Terri Leith v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Plaintiff: Donna Clark, Bonnie Crawford, Willie Morgan, Jacqueline Capponi, Virdona Strube, Debra Galbraith, Amparo Libreros, Annette Barrows, Mary Albecker, Debbie Horton, Linda Kuenzli, Violet Rappuchi, Martha Serres, Elizabeth Mustin, Kimberly Schuler, Natalie Jackson, Doris Castilleja, Sandra Bailey, Cheryl Murphy, Janice Simons, JoAnne Nichols, Maria Morales, Jennifer Riddle, Janet Meacham, Faith Meyer, Rebecca Peterson, Gloria Ramirez, Cathy Wilson, Connie Arnette, Paula Davis, Barbara King, Georgia Rich, Sharon Iverson, Carolanne Potts, Nancy Esidor, Alice Revells, Glenda Griffin, Llewelly Edwards, Debra Hammitt, Jo Ann Pugh, Terenitia Rodriguez, Lorna Marple, Rosemary Flores, Susan Murzycki, Amy Moreira, Maria White, Deborah Proctor, Sharon Mullay, Tina Samaniego, Gina McSweeney, Paula Lubinsky, Patricia Edenborg-Gorman, Dorothy Breytenbach, Rosa Graciani, Jeri Pryor, Gwendolyn Knox, Martha Lopez, Fran Banach, Josephine Karstetter, Beatriz Sandoval, Charlotte Storms, Malissa Brown, Lisa Ramirez, Marsha Faircloth, Daria Worley, Ottie Turnmyre, Darlene Endl, Deline Boyse, Terri Leith, Betty Jean Hall, Irene Mikula, Karin Boyer, Peggy Dosch, Mamie Stanga, Nicole Bettin, Michelle Marini, Jacquelyn Friend, Andrea Robin, Nina Schultz, Peggy Clawson, Andrea Cogley, Katherine Carnahan, Tammy Cook, Angela Howard, Susann Thrasher, Sally Bissell, Kandyce Singletary, Patricia De La Fuentte, Rose Ellen Pepsin, Debbie Brock, Beryl Velguth, Carol Ranson, Linda Davis and Sheree Sweetland
Defendant: DOES 1 through 500, Ethicon Inc, Ethicon LLC and Johnson & Johnson
Case Number: 2:2021cv00078
Filed: January 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Pedro V Castillo
Referring Judge: Dean D Pregerson
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2021 Filing 95 APPLICATION to Substitute attorney Mollie F. Benedict, Joshua J. Wes and Nicholas V. Janizeh in place of attorney Christy D. Jones, William M. Gage, Kari L. Sutherland, David B. Thomas and Susan M. Robinson filed by Defendants Ethicon Inc, Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Wes, Joshua)
January 6, 2021 Filing 94 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney William M Gage. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (esa)
January 6, 2021 Filing 93 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Kari L Sutherland. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (esa)
January 6, 2021 Filing 92 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Susan M Robinson. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (esa)
January 6, 2021 Filing 91 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney David B Thomas. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (esa)
January 6, 2021 Filing 90 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Christy D Jones. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (esa)
January 6, 2021 Filing 89 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey Ray Vaughn. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (esa)
January 6, 2021 Filing 88 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Scott A Love. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (esa)
January 6, 2021 Filing 87 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Clayton A Clark. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (esa)
January 6, 2021 Filing 86 NOTICE OF RECEIPT OF CASE TRANSFERRED IN: Formerly Case Number: 2:15-cv-05856, from Southern District of West Virginia. The above-referenced case has been transferred to this district and assigned the above civil case number 2:21-cv-00078 DDP (PVCx). (esa)
January 6, 2021 Filing 85 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
January 6, 2021 Filing 84 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (esa)
January 6, 2021 Filing 83 ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from West Virginia Southern
January 5, 2021 Filing 82 CONDITIONAL REMAND ORDER, JUDICIAL PANEL ON MDL: certified copy transferring this civil action; the coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings have been completed and remand to the transferor court, as provided in 28 U.S.C. 1407(a), is appropriate; this action is remanded to the transferor court. Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel on 01/05/2021. (cc: attys) (kew) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/6/2021.]
