Janet E. Carpenter et al v. 3M Company et al
Plaintiff: Janet E. Carpenter, Tanya D. Hardin, Brian H. Carpenter, Teri D. Carpenter and Michael S. Carpenter
Defendant: Gardner Denver, Inc., Spirax Sarco, Inc., Carver Pump Company, General Electric Company, A.W. CHESTERTON CO., Crane Co., Syd Carpenter Marine Contractor Inc, AutoZone, Inc., AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION, as successor in interest to Buffalo Pumps, Inc., ASCO VALVE, INC., CROSBY VALVES, LLC, M. Slayen & Associates, Inc., IMO INDUSTRIES, INC., individually and as successor to DeLaval Turbine, Inc., FMC CORP., on behalf of its former Peerless Pump, Chicago Pump, Northern Pump and Coffin Pumps, FLOWSERVE U.S., INC., solely as successor to Rockwell Manufacturing Company and Nordstrom Valves, Inc., Copes-Vulcan, Inc., Aurora Pump Company, WEIR VALVES & CONTROLS USA, INC., f/k/a Atwood & Morrill Co., Inc., GENUINE PARTS COMPANY, 3M Company, Taco, Inc., Nibco, Inc., Metalclad Insulation, LLC, Viacom CBS, INC. f/k/a CBS Corporation, a Pennsylvania Corporation, f/k/a Westinghouse Electric Corporation, THE PEP BOYS-MANNY, MOE & JACK OF CALIFORNIA, INC., FOSTER WHEELER, LLC, as survivor to the Merger with Foster Wheeler Corporation, Armstrong International, Inc., Union Carbide Corporation, John Crane, Inc., GRINNELL, LLC, OReilly Automotive Stores, Inc., J.T. Thorpe & Son, Inc., Crown Cork & Seal USA, Inc., BP PRODUCTS NORTH AMERICAN, INC., f/k/a Amoco Oil Company; BW/IP, INC., and its wholly owned subsidiaries Byron Jackson Pumps, HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC., f/k/a Allied Signal, Inc., successor in interest to The Bendix Corporation, CHEVRON USA, INC., f/k/a Standard Oil Company of California, U.S., SUPERIOR LIDGERWOOD MUNDY CORPORATION, a/k/a Lidgerwood Manufacturing Co., individually and as successor in interest to M.T. Davidson Co., Warren Pumps, LLC, GOULDS PUMPS, LLC, HOWDEN BUFFALO, INC., individually and as successor in interest to Buffalo Forge Company, BP AMOCO CHEMICAL COMPANY, a/k/a Amoco Chemicals Corp., MORSE TEC, LLC, f/k/a BorgWarner Morse TEC, LLC and successor by merger to Borg-Warner Corporation, OReilly Auto Enterprises, LLC, Velan Valve Corporation, Morse Tec, LLC, Superior Lidgerwood Mundy Corporation, ViacomCBS, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc., Chevron USA, Inc., BP Amoco Chemical Company, BP Products North American, Inc., Weir Valves and Controls USA, Inc., Foster Wheeler, LLC, J.T. Thorpe and Son, Inc., Viacom, Inc., successor by merger to CBS Corporation, a Pennsylvania corporation, Does 1-350, inclusive, Crown Cork and Seal USA, Inc., Westinghouse Electric Corporation, Syd Carpenter Marine Contractor, Amoco Chemicals Corp., CBS Corporation, a Delaware corporation, Howden Buffalo, Inc., Standard Oil Company of California, U.S., Atwood and Morrill Co., Inc., Flowserve U.S., Inc., The Pep Boys-Manny, Moe and Jack of California, Inc., FMC Corp., Lidgerwood Manufacturing Co, individually and as successor in interest to M.T. Davidson Co., M. Slayen and Associates, Inc., Air and Liquid Systems Corporation, BW IP, Inc., Borgwarner Morse Tec, LLC and successor by merger to Borg-Warner Corporation, Amoco Oil Company, AlliedSignal, Inc., successor in interest to The Bendix Corporation and IMO Industries, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv11810
Filed: December 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Maria A Audero
Referring Judge: Michael W Fitzgerald
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2021 Filing 100 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice (Other) #14 , Notice (Other) #16 , Notice (Other) #13 , Notice (Other) #19 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 99 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER CONSOLIDATING RELATED CASES by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The Clerk shall consolidate Janet E. Carpenter et al v. 3M Company et al., Case No. CV-20-11797-MWF, and Janet E. Carpenter et al v. 3M Company et al., Case No. CV-20-11810-MWF for all purposes; The docket in case number CV-20-11797-MWF shall constitute the master docket for the consolidated action and shall be captioned Janet E. Carpenter et al v. 3M Company et al. All future pleadings and correspondence shall use this case name and number; The Clerk shall file a copy of this Order in and then administratively close Janet E. Carpenter et al v. 3M Company et al., Case No. CV-20-11810- MWF. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (iv)
