri D Carpenter, Tanya D Hardin. Adding George H. Kim as counsel of record for Janet E. Carpenter, Brian H. Carpenter, Michael S. Carpenter, Teri D. Carpenter and Tanya D. Hardin for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Janet E. Carpenter, Brian H. Carpenter, Michael S. Carpenter, Teri D. Carpenter and Tanya D. Hardin. (Kim, George)
January 7, 2021 Filing 26 First NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Russell W Schatz, Jr on behalf of Defendant FMC Corp. (Attorney Russell W Schatz, Jr added to party FMC Corp.(pty:dft))(Schatz, Russell)
January 7, 2021 Filing 25 First NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Timothy C Pieper on behalf of Defendant FMC Corp. (Attorney Timothy C Pieper added to party FMC Corp.(pty:dft))(Pieper, Timothy)
January 7, 2021 Filing 24 First NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Francis D Pond on behalf of Defendant FMC Corp. (Attorney Francis D Pond added to party FMC Corp.(pty:dft))(Pond, Francis)
January 7, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant M. Slayen & Associates, Inc., identifying M. Slayen & Associates Inc. (Bergstrom, Emily)
January 7, 2021 Filing 22 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery),,,,, with JURY DEMAND for Wrongful Death - Asbestos filed by Defendant M. Slayen & Associates, Inc..(Attorney Emily D Bergstrom added to party M. Slayen & Associates, Inc.(pty:dft))(Bergstrom, Emily)
January 7, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Asco Valve, Inc., identifying ASCO VALVE, INC. is a Delaware corporation, and is wholly-owned, indirect subsidiary of Emerson Electric Co.. (Attorney Elizabeth J Carpenter added to party Asco Valve, Inc.(pty:dft))(Carpenter, Elizabeth)
January 7, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT ASCO VALVE, INC. filed by Defendant Asco Valve, Inc.. (Carpenter, Elizabeth)
January 7, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance of Lafayette J. Clarke filed by Defendant Genuine Parts Company. (Haruthunian, Zorik)
January 7, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance of Frank D. Pond filed by Defendant Genuine Parts Company. (Haruthunian, Zorik)
January 7, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE Notice of Appearance of Michael A. Graham filed by Defendant Genuine Parts Company. (Haruthunian, Zorik)
January 7, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance of Zorik "Rick" Haruthunian filed by Defendant Genuine Parts Company. (Haruthunian, Zorik)
January 7, 2021 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Genuine Parts Company, identifying Genuine Parts Company. (Haruthunian, Zorik)
January 7, 2021 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery),,,,, filed by Defendant Genuine Parts Company.(Attorney Zorik Haruthunian added to party Genuine Parts Company(pty:dft))(Haruthunian, Zorik)
January 6, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED ANSWER to Complaint filed by defendant SYD, Carpenter Marine Contractor, Inc (FILED IN STATE COURT (12/17/2020) SUBMITTED AS ATTACHED EXHIBIT A TO NOTICE #12 .) (iv)
January 6, 2021 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Syd Carpenter Marine Contractor (Galfayan, Arpi)
January 6, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE Of Filing State Court Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint for Wrongful Death-Asbestos; Demand For Jury Trial filed by Defendant Syd Carpenter Marine Contractor. (Galfayan, Arpi)
January 6, 2021 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Chevron USA, Inc. identifying Chevron U.S.A. Holdings Inc. and Chevron Corporation as Corporate Parent. (Galfayan, Arpi)
January 6, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery),,,,, JURY DEMAND. filed by Defendant Chevron USA, Inc..(Attorney Arpi Galfayan added to party Chevron USA, Inc.(pty:dft))(Galfayan, Arpi)
January 6, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott to Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2:20-cv-11797 MWF(MAAx). (rn)
January 5, 2021 Filing 8 DECLINED STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge filed by Defendant Warren Pumps, LLC. (Powell, Glen)
January 5, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery),,,,, with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Warren Pumps, LLC.(Powell, Glen)
January 5, 2021 Filing 6 REMINDER NOTICE re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. Each party must file form CV-11C within the consent deadlines pursuant to L.R. 73-2. Additionally, the parties are directed to L.R. 73-2.2 Proof of Service. In any case in which only a magistrate judge is initially assigned, plaintiff must file a proof of service within 10 days of service of the summons and complaint as to each defendant. [See Notice for details.] (san)
January 4, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (Attachments: #1 CV11C) (esa)
January 4, 2021 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney James G Scadden counsel for Defendant Warren Pumps, LLC. Adding James G. Scadden as counsel of record for Warren Pumps, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant Warren Pumps, LLC. (Scadden, James)