December 23, 2020 Filing 81 JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit MDL ECF (238) First Amended Master Long Form Complaint, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (239) Master Answer of Ethicon, Inc. to First Amended Master Complaint, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (240) Master Answer of Ethicon LLC to First Amended Master Complaint, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (241) Master Answer of Johnson & Johnson to First Amended Master Complaint, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (262) - Short Form Complaint, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (263) Amended Short Form Complaint)(Gage, William) (Modified on 12/29/2020 to add party filer) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/6/2021.]
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER AND SUGGESTION OF REMAND Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407 and the Rules for Multidistrict Litigation, the court suggests that this case be remanded to the court from which it came, on or before 12/24/2020 the parties are directed to confer and to file in this case, all documents from the main MDL that the parties jointly deem relevant to constitute an appropriate record for the receiving court to consider; the court directs that upon receipt and filing of an order to remand from the Clerk of the JPMDL, the Clerk shall remand this case to the United States District for the Central District of California; on the Transfer Date, the Clerk is directed to use the appropriate function in CM/ECF to extract this case and remand it to the Central District of California; after remand of this case, the Clerk is directed to formally close this case and strike it from the docket. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 12/17/2020. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (kew) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/6/2021.]
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER (Dismissing Case With Prejudice) granting #74 , #75 , #76 , #77 , #78 MOTIONS to Dismiss With Prejudice due to civil action being compromised and settled for certain plaintiffs; further directing the "Does 1 through 500" are dismissed from this action as to all plaintiffs; Plaintiff Terri Leith remains as a plaintiff, and the case should remain open as to her against Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson and Ethicon, LLC. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 12/8/2020. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (ts) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/6/2021.]
November 18, 2020 Filing 78 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson to Dismiss With Prejudice due to civil action being compromised and settled. (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/6/2021.]
November 18, 2020 Filing 77 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson to Dismiss With Prejudice due to civil action being compromised and settled. (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/6/2021.]
November 18, 2020 Filing 76 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson to Dismiss With Prejudice due to civil action being compromised and settled. (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/6/2021.]
November 18, 2020 Filing 75 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson to Dismiss With Prejudice due to civil action being compromised and settled. (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/6/2021.]
November 18, 2020 Filing 74 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson to Dismiss With Prejudice due to civil action being compromised and settled. (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/6/2021.]
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER (Dismissing Certain Plaintiffs With Prejudice) granting #71 MOTION by Johnson & Johnson Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, to Dismiss Certain Plaintiffs With Prejudice due to civil action being compromised and settled, and the claims of Carol Ranson, Alice Revells, Georgia Rich, Andrea Robin, Beatriz Sandoval, Kimberly Schuler, Martha Serres, Janice Simons, Kandyce Singletary, Mamie Stanga, Charlotte Storms, Sheree Sweetland, Susan Thrasher, Ottie Turnmyre, Beryl Velguth, Maria White and Rosemary Flores against the Ethicon defendants are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE and STRICKEN from the docket. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 4/20/2020. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (st) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/6/2021.]
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER (Dismissing Certain Plaintiffs With Prejudice) granting #70 MOTION by Johnson & Johnson, Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC to Dismiss Certain Plaintiffs With Prejudice due to civil action being compromised and settled, and the claims of Michelle Marini, Gina McSweeney, Irene Mikula, Amy Moreira Galinelli, Sharon Mullay, Cheryl Murphy, Joanne Nichols, Rose Ellen Pepsin, Carolanne Potts, Jo-Ann Pugh and Lisa Ramirez against the Ethicon defendants are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE and STRICKEN from the docket. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 4/20/2020. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (st) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/6/2021.]
April 3, 2020 Filing 71 MOTION by Johnson & Johnson Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, to Dismiss Certain Plaintiffs With Prejudice due to civil action being compromised and settled. (Gage, William) (Modified on 4/6/2020 to add party filer) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/6/2021.]