January 14, 2021 Filing 98 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Geoffrey M Davis counsel for Defendant Crane Co.. Adding Geoffrey M. Davis as counsel of record for Crane Co. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Crane Co.. (Attorney Geoffrey M Davis added to party Crane Co.(pty:dft))(Davis, Geoffrey)
January 14, 2021 Filing 97 NOTICE by Defendant The Pep Boys - Manny, Moe & Jack of California of Refiling State Court Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant The Pep Boys-Manny, Moe and Jack of California, Inc.. (Carpenter, Erin)
January 14, 2021 Filing 96 NOTICE by Defendant Morse Tec LLC, F/K/A Borgwarner Morse Tec LLC, as Successor-by-Merger to Borg-Warner Corporation, of Refiling State Court Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant Morse Tec, LLC. (Carpenter, Erin)
January 14, 2021 Filing 95 NOTICE by Defendant J.T. Thorpe & Son, Inc. of Refiling State Court Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant J.T. Thorpe and Son, Inc.. (Carpenter, Erin)
January 13, 2021 Filing 94 JOINDER filed by Defendant Crane Co. joining in Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Davis, Geoffrey)
January 13, 2021 Filing 93 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Robert H Baronian on behalf of Defendant Chevron USA, Inc. (Attorney Robert H Baronian added to party Chevron USA, Inc.(pty:dft))(Baronian, Robert)
January 13, 2021 Filing 92 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Robert H Baronian on behalf of Defendant Syd Carpenter Marine Contractor (Attorney Robert H Baronian added to party Syd Carpenter Marine Contractor(pty:dft))(Baronian, Robert)
January 13, 2021 Filing 91 NOTICE Notice of Joinder filed by Defendant John Crane, Inc.. (Weglarz, Claire)
January 12, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant Grinnell, LLC. (FILED IN STATE COURT (12/15/2020) SUBMITTED AS ATTACHED EXHIBIT A TO NOTICE #89 .) (iv)
January 12, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant Goulds Pumps, LLC. (FILED IN STATE COURT (12/28/2020) SUBMITTED AS ATTACHED EXHIBIT A TO NOTICE #87 .) (iv)
January 12, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant Aurora Pump Company.(FILED IN STATE COURT (12/29/2020) SUBMITTED AS ATTACHED EXHIBIT A TO NOTICE #84 .) (iv)
January 12, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant Armstrong International, Inc. (FILED IN STATE COURT (12/28/2020) SUBMITTED AS ATTACHED EXHIBIT A TO NOTICE #83 .) (iv)
January 12, 2021 Filing 90 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by Defendant Grinnell, LLC identifying Tyco International plc as Corporate Parent. (Duffy, Joseph)
January 12, 2021 Filing 89 NOTICE - DEFENDANT GRINNELL LLCS NOTICE OF FILING OF STATE COURT ANSWER TO COMPLAINT filed by Defendant Grinnell, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Duffy, Joseph)
January 12, 2021 Filing 88 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by Defendant Goulds Pumps, LLC identifying ITT Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Duffy, Joseph)
January 12, 2021 Filing 87 NOTICE - DEFENDANT GOULDS PUMPS, LLCS NOTICE OF FILING OF STATE COURT ANSWER TO COMPLAINT filed by Defendant Goulds Pumps, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Duffy, Joseph)
January 12, 2021 Filing 86 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Amy Jo Talarico counsel for Defendants Goulds Pumps, LLC, Grinnell, LLC. Adding Amy J. Talarico as counsel of record for Goulds Pumps, LLC and Grinnell LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Goulds Pumps, LLC and Grinnell LLC. (Attorney Amy Jo Talarico added to party Goulds Pumps, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Amy Jo Talarico added to party Grinnell, LLC(pty:dft))(Talarico, Amy)
January 12, 2021 Filing 85 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Joseph Duffy counsel for Defendants Goulds Pumps, LLC, Grinnell, LLC. Adding Joseph Duffy as counsel of record for Goulds Pumps, LLC and Grinnell LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Goulds Pumps, LLC and Grinnell LLC. (Attorney Joseph Duffy added to party Goulds Pumps, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Joseph Duffy added to party Grinnell, LLC(pty:dft))(Duffy, Joseph)
