Torrance Egan Black v. Jim Robertson
Petitioner: Torrance Egan Black
Respondent: Jim Robertson
Case Number: 2:2020cv11823
Filed: December 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Alka Sagar
Referring Judge: Mark C Scarsi
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2021 Filing 7 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Petitioner Torrance Egan Black. (rn)
February 18, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE of California Attorney General Office Christopher G. Sanchez on behalf of Respondent Jim Robertson. (Attorney Christopher George Sanchez added to party Jim Robertson(pty:res))(Sanchez, Christopher)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REQUIRING RESPONSE TO FIRST AMENDED PETITION (28 U.S.C. 2254) by Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. IT IS ORDERED that: Before February 18, 2021, Respondent shall file and serve a Notice of Appearance. If Respondent contends that the First Amended Petition can be decided without the Court addressing the merits of Petitioner's claims, Respondent shall file a Motion to Dismiss on or before March 5, 2021. If Respondent does not contend that the First Amended Petition can be decided without the Court reaching the merits of Petitioner's claims, Respondent shall file and serve an Answer to the First Amended Petition on or before April 5, 2021. (see document for further details). Notice: The court has issued a ruling on preliminary review. Pursuant to the Agreement on Acceptance of Service between the Clerk of Court and the California Attorney Generals Office, this Notice constitutes service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Copy of First Amended Petition, #2 Blank Consent Form) (hr)
February 1, 2021 Filing 4 FIRST AMENDED PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS against Respondent Jim Robertson amending Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254) #1 , filed by Petitioner Torrance Egan Black(hr)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER REQUIRING THE FILING OF FIRST AMENDED PETITION OR NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. Within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order (by no later than February 16, 2021), Petitioner is ORDERED to file a First Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person in Federal Custody, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241 ("First Amended Petition") or a First Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person in State Custody, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2254 ("First Amended Petition"), on the proper Central District form (which forms the Clerk of the Court is directed to provide to Petitioner). If Petitioner is attempting to file a civil rights action pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 1983, within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order (by no later than February 16, 2021), Petitioner is ORDERED to file a voluntary dismissal of this action. (see document for further details) (Attachments: #1 Blank Federal Habeas Petition Form, #2 Blank Civil Rights Complaint Form, #3 Blank Notice of Dismissal Form) (hr)
January 7, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge Mark C. Scarsi and referred to Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (Attachments: #1 CV-111) (lh)
December 31, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person In State Custody (28:2254) filed as Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person in Federal custody (28:2241). Case assigned to Judge Mark C. Scarsi and referred to Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar.(Filing fee $ 5 Due), filed by Petitioner Torrance Egan Black. (lh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Torrance Egan Black v. Jim Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Torrance Egan Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jim Robertson
Represented By: Christopher George Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?