April 3, 2020 Filing 70 MOTION by Johnson & Johnson, Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC to Dismiss Certain Plaintiffs With Prejudice due to civil action being compromised and settled. (Gage, William) (Modified on 4/6/2020 to add party filer) (msa) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/6/2021.]
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER The #63 and #64 MOTIONS by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson to Dismiss With Prejudice are GRANTED and the claims of Jennifer Riddle and Jeri Pryor are dismissed with prejudice against the Ethicon defendants. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 12/17/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (st) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/6/2021.]
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER directing that the #65 and #66 Orders are VACATED as to this civil action only; the claims of Ms. Rodriquez only be dismissed without prejudice; the Clerk is directed to reinstate this case to the active docket and dismiss the claims of Terenitia Rodriquez. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 12/17/2019. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (kew) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/6/2021.]
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting the Motions filed in MDL 2327 by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Substitute Susan M. Robinson as Counsel in lieu of David B. Thomas, and to Substitute William M. Gage as Counsel in lieu of Christy D. Jones; the Clerk is directed to terminate Christy D. Jones and to substitute William M. Gage as counsel of record, both on the main master docket and for each individual member case in MDL 2327 with which Christy D. Jones is associated, and to terminate David B. Thomas and to substitute Susan M. Robinson as counsel of record, both on the main master docket and for each individual member case in MDL 2327 with which David B. Thomas is associated. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/24/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (lca) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/6/2021.]
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 66 VACATED PURSUANT TO THE #68 ORDER ENTERED ON 12/17/2019: ORDER (Dismissing Cases With Prejudice) granting the #63 Motion to Dismiss With Prejudice filed by Johnson & Johnson, Ethicon, Inc., and/or Ethicon LLC; the cases listed on Exhibit A are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE and STRICKEN from the docket. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 9/14/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (st) (Modified on 12/17/2019 to note order has been vacated) (kew). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/6/2021.]
August 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 VACATED PURSUANT TO THE #68 ORDER ENTERED ON 12/17/2019: ORDER TO DISMISS DEFENDANTS WITHOUT PREJUDICE (PURSUANT TO PTO NO. 293 AS AMENDED BY PTO NO. 298 - NON-REVISION GYNECARE PRODUCTS) The Ethicon defendants are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE pursuant to the provisions of the Non-Revision PTOs and, in any case on Exhibit A where the Ethicon defendants are the only remaining defendants, the case is STRICKEN from the active docket; and for any case listed on Exhibit A that resides in the Ethicon MDL and names other MDL defendants other than the Ethicon defendants, plaintiffs shall file a Motion to Transfer MDLs within four (4) weeks of the entry of this Order. This Order is linked to the Proposed Order to Dismiss filed at ECF No. 6488 in MDL 2327. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 8/6/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (brn) (Modified on 12/17/2019 to note order has been vacated) (kew). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/6/2021.]
July 26, 2018 Filing 64 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson to Dismiss With Prejudice. (Sutherland, Kari) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/6/2021.]
July 26, 2018 Filing 63 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson to Dismiss With Prejudice. (Sutherland, Kari) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/6/2021.]
July 6, 2018 Filing 62 NON-REVISION ELECTION FORM: Dismissing the presently pending case without prejudice pursuant to the Pretrial Order; filed by Terenitia Rodriguez. (Moreland, W.) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/6/2021.]
May 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 61 PRETRIAL ORDER # 298 FIRST AMENDED ORDER REGARDING DISPOSITION OF NON-REVISION GYNECARE TVT PRODUCTS CASES This amended order revises certain future deadlines and addresses filing instructions regarding the Ethicon Election Form; the Order has been amended at paragraphs 2-5, paragraph 8(B)-(H), and Exhibit B; however, the remainder of this Order is substantively identical to PTO No. 293; if a plaintiff has already filed her Ethicon Election Form pursuant to the deadlines imposed by PTO No. 293, she is not required to re-file an Election Form; if an Election Form has not been filed it must be filed in each individual member case no later than 7/10/2018. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/15/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on the Second Amended Exhibit A) (kp) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/6/2021.]