January 12, 2021 Filing 84 NOTICE of Filing State Court Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial filed by Defendant Aurora Pump Company. (Barba, Luis)
January 12, 2021 Filing 83 NOTICE of Filing State Court Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial filed by Defendant Armstrong International, Inc.. (Barba, Luis)
January 12, 2021 Filing 82 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Robert Harvey Berkes on behalf of Defendant Carver Pump Company (Berkes, Robert)
January 12, 2021 Filing 81 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Robert Harvey Berkes on behalf of Defendant Carver Pump Company (Berkes, Robert)
January 12, 2021 Filing 80 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jeremy David Milbrodt on behalf of Defendant Syd Carpenter Marine Contractor (Attorney Jeremy David Milbrodt added to party Syd Carpenter Marine Contractor(pty:dft))(Milbrodt, Jeremy)
January 12, 2021 Filing 79 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Carla Lynn Crochet on behalf of Defendant Syd Carpenter Marine Contractor (Crochet, Carla)
January 12, 2021 Filing 78 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Andy Justin Goetz on behalf of Defendant Chevron USA, Inc. (Goetz, Andy)
January 12, 2021 Filing 77 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Michael Howard Schuck on behalf of Defendant Chevron USA, Inc. (Schuck, Michael)
January 12, 2021 Filing 76 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Carla Lynn Crochet on behalf of Defendant Syd Carpenter Marine Contractor (Attorney Carla Lynn Crochet added to party Syd Carpenter Marine Contractor(pty:dft))(Crochet, Carla)
January 12, 2021 Filing 75 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Andy Justin Goetz on behalf of Defendant Chevron USA, Inc. (Attorney Andy Justin Goetz added to party Chevron USA, Inc.(pty:dft))(Goetz, Andy)
January 12, 2021 Filing 74 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Michael Howard Schuck on behalf of Defendant Chevron USA, Inc. (Attorney Michael Howard Schuck added to party Chevron USA, Inc.(pty:dft))(Schuck, Michael)
January 11, 2021 Filing 73 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery),,,,,, FOR WRONGFUL DEATH ASBESTOS AND REQUEST FOR JURY TRIAL filed by Defendant ASCO Valve, Inc..(Attorney Elizabeth J Carpenter added to party ASCO Valve, Inc.(pty:dft))(Carpenter, Elizabeth)
January 11, 2021 Filing 72 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Carver Pump Company, (Berkes, Robert)
January 11, 2021 Filing 71 ANSWER to Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 Notice of Re-filing State Court Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant Carver Pump Company.(Attorney Robert Harvey Berkes added to party Carver Pump Company(pty:dft))(Berkes, Robert)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE Pursuant General Order 19-03 (identical case) by Judge Josephine L. Staton, Case Management and Assignment Committee Chair. Case transferred to the calendar of Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald for all further proceedings. All discovery matters are transferred to Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. Case number now reads as 2:20-CV-11810 JLS(MAAx). (rn)
January 8, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant Honeywell International, Inc. (FILED IN STATE COURT (December 31, 2020) SUBMITTED AS ATTACHED EXHIBIT A TO NOTICE #64 .) (iv)
January 8, 2021 Filing 69 DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Defendant Genuine Parts Company.. (Haruthunian, Zorik)
January 8, 2021 Filing 68 DISCLOSURE Amended Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant John Crane, Inc. (Weglarz, Claire)
January 8, 2021 Filing 67 DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL filed by Defendant Honeywell International, Inc. (Elford, Katherine)
January 8, 2021 Filing 66 DISCLOSURE of STATEMENT AND CERTIFICATION AS TO INTERESTED PARTIES filed by Defendant Honeywell International, Inc. (Elford, Katherine)
January 8, 2021 Filing 65 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Katherine C Elford on behalf of Defendant Honeywell International, Inc. (Attorney Katherine C Elford added to party Honeywell International, Inc.(pty:dft))(Elford, Katherine)
January 8, 2021 Filing 64 NOTICE OF RE-FILING STATE COURT ANSWER TO COMPLAINT filed by DEFENDANT Honeywell International, Inc.. (Elford, Katherine)