December 31, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants 3M Company, A.W. Chesterton Co., Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Armstrong International, Inc., Asco Valve, Inc., Aurora Pump Company, Autozone, Inc., BP Amoco Chemical Company, BP Products North America, Inc., BW/IP, Inc., John S Carpenter, Carver Pump Company, Chevron USA, Inc., Copes-Vulcan, Inc., Crane Co., Crosby Valves, LLC, Crown Cork & Seal USA, Inc., Does, FMC Corp., Flowserve U.S., Inc.(as successor-in-interest to Durametallic Corporation), Flowserve U.S., Inc.(solely as successor to Rockwell Manufacturing Company and Nordstrom Valves, Inc.), Foster Wheeler, LLC, Gardner Denver, Inc., General Electric Company, Genuine Parts Company, Goulds Pumps, LLC, Grinnell, LLC, Honeywell International, Inc., Howden Buffalo, Inc., Imo Industries, Inc., J.T. Thorpe & Son, Inc., John Crane, Inc., M. Slayen & Associates, Inc., Metalclad Insulation, LLC, Morse Tec, LLC, Nibco, Inc., O'Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC, O'Reilly Automotive Stores, Inc., Superior Lidgerwood Mundy Corporation, Syd Carpenter Marine Contractor, Taco, Inc., The Pep Boys-Manny, Moe & Jack of California, Inc., Union Carbide Corporation, Velan Valve Corporation, ViacomCBS, Inc., Warren Pumps, LLC, Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc., Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiffs Janet E Carpenter, Tanya D Hardin, Brian H Carpenter, Michael S Carpenter, Teri D Carpenter. (filed in state court 11/6/20, submitted as document 1, attachment 1) (esa)
December 31, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Warren Pumps, LLC, identifying IMO Industries and Colfax Corporation. (Powell, Glen)
December 31, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Warren Pumps, LLC. (Powell, Glen)
December 31, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior, case number 20STCV42830 Receipt No: ACACDC-29803439 - Fee: $402, filed by defendant Warren Pumps, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit A-B to Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit C-F to Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit G-1 & G-2 to Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit H-I to Exhibit 2, #7 Exhibit J-L to Exhibit 2, #8 Exhibit 3, #9 Exhibit 4, #10 Exhibit 5, #11 Exhibit 6, #12 Exhibit 7, #13 Exhibit 8) (Attorney Glen R Powell added to party Warren Pumps, LLC(pty:dft))(Powell, Glen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Janet E Carpenter et al v. 3M Company, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian H Carpenter
Represented By: George H Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tanya D Hardin
Represented By: George H Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teri D Carpenter
Represented By: George H Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet E Carpenter
Represented By: George H Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael S Carpenter
Represented By: George H Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps, LLC
Represented By: Glen R Powell
Represented By: James G Scadden
Represented By: Michael J Pietrykowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc.
Represented By: Kurt T Putnam
Represented By: Emily D Bergstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP Amoco Chemical Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morse Tec, LLC
Represented By: Erin M Carpenter
Represented By: Connor Matthew Scott
Represented By: Bradford J DeJardin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ViacomCBS, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin D. Jamison
Represented By: Justin F. Cronin
Represented By: Erin N Empting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP Products North America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Superior Lidgerwood Mundy Corporation
Represented By: Patrick James Foley
Represented By: Tina Ladan Baravarian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International, Inc.
Represented By: Katherine C Elford
Represented By: Colleen Elizabeth Baime
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler, LLC
Represented By: Edward R Hugo
Represented By: Paul S Atigapramoj
Represented By: Charles S Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gardner Denver, Inc.
Represented By: Charles William Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Represented By: Farah Sohaili Nicol
Represented By: Stephen M Nichols
Represented By: Ryan S Landis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Represented By: Geoffrey M Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carver Pump Company
Represented By: Robert Harvey Berkes
Represented By: Karen Lynn Finateri Silbiger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BW/IP, Inc.
Represented By: Keith M Ameele
Represented By: Neusha Etemad
Represented By: Suzanna Lianna Minasian
Represented By: Taline R Gettas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.W. Chesterton Co.
Represented By: Anthony Sinclair Miller
Represented By: Jennifer A Cormier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-350, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation
Represented By: Glen R Powell
Represented By: Michael J Pietrykowski
Represented By: James G Scadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viacom, Inc., successor by merger to CBS Corporation, a Pennsylvania corporation
Represented By: Kevin D. Jamison
Represented By: Justin F. Cronin
Represented By: Erin N Empting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Autozone, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Pep Boys-Manny, Moe & Jack of California, Inc.