April 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 60 PRETRIAL ORDER # 293 ORDER REGARDING DISPOSITION OF NON-REVISION GYNECARE TVT PRODUCTS CASES The Motion filed at ECF No. 5313 in MDL 2327 by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Order Regarding Disposition of Non-Revision Gynecare TVT Products Cases is GRANTED; each Non-Revised Plaintiff identified on the Second Amended Exhibit "A", together with any of her derivative plaintiffs with an existing MDL lawsuit, shall file an election form (Exhibit B to this Order) in each individual case no later than 6/10/2018; the deadlines for discovery and trial preparation procedures are set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 4/11/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on the Second Amended Exhibit A) (kp) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/6/2021.]
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE/ORDER This action is dismissed with prejudice as to plaintiff Deborah Proctor only, each party to bear its own costs. The claims of the remaining plaintiffs in this action will continue. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 3/23/2018. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (brn) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/6/2021.]
March 19, 2018 Filing 58 PLAINTIFF FACT SHEET filed by Andrea Robin. (Moreland, W.) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/6/2021.]
March 19, 2018 Filing 57 PLAINTIFF FACT SHEET filed by Debbie Horton. (Moreland, W.) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/6/2021.]
March 15, 2018 Filing 56 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE as to Plaintiff Deborah Proctor only by Deborah Proctor, Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson (Clark, Clayton) (Modified on 3/16/2018 to add party filers) (mek). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/6/2021.]
February 6, 2018 Filing 55 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Violet Rappuchi of Begum Ozel, MD on June 4, 2018 at 9:00 a.m. (Love, Scott) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/6/2021.]
February 6, 2018 Filing 54 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Violet Rappuchi of Seth Cohen, MD on June 4, 2018 at 9:00 a.m. (Love, Scott) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/6/2021.]
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 PRETRIAL ORDER # 280 (Docket Control Order - Ethicon, Inc. Wave 8 Cases) THIS PRETRIAL ORDER SETS MANDATORY DEADLINES FOR MOST OF THE REMAINING ETHICON, INC. CASES. The court ORDERS that this Docket Control Order be filed in the main MDL and, as of the time of that filing in every case listed on Exhibit A (hereinafter "Wave 8 cases") becomes subject to the deadlines in this Docket Control Order. For any cases in the Ethicon, Inc. MDL with a Covidien Wave 1 flag, the stay on the flagged Covidien Wave 1 cases is lifted and the Covidien Wave 1 cases in the Ethicon MDL are incorporated in the Ethicon, Inc., Wave 8 cases and subject to this Docket Control Order. The following deadlines apply in all Wave 8 cases: A. Scheduling Deadlines. Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 3/19/2018, Defendant Fact Sheets due by 4/19/2018, Deadline for written discovery requests due by 5/18/2018, Expert disclosure by plaintiffs due by 6/04/2018, Expert disclosure by defendants due by 7/05/2018, Expert disclosure for rebuttal purposes due by 7/23/2018, Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 9/04/2018, Deadline to file list of general causation experts in each individual Wave 8 case due by 9/11/2018, Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 9/21/2018, Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/05/2018, Reply to response to dispositive motions due by 10/12/2018, Filing of Daubert motions due by 10/05/2018, Responses to Daubert motions due by 10/19/2018, and Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 10/26/2018. B.4. Confidential Documents. In the event there are issues related to sealing of confidential documents that the parties are unable to resolve, they must be brought to the court's attention in a consolidated manner as follows: Any consolidated motion to seal is due on or before 8/10/2018, and any response is due by 8/24/2018. Any reply is due by 8/31/2018. C.1. Venue Recommendations. By no later than 8/27/2018 the parties shall meet and confer concerning the appropriate venue for each of the cases, and the parties are ORDERED to submit joint venue recommendations to the court by 9/03/2018. Additional directives are set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 1/30/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Ethicon Wave 8 Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (ts) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/6/2021.]