January 8, 2021 Filing 63 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiffs Brian H. Carpenter, Janet E. Carpenter, Michael S. Carpenter, Teri D. Carpenter, Tanya D. Hardin. Related Case(s): 2:20-cv-11797 (Kim, George)
January 7, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF ORIGINAL FILED ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant FMC Corp. (FILED IN STATE COURT 1/4/2021) SUBMITTED AS ATTACHED EXHIBIT 1 TO NOTICE #60 .) (iv)
January 7, 2021 Filing 62 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Justin F. Cronin on behalf of Defendant General Electric Company (Attorney Justin F. Cronin added to party General Electric Company(pty:dft))(Cronin, Justin)
January 7, 2021 Filing 61 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Justin F. Cronin on behalf of Defendant ViacomCBS, Inc. (Attorney Justin F. Cronin added to party ViacomCBS, Inc.(pty:dft))(Cronin, Justin)
January 7, 2021 Filing 60 NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT ANSWER AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL filed by Defendant FMC Corp.. (Schatz, Russell)
January 7, 2021 Filing 59 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant FMC Corp., identifying The Vanguard Group. (Schatz, Russell)
January 7, 2021 Filing 58 First NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Russell W Schatz, Jr on behalf of Defendant FMC Corp. (Attorney Russell W Schatz, Jr added to party FMC Corp.(pty:dft))(Schatz, Russell)
January 7, 2021 Filing 57 First NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Timothy C Pieper on behalf of Defendant FMC Corp. (Attorney Timothy C Pieper added to party FMC Corp.(pty:dft))(Pieper, Timothy)
January 7, 2021 Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Erin N Empting on behalf of Defendant ViacomCBS, Inc. (Attorney Erin N Empting added to party ViacomCBS, Inc.(pty:dft))(Empting, Erin)
January 7, 2021 Filing 55 First NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Francis D Pond on behalf of Defendant FMC Corp. (Attorney Francis D Pond added to party FMC Corp.(pty:dft))(Pond, Francis)
January 7, 2021 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Erin N Empting on behalf of Defendant General Electric Company (Attorney Erin N Empting added to party General Electric Company(pty:dft))(Empting, Erin)
January 7, 2021 Filing 53 JOINDER filed by Defendant General Electric Company joining in Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration of Kevin D. Jamison in support of Joinder)(Jamison, Kevin)
January 7, 2021 Filing 52 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant General Electric Company, (Jamison, Kevin)
January 7, 2021 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Kevin D. Jamison on behalf of Defendant General Electric Company (Jamison, Kevin)
January 7, 2021 Filing 50 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery),,,,,, and Demand for Jury Trial filed by Defendant General Electric Company.(Attorney Kevin D. Jamison added to party General Electric Company(pty:dft))(Jamison, Kevin)
January 7, 2021 Filing 49 JOINDER filed by Defendant ViacomCBS, Inc. joining in Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration of Kevin D. Jamison in support of Joinder)(Jamison, Kevin)
January 7, 2021 Filing 48 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant ViacomCBS, Inc., identifying ViacomCBS Inc. and National Amusements, Inc.. (Jamison, Kevin)
January 7, 2021 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Kevin D. Jamison on behalf of Defendant ViacomCBS, Inc. (Jamison, Kevin)
January 7, 2021 Filing 46 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery),,,,,, and Demand for Jury Trial filed by Defendant ViacomCBS, Inc..(Attorney Kevin D. Jamison added to party ViacomCBS, Inc.(pty:dft))(Jamison, Kevin)
January 7, 2021 Filing 45 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery),,,,,, filed by Defendant John Crane, Inc..(Attorney Claire C Weglarz added to party John Crane, Inc.(pty:dft))(Weglarz, Claire)
January 7, 2021 Filing 44 Declination of Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction filed by (Hugo, Edward)
January 7, 2021 Filing 43 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant John Crane, Inc. (Weglarz, Claire)
January 7, 2021 Filing 42 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant OReilly Auto Enterprises, LLC, identifying CSK Auto, Inc.. (Hugo, Edward)