Represented By: Erin M Carpenter
Represented By: Connor Matthew Scott
Represented By: Bradford J DeJardin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asco Valve, Inc.
Represented By: Gary D Sharp
Represented By: Elizabeth J Carpenter
Represented By: Melanie L Ameele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westinghouse Electric Corporation
Represented By: Kevin D. Jamison
Represented By: Justin F. Cronin
Represented By: Erin N Empting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crosby Valves, LLC
Represented By: Melanie L Ameele
Represented By: Gary D Sharp
Represented By: Elizabeth J Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Slayen & Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Emily D Bergstrom
Represented By: Patrick Mark Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Syd Carpenter Marine Contractor
Represented By: Carla Lynn Crochet
Represented By: Arpi Galfayan
Represented By: Jeremy David Milbrodt
Represented By: Robert H Baronian
Represented By: Kenneth B Prindle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amoco Chemicals Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Kevin D. Jamison
Represented By: Justin F. Cronin
Represented By: Erin N Empting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Copes-Vulcan, Inc.
Represented By: Lance D Wilson
Represented By: Nicole Elisabet Gage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurora Pump Company
Represented By: Christine D Calareso
Represented By: Luis Alfonso Barba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howden Buffalo, Inc.
Represented By: Michael J Pietrykowski
Represented By: Christopher D Strunk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genuine Parts Company
Represented By: Zorik Haruthunian
Represented By: Francis D Pond
Represented By: Lafayette J Clarke
Represented By: Michael A Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company
Represented By: Samantha E Fahr
Represented By: Emma Moralyan
Represented By: Jayme C. Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taco, Inc.
Represented By: Margaret Flynn Mahaffey
Represented By: Kendra Bray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nibco, Inc.
Represented By: Edward R Hugo
Represented By: Paul S Atigapramoj
Represented By: Charles S Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metalclad Insulation, LLC
Represented By: Erin M Carpenter
Represented By: Connor Matthew Scott
Represented By: Bradford J DeJardin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lidgerwood Manufacturing Co.
Represented By: Patrick James Foley
Represented By: Tina Ladan Baravarian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulds Pumps, LLC
Represented By: Joseph Duffy
Represented By: Amy Jo Talarico
Represented By: Alyssa D O'Donnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armstrong International, Inc.
Represented By: Christine D Calareso
Represented By: Luis Alfonso Barba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowserve U.S., Inc.
Represented By: Nicole Brown Yuen
Represented By: Tsun-Chi Eric Sun
Represented By: Anthony Dean Brosamle
Represented By: Gary D Sharp
Represented By: Daniel James Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O'Reilly Automotive Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Edward R Hugo
Represented By: Alex G Taheri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atwood & Morrill Co., Inc.
Represented By: Kurt T Putnam
Represented By: Emily D Bergstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Borgwarner Morse Tec, LLC
Represented By: Erin M Carpenter
Represented By: Connor Matthew Scott
Represented By: Bradford J DeJardin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Crane, Inc.
Represented By: Claire C Weglarz
Represented By: Fred B Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grinnell, LLC
Represented By: Joseph Duffy
Represented By: Amy Jo Talarico
Represented By: Alyssa D O'Donnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied Signal, Inc.
Represented By: Katherine C Elford
Represented By: Colleen Elizabeth Baime
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.T. Thorpe & Son, Inc.
Represented By: Erin M Carpenter
Represented By: Connor Matthew Scott
Represented By: Bradford J DeJardin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMC Corp.
Represented By: Russell W Schatz, Jr
Represented By: Francis D Pond
Represented By: Timothy C Pieper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crown Cork & Seal USA, Inc.
Represented By: Dean A Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O'Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: Edward R Hugo
Represented By: Alex G Taheri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation, a Delaware corporation
Represented By: Kevin D. Jamison
Represented By: Justin F. Cronin
Represented By: Erin N Empting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Velan Valve Corporation
Represented By: Glen R Powell
Represented By: Michael J Pietrykowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chevron USA, Inc. formerly doing business as Standard Oil Company of California, U.S.
Represented By: Andy Justin Goetz
Represented By: Arpi Galfayan
Represented By: Robert H Baronian
Represented By: Michael Howard Schuck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amoco Oil Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Imo Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Frederick W Gatt
Represented By: Olga Guadalupe Pena
Represented By: Bobbie Rae Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Flowserve US Inc.
Represented By: Nicole Brown Yuen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Spirax Sarco, Inc.
Represented By: Lance D Wilson
Represented By: Nicole Elisabet Gage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?