August 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER (Dismissing Cases with Prejudice) granting the Joint Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice filed in MDL 2327 by plaintiffs, identified on the attached Exhibit A, and Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, and Johnson & Johnson, to the extent they are named as defendants; pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), the parties are seeking dismissal of these actions with prejudice; the actions listed on the attached Exhibit A are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE and STRICKEN from the docket and any motions pending in the individual cases at the time of this dismissal are DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 8/23/2017. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit A (brn) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/6/2021.]
September 28, 2015 Filing 51 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Kari L. Sutherland on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Sutherland, Kari) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/6/2021.]
June 8, 2015 Filing 50 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by David B. Thomas on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Thomas, David) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/6/2021.]
May 28, 2015 Filing 49 RESPONSE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson in opposition to Plaintiffs' #47 Objection to the Court's Pretrial Order #176 (Jones, Christy) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/6/2021.]
May 28, 2015 Filing 48 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Christy D. Jones on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Jones, Christy) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/6/2021.]
May 19, 2015 Filing 47 OBJECTION by Mary Albecker, Connie Arnette, Sandra Bailey, Fran Banach, Annette Barrows, Nicole Bettin, Sally Bissell, Karin Boyer, Deline Boyse, Dorothy Breytenbach, Debbie Brock, Malissa Brown, Jacqueline Capponi, Katherine Carnahan, Doris Castilleja, Donna Clark, Peggy Clawson, Andrea Cogley, Tammy Cook, Bonnie Crawford, Linda Davis, Paula Davis, Patricia De La Fuentte, Peggy Dosch, Patricia Edenborg-Gorman, Llewelly Edwards, Darlene Endl, Nancy Esidor, Marsha Faircloth, Rosemary Flores, Jacquelyn Friend, Debra Galbraith, Rosa Graciani, Glenda Griffin, Betty Jean Hall, Debra Hammitt, Debbie Horton, Angela Howard, Sharon Iverson, Natalie Jackson, Josephine Karstetter, Barbara King, Gwendolyn Knox, Linda Kuenzli, Terri Leith, Amparo Libreros, Martha Lopez, Paula Lubinsky, Michelle Marini, Lorna Marple, Gina McSweeney, Janet Meacham, Faith Meyer, Irene Mikula, Maria Morales, Amy Moreira, Willie Morgan, Sharon Mullay, Cheryl Murphy, Susan Murzycki, Elizabeth Mustin, Joanne Nichols, Rose Ellen Pepsin, Rebecca Peterson, Carolanne Potts, Deborah Proctor, Jeri Pryor, Jo Ann Pugh, Gloria Ramirez, Lisa Ramirez, Carol Ranson, Violet Rappuchi, Alice Revells, Georgia Rich, Jennifer Riddle, Andrea Robin, Terenitia Rodriguez, Tina Samaniego, Beatriz Sandoval, Kimberly Schuler, Nina Schultz, Martha Serres, Janice Simons, Kandyce Singletary, Mamie Stanga, Charlotte Storms, Virdona Strube, Sheree Sweetland, Susann Thrasher, Ottie Turnmyre, Beryl Velguth, Maria White, Cathy Wilson, Daria Worley to the Court's #46 Pretrial Order #176. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Clark, Clayton) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/6/2021.]
May 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 46 PRETRIAL ORDER # 176 (Initial Order Regarding Severance of Actions) The Court finds that multiple plaintiff complaints should be severed; the filing of individual severed complaints is directed as set forth more fully herein and on Exhibits A and B; except for the first named and derivative plaintiff(s) and any plaintiff(s) who object, the remaining plaintiffs in the case listed on Exhibit A will be dismissed without prejudice on/around 5/29/2015; objections to this PTO due on/by 5/25/2015. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/13/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (REF: MDL 2327; 2:15-cv-5856, Rappuchi, et al) (cc: Clerk of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation; attys) (ts) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/6/2021.]
May 7, 2015 Filing 45 TRANSMITTED PRETRIAL ORDER # 173 (Final Order Regarding Severance of Actions) entered on 05/04/2015 in MDL 2327 to attorneys in member case. (kw) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/6/2021.]
May 6, 2015 Filing 44 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the California Central; Case Number 2:14-cv-07392. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/6/2021.]