January 7, 2021 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Edward R. Hugo on behalf of Defendant OReilly Auto Enterprises, LLC (Hugo, Edward)
January 7, 2021 Filing 40 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery),,,,,, filed by Defendant OReilly Auto Enterprises, LLC.(Attorney Edward R. Hugo added to party OReilly Auto Enterprises, LLC(pty:dft))(Hugo, Edward)
January 7, 2021 Filing 39 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by DEFENDANT Foster Wheeler, LLC, served on 01/07/21. (Hugo, Edward)
January 7, 2021 Filing 38 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by DEFENDANT Foster Wheeler, LLC, (Hugo, Edward)
January 7, 2021 Filing 37 DECLINED STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge filed by DEFENDANT Foster Wheeler, LLC. (Hugo, Edward)
January 7, 2021 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Edward R. Hugo on behalf of Defendant Foster Wheeler, LLC (Hugo, Edward)
January 7, 2021 Filing 35 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery),,,,,, NOTICE OF REFILING STATE COURT ANSWER TO COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL filed by DEFENDANT Foster Wheeler, LLC.(Attorney Edward R. Hugo added to party Foster Wheeler, LLC(pty:dft))(Hugo, Edward)
January 7, 2021 Filing 34 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant M. Slayen and Associates, Inc., identifying M. Slayen & Associates Inc. (Bergstrom, Emily)
January 7, 2021 Filing 33 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by DEFENDANT Nibco, Inc., served on 01/07/21. (Hugo, Edward)
January 7, 2021 Filing 32 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery),,,,,, for Wrongful Death - Asbestos filed by Defendant M. Slayen and Associates, Inc..(Attorney Emily D Bergstrom added to party M. Slayen and Associates, Inc.(pty:dft))(Bergstrom, Emily)
January 7, 2021 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Edward R. Hugo on behalf of Defendant Nibco, Inc. (Hugo, Edward)
January 7, 2021 Filing 30 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by DEFENDANT Nibco, Inc., (Hugo, Edward)
January 7, 2021 Filing 29 DECLINED STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge filed by DEFENDANT Nibco, Inc.. (Hugo, Edward)
January 7, 2021 Filing 28 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by DEFENDANT Nibco, Inc., (Hugo, Edward)
January 7, 2021 Filing 27 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery),,,,,, filed by DEFENDANT Nibco, Inc..(Attorney Edward R. Hugo added to party Nibco, Inc.(pty:dft))(Hugo, Edward)
January 7, 2021 Filing 26 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner to Judge Fernando M. Olguin for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2:20-cv-11810 FMO(JCx). (rn)
January 7, 2021 Filing 25 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Union Carbide Corporation, re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #22 , Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #24 , Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #23 , Answer to Complaint (Discovery) #20 served on January 7, 2021. (Landis, Ryan)
January 7, 2021 Filing 24 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ryan S Landis counsel for Defendant Union Carbide Corporation. Adding Stephen M. Nichols as counsel of record for Union Carbide Corporation for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Union Carbide Corporation. (Landis, Ryan)
January 7, 2021 Filing 23 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ryan S Landis counsel for Defendant Union Carbide Corporation. Adding Ryan S. Landis as counsel of record for Union Carbide Corporation for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Union Carbide Corporation. (Landis, Ryan)
January 7, 2021 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Union Carbide Corporation, identifying The Dow Chemical Company and Dow, Inc.. (Landis, Ryan)
January 7, 2021 Filing 21 DEFENDANT GENUINE PARTS COMPANY'S NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES PURSUANT TO FRCP RULE 7.1 AND LOCAL RULE 7.1-1 filed by Defendant Genuine Parts Company, identifying Genuine Parts Company. (Haruthunian, Zorik)
January 7, 2021 Filing 20 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery),,,,,, WRONGFUL DEATH filed by Defendant Union Carbide Corporation.(Attorney Ryan S Landis added to party Union Carbide Corporation(pty:dft))(Landis, Ryan)
