MaxLite, Inc. v. ATG Electronics, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: MaxLite, Inc. f/k/a SK America, Inc. d/b/a MaxLite, MaxLite, Inc. a New Jersey Corporation formerly known as SK America, Inc. doing business as MaxLite and SK America, Inc.
Defendant: SOPHIA C. GALLEHER, ATG ELECTRONICS, INC., JAMES D. STEEDLY and MATTHEW KIM
Respondent: DAVID WYATT
In Re: In Re Subpoena to David Wyatt
Case Number: 2:2020mc00070
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Autumn D Spaeth
Referring Judge: Josephine L Staton
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH SUBPOENA by Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. **NOTE CHANGES MADE BY THE COURT** the Court orders the following: 1) MaxLite's Motion to Compel Compliance with Subpoena #1 is GRANTED; 2) David Wyatt is ordered to comply with the Subpoena, and produce responsive documents on or before August 31, 2020; and 3) David Wyatt is ordered to comply with the Subpoena, and appear for a deposition either in-person or via virtual means on or before September 9, 2020. (kh)
August 14, 2020 Filing 13 REPLY filed by Plaintiff MaxLite, Inc. to Objection #7 in Further Support of Motion to Compel Compliance with Subpoena (Purcaro, Kelly)
August 10, 2020 Filing 12 SUPPLEMENT to APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Kelly M. Purcaro to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff MaxLite, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-27375855) #5 filed by Plaintiff MaxLite, Inc.. (Purcaro, Kelly)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER REQUIRING REPLY by Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth, re: Opposition to Motion to Compel Compliance with Subpoena #7 . Plaintiff is ordered to file a reply to Defendant's Opposition by no later than Friday, August 14, 2020. (hr)
August 10, 2020 Filing 10 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) RE MOTION TO COMPEL by Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth: The hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Compel #1 , presently set for hearing before Magistrate Judge Rosenbluth on August 13, 2020 at 10:00am, is RE-SET to August 19, 2020 at 10:00 and will be conducted telephonically before Magistrate Judge Spaeth. Call information to be provided via separate email. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kh) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TRANSFERRING CIVIL ACTION pursuant to General Order 05-07. ORDER case transferred from Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth to the calendar of Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth for any discovery matters. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-mc-00070 JLS (ADSx). Signed by Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (esa)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TRANSFERRING CIVIL ACTION pursuant General Order 19-03. ORDER case transferred from Judge Dale S. Fischer to the calendar of Judge Josephine L. Staton for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-mc-00070 JLS (JPRx). Signed by Judge Dale S. Fischer and Josephine L. Staton. (esa)
August 6, 2020 Filing 7 OBJECTIONS to Application/Motion/Request (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 Opposition to Motion to Compel Deposition filed by Material Witness David Wyatt. (Swensen, Neal)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer: granting #5 Non-Resident Attorney Kelly M Purcaro APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff MaxLite, Inc., designating Marc L Godino as local counsel. (jp)
July 27, 2020 Filing 5 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Kelly M. Purcaro to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff MaxLite, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-27375855) filed by Plaintiff MaxLite, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Godino, Marc)
July 20, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF HEARING on Motion to Compel Compliance with Subpoena by Clerk of Court. Counsel is hereby notified that the Application/Motion/Request (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 is set for hearing. Motion set for hearing on 8/13/2020 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ghap) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 20, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Kelly M Purcaro on behalf of Plaintiff. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap)
July 20, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (ghap)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION to Compel Compliance with Subpoena Receipt No: ACACDC-27258687 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff MaxLite, Inc. f/k/a SK America, Inc. d/b/a MaxLite. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of KELLY M. PURCARO, #3 Exhibit 1 - Subpoena, #4 Exhibit 2 - Amended Complaint, #5 Exhibit 3 - Letter, #6 Exhibit 4 - Proof of Service, #7 Exhibit 5 - Letter, #8 Exhibit 6- Letter, #9 Exhibit 7 - Letter, #10 Exhibit 8 - Letter, #11 Exhibit 9 - Letter, #12 Exhibit 10 - Letter, #13 Exhibit 11 - Initial Disclosures, #14 Exhibit 12 - Initial Disclosures, #15 Exhibit 13 - Discovery Responses, #16 Exhibit 14 - Subpoena, #17 Exhibit 15 - Emails, #18 Exhibit 16 - Emails, #19 Exhibit 17 - Mediation Order) (Attorney Marc L Godino added to party MaxLite, Inc. f/k/a SK America, Inc. d/b/a MaxLite(pty:pla))(Godino, Marc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MaxLite, Inc. v. ATG Electronics, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: DAVID WYATT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOPHIA C. GALLEHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ATG ELECTRONICS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES D. STEEDLY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MATTHEW KIM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MaxLite, Inc. f/k/a SK America, Inc. d/b/a MaxLite
Represented By: Marc L Godino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MaxLite, Inc. a New Jersey Corporation formerly known as SK America, Inc. doing business as MaxLite
Represented By: Kelly M Purcaro
Represented By: Marc L Godino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SK America, Inc.
Represented By: Kelly M Purcaro
Represented By: Marc L Godino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: In Re Subpoena to David Wyatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?