May 6, 2015 Filing 43 Transfer Out Transmittal Letter sent to USDC Southern District of West Virginia at Charleston. (Attachments: #1 CV-57) (iva) [Transferred from California Central on 5/6/2015.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/6/2021.]
May 6, 2015 Filing 42 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-170)from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation MDL 2327, transferring case to USDC Southern District of West Virginia and assigned to the Honorable Judge Joseph R. Goodwin. Case electronically transferred. (iva) [Transferred from California Central on 5/6/2015.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/6/2021.]
April 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER ON CONSENT TO TRANSFER TO MULTI-DISTRICT LITIGATION AND AGREED MOTION TO STAY PENDING TRANSFER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal re: #40 Motion to Stay Case. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated) (iva) [Transferred from California Central on 5/6/2015.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/6/2021.]
April 20, 2015 Filing 40 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Transfer to MDL 2327 filed by Plaintiffs Mary Albecker, Connie Arnette, Sandra Bailey, Fran Banach, Annette Barrows, Nicole Bettin, Sally Bissell, Karin Boyer, Deline Boyse, Dorothy Breytenbach, Debbie Brock, Malissa Brown, Jacoueline Capponi, Katherine Carnahan, Doris Castilleja, Donna Clark, Peggy Clawson, Andrea Cogley, Tammy Cook, Bonnie Crawford, Linda Davis, Paula Davis, Patricia De La Fuentte, Peggy Dosch, Patricia Edenborg-Gorman, Llewelly Edwards, Darlene Endl, Nancy Esidor, Marsha Faircloth, Rosemary Flores, Jacouelyn Friend, Debra Galbraith, Rosa Graciani, Glenda Griffin, Betty Jean Hall, Debra Hammitt, Debbie Horton, Angela Howard, Sharon Iverson, Natalie Jackson, Josephine Karstetter, Barbara King, Gwendolyn Knox, Linda Kuenzli, Terri Leith, Amparo Libreros, Martha Lopez, Paula Lubinsky, Michelle Marini, Lorna Marple, Gina McSweeney, Janet Meacham, Faith Meyer, Irene Mikula, Maria Morales, Amy Moreira, Willie Morgan, Sharon Mullay, Cheryl Murphy, Susan Murzycki, Elizabeth Mustin, JoAnne Nichols, Rose Ellen Pepsin, Rebecca Peterson, Carolanne Potts, Deborah Proctor, Jeri Pryor, Jo Ann Pugh, Gloria Ramirez, Lisa Ramirez, Carol Ranson, Violet Rappuchi, Alice Revells, Georgia Rich, Jennifer Riddle, Andrea Robin, Debbie Robinson, Terenitia Rodriguez, Tina Samaniego, Beatriz Sandoval, Kimberly Schuler, Nina Schultz, Martha Serres, Janice Simons, Kandyce Singletary, Mamie Stanga, Charlotte Storms, Virdona Strube, Sheree Sweetland, Susann Thrasher, Ottie Turnmyre, Beryl Velguth, Maria White, Cathy Wilson, Daria Worley. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order On Consent to Transfer & Motion to Stay)(Vaughan, Jeffrey) [Transferred from California Central on 5/6/2015.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/6/2021.]
April 15, 2015 Filing 39 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 4-13-2015; 9:00am re Transcript #38 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (afr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from California Central on 5/6/2015.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/6/2021.]
April 15, 2015 Filing 38 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 04-13-2015; 9:00am. Court Reporter: Adele C. Frazier, adelefraziercsr@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 5/6/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/16/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/14/2015. (afr) [Transferred from California Central on 5/6/2015.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/6/2021.]
April 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal granting #35 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jeffrey R. Vaughan on behalf of Plaintiffs, Violet Rappuchi et al., designating Mark P. Robinson, Jr. as local counsel. (iva) Modified on 4/15/2015 (iva). [Transferred from California Central on 5/6/2015.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/6/2021.]