January 7, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance of Frank D. Pond filed by Defendant Genuine Parts Company. (Haruthunian, Zorik)
January 7, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Weir Valves and Controls USA, Inc., identifying The Weir Group PLC. (Putnam, Kurt)
January 7, 2021 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery),,,,,, filed by Defendant Weir Valves and Controls USA, Inc..(Attorney Kurt T Putnam added to party Weir Valves and Controls USA, Inc.(pty:dft))(Putnam, Kurt)
January 7, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance of Zorik "Rick" Haruthunian filed by Defendant Genuine Parts Company. (Haruthunian, Zorik)
January 7, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Genuine Parts Company, identifying Genuine Parts Company. (Haruthunian, Zorik)
January 7, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance of Lafayette J. Clarke filed by Defendant Genuine Parts Company. (Haruthunian, Zorik)
January 7, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Apperance filed by Defendant Genuine Parts Company. Michael A. Graham (Haruthunian, Zorik)
January 7, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Genuine Parts Company, identifying Genuine Parts Company. (Haruthunian, Zorik)
January 7, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery),,,,,, filed by Defendant Genuine Parts Company.(Attorney Zorik Haruthunian added to party Genuine Parts Company(pty:dft))(Haruthunian, Zorik)
January 6, 2021 Filing 10 DECLINED STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge filed by Defendant Syd Carpenter Marine Contractor. (Attorney Arpi Galfayan added to party Syd Carpenter Marine Contractor(pty:dft))(Galfayan, Arpi)
January 6, 2021 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Syd Carpenter Marine Contractor (Galfayan, Arpi)
January 6, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE Of Filing State Court Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint for Wrongful Death-Asbestos; Demand For Jury Trial filed by Defendant Syd Carpenter Marine Contractor. (Galfayan, Arpi)
January 6, 2021 Filing 7 DECLINED STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge filed by Defendant Chevron USA, Inc.. (Galfayan, Arpi)
January 6, 2021 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Chevron USA, Inc. identifying Chevron U.S.A. Holdings Inc. and Chevron Corporation as Corporate Parent. (Galfayan, Arpi)
January 6, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery),,,,,, filed by Defendant Chevron USA, Inc..(Attorney Arpi Galfayan added to party Chevron USA, Inc.(pty:dft))(Galfayan, Arpi)
January 5, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachments No. 1 Civil Cover Sheet should not have been attached to Docket Entry No. 1. Each document should have been filed separately. You are not required to take any action to correct this deficiency unless the Court so directs. (lh)
January 5, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (Attachments: #1 CV-11C) (lh)
December 31, 2020 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants 3M Company, A.W. Chesterton Co., ASCO Valve, Inc., Air and Liquid Systems Corporation, Armstrong International, Inc., Aurora Pump Company, AutoZone, Inc., BP Amoco Chemical Company, BP Products North American, Inc., BW IP, Inc., Carver Pump Company, Chevron USA, Inc., Copes-Vulcan, Inc., Crane Co., Crosby Valves, LLC, Crown Cork and Seal USA, Inc., Does, FMC Corp., Flowserve U.S., Inc.(as successor-in-interest to Durametallic Corporation), Flowserve U.S., Inc.(solely as successor to Rockwell Manufacturing Company and Nordstrom Valves, Inc.), Foster Wheeler, LLC, Gardner Denver, Inc., General Electric Company, Genuine Parts Company, Goulds Pumps, LLC, Grinnell, LLC, Honeywell International, Inc., Howden Buffalo, Inc., IMO Industries, Inc., J.T. Thorpe and Son, Inc., John Crane, Inc., M. Slayen and Associates, Inc., Metalclad Insulation, LLC, Morse Tec, LLC, Nibco, Inc., OReilly Auto Enterprises, LLC, OReilly Automotive Stores, Inc., Spirax Sarco, Inc., Superior Lidgerwood Mundy Corporation, Syd Carpenter Marine Contractor, Taco, Inc., The Pep Boys-Manny, Moe and Jack of California, Inc., Union Carbide Corporation, Velan Valve Corporation, ViacomCBS, Inc., Warren Pumps, LLC, Weir Valves and Controls USA, Inc..(Filing fee $ 402) Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiffs Brian H. Carpenter, Janet E. Carpenter, Michael S. Carpenter, Teri D. Carpenter, Tanya D. Hardin. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 11/06/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
December 31, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Metalclad Insulation, LLC, identifying ENTRX LLC (Holding Company). (Carpenter, Erin)
December 31, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 20STCV42830 Receipt No: ACACDC-29809626 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Metalclad Insulation, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 of Erin M. Carpenter, #3 of Dan H. Heflin, P.E.) (Attorney Erin M Carpenter added to party Metalclad Insulation, LLC(pty:dft))(Carpenter, Erin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Janet E. Carpenter et al v. 3M Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet E. Carpenter
Represented By: George H Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tanya D. Hardin
Represented By: George H Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian H. Carpenter
Represented By: George H Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teri D. Carpenter
Represented By: George H Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael S. Carpenter
Represented By: George H Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gardner Denver, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spirax Sarco, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carver Pump Company
Represented By: Robert Harvey Berkes
Represented By: Karen Lynn Finateri Silbiger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Kevin D. Jamison
Represented By: Justin F. Cronin
Represented By: Erin N Empting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.W. CHESTERTON CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Represented By: Geoffrey M Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Syd Carpenter Marine Contractor Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AutoZone, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION, as successor in interest to Buffalo Pumps, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASCO VALVE, INC.
Represented By: Elizabeth J Carpenter
Represented By: Gary D Sharp
Represented By: Melanie L Ameele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CROSBY VALVES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Slayen & Associates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO INDUSTRIES, INC., individually and as successor to DeLaval Turbine, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMC CORP., on behalf of its former Peerless Pump, Chicago Pump, Northern Pump and Coffin Pumps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLOWSERVE U.S., INC., solely as successor to Rockwell Manufacturing Company and Nordstrom Valves, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Copes-Vulcan, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurora Pump Company
Represented By: Christine D Calareso
Represented By: Luis Alfonso Barba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WEIR VALVES & CONTROLS USA, INC., f/k/a Atwood & Morrill Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENUINE PARTS COMPANY
Represented By: Zorik Haruthunian
Represented By: Francis D Pond
Represented By: Lafayette J Clarke
Represented By: Michael A Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taco, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nibco, Inc.
Represented By: Charles S Park
Represented By: Edward R Hugo
Represented By: Paul S Atigapramoj
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metalclad Insulation, LLC
Represented By: Erin M Carpenter
Represented By: Connor Matthew Scott
Represented By: Bradford J DeJardin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viacom CBS, INC. f/k/a CBS Corporation, a Pennsylvania Corporation, f/k/a Westinghouse Electric Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE PEP BOYS-MANNY, MOE & JACK OF CALIFORNIA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FOSTER WHEELER, LLC, as survivor to the Merger with Foster Wheeler Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armstrong International, Inc.
Represented By: Christine D Calareso
Represented By: Luis Alfonso Barba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Represented By: Ryan S Landis
Represented By: Farah Sohaili Nicol
Represented By: Stephen M Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Crane, Inc.
Represented By: Claire C Weglarz
Represented By: Fred B Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GRINNELL, LLC
Represented By: Joseph Duffy
Represented By: Amy Jo Talarico
Represented By: Alyssa D O'Donnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OReilly Automotive Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Edward R Hugo
Represented By: Alex G Taheri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.T. Thorpe & Son, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crown Cork & Seal USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP PRODUCTS NORTH AMERICAN, INC., f/k/a Amoco Oil Company; BW/IP, INC., and its wholly owned subsidiaries Byron Jackson Pumps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC., f/k/a Allied Signal, Inc., successor in interest to The Bendix Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHEVRON USA, INC., f/k/a Standard Oil Company of California, U.S.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUPERIOR LIDGERWOOD MUNDY CORPORATION, a/k/a Lidgerwood Manufacturing Co., individually and as successor in interest to M.T. Davidson Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOULDS PUMPS, LLC
Represented By: Joseph Duffy
Represented By: Amy Jo Talarico
Represented By: Alyssa D O'Donnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOWDEN BUFFALO, INC., individually and as successor in interest to Buffalo Forge Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP AMOCO CHEMICAL COMPANY, a/k/a Amoco Chemicals Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MORSE TEC, LLC, f/k/a BorgWarner Morse TEC, LLC and successor by merger to Borg-Warner Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OReilly Auto Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: Edward R Hugo
Represented By: Alex G Taheri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Velan Valve Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morse Tec, LLC
Represented By: Erin M Carpenter
Represented By: Connor Matthew Scott
Represented By: Bradford J DeJardin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Superior Lidgerwood Mundy Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ViacomCBS, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin D. Jamison
Represented By: Justin F. Cronin
Represented By: Erin N Empting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International, Inc.
Represented By: Katherine C Elford
Represented By: Colleen Elizabeth Baime
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chevron USA, Inc.
Represented By: Robert H Baronian
Represented By: Michael Howard Schuck
Represented By: Andy Justin Goetz
Represented By: Arpi Galfayan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP Amoco Chemical Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP Products North American, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weir Valves and Controls USA, Inc.
Represented By: Emily D Bergstrom
Represented By: Kurt T Putnam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler, LLC
Represented By: Charles S Park
Represented By: Edward R Hugo
Represented By: Paul S Atigapramoj
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.T. Thorpe and Son, Inc.
Represented By: Connor Matthew Scott
Represented By: Erin M Carpenter
Represented By: Bradford J DeJardin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viacom, Inc., successor by merger to CBS Corporation, a Pennsylvania corporation
Represented By: Kevin D. Jamison
Represented By: Justin F. Cronin
Represented By: Erin N Empting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-350, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crown Cork and Seal USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westinghouse Electric Corporation
Represented By: Kevin D. Jamison
Represented By: Justin F. Cronin
Represented By: Erin N Empting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Syd Carpenter Marine Contractor
Represented By: Robert H Baronian
Represented By: Andy Justin Goetz
Represented By: Carla Lynn Crochet
Represented By: Michael Howard Schuck
Represented By: Arpi Galfayan
Represented By: Kenneth B Prindle
Represented By: Jeremy David Milbrodt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amoco Chemicals Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation, a Delaware corporation
Represented By: Kevin D. Jamison
Represented By: Justin F. Cronin
Represented By: Erin N Empting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howden Buffalo, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Standard Oil Company of California, U.S.
Represented By: Robert H Baronian
Represented By: Michael Howard Schuck
Represented By: Andy Justin Goetz
Represented By: Arpi Galfayan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atwood and Morrill Co., Inc.
Represented By: Emily D Bergstrom
Represented By: Kurt T Putnam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowserve U.S., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Pep Boys-Manny, Moe and Jack of California, Inc.
Represented By: Erin M Carpenter
Represented By: Connor Matthew Scott
Represented By: Bradford J DeJardin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMC Corp.
Represented By: Russell W Schatz, Jr
Represented By: Francis D Pond
Represented By: Timothy C Pieper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lidgerwood Manufacturing Co, individually and as successor in interest to M.T. Davidson Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Slayen and Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick Mark Mahoney
Represented By: Emily D Bergstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air and Liquid Systems Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BW IP, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Borgwarner Morse Tec, LLC and successor by merger to Borg-Warner Corporation
Represented By: Erin M Carpenter
Represented By: Connor Matthew Scott
Represented By: Bradford J DeJardin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amoco Oil Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AlliedSignal, Inc., successor in interest to The Bendix Corporation
Represented By: Katherine C Elford
Represented By: Colleen Elizabeth Baime
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?