April 10, 2015 Filing 36 Amendment to APPLICATION for attorney Jeffrey Ray Vaughan to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-15526376 paid.) #35 filed by Plaintiffs Mary Albecker, Connie Arnette, Sandra Bailey, Fran Banach, Annette Barrows, Nicole Bettin, Sally Bissell, Karin Boyer, Deline Boyse, Dorothy Breytenbach, Debbie Brock, Malissa Brown, Jacoueline Capponi, Katherine Carnahan, Doris Castilleja, Donna Clark, Peggy Clawson, Andrea Cogley, Tammy Cook, Bonnie Crawford, Linda Davis, Paula Davis, Patricia De La Fuentte, Peggy Dosch, Patricia Edenborg-Gorman, Llewelly Edwards, Darlene Endl, Nancy Esidor, Marsha Faircloth, Rosemary Flores, Jacouelyn Friend, Debra Galbraith, Rosa Graciani, Glenda Griffin, Betty Jean Hall, Debra Hammitt, Debbie Horton, Angela Howard, Sharon Iverson, Natalie Jackson, Josephine Karstetter, Barbara King, Gwendolyn Knox, Linda Kuenzli, Terri Leith, Amparo Libreros, Martha Lopez, Paula Lubinsky, Michelle Marini, Lorna Marple, Gina McSweeney, Janet Meacham, Faith Meyer, Irene Mikula, Maria Morales, Amy Moreira, Willie Morgan, Sharon Mullay, Cheryl Murphy, Susan Murzycki, Elizabeth Mustin, JoAnne Nichols, Rose Ellen Pepsin, Rebecca Peterson, Carolanne Potts, Deborah Proctor, Jeri Pryor, Jo Ann Pugh, Gloria Ramirez, Lisa Ramirez, Carol Ranson, Violet Rappuchi, Alice Revells, Georgia Rich, Jennifer Riddle, Andrea Robin, Debbie Robinson, Terenitia Rodriguez, Tina Samaniego, Beatriz Sandoval, Kimberly Schuler, Nina Schultz, Martha Serres, Janice Simons, Kandyce Singletary, Mamie Stanga, Charlotte Storms, Virdona Strube, Sheree Sweetland, Susann Thrasher, Ottie Turnmyre, Beryl Velguth, Maria White, Cathy Wilson, Daria Worley. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)(Robinson, Mark) [Transferred from California Central on 5/6/2015.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/6/2021.]
April 10, 2015 Filing 35 APPLICATION for attorney Jeffrey Ray Vaughan to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-15526376 paid.) filed by Plaintiffs Mary Albecker, Connie Arnette, Sandra Bailey, Fran Banach, Annette Barrows, Nicole Bettin, Sally Bissell, Karin Boyer, Deline Boyse, Dorothy Breytenbach, Debbie Brock, Malissa Brown, Jacoueline Capponi, Katherine Carnahan, Doris Castilleja, Donna Clark, Peggy Clawson, Andrea Cogley, Tammy Cook, Bonnie Crawford, Linda Davis, Paula Davis, Patricia De La Fuentte, Peggy Dosch, Patricia Edenborg-Gorman, Llewelly Edwards, Darlene Endl, Nancy Esidor, Marsha Faircloth, Rosemary Flores, Jacouelyn Friend, Debra Galbraith, Rosa Graciani, Glenda Griffin, Betty Jean Hall, Debra Hammitt, Debbie Horton, Angela Howard, Sharon Iverson, Natalie Jackson, Josephine Karstetter, Barbara King, Gwendolyn Knox, Linda Kuenzli, Terri Leith, Amparo Libreros, Martha Lopez, Paula Lubinsky, Michelle Marini, Lorna Marple, Gina McSweeney, Janet Meacham, Faith Meyer, Irene Mikula, Maria Morales, Amy Moreira, Willie Morgan, Sharon Mullay, Cheryl Murphy, Susan Murzycki, Elizabeth Mustin, JoAnne Nichols, Rose Ellen Pepsin, Rebecca Peterson, Carolanne Potts, Deborah Proctor, Jeri Pryor, Jo Ann Pugh, Gloria Ramirez, Lisa Ramirez, Carol Ranson, Violet Rappuchi, Alice Revells, Georgia Rich, Jennifer Riddle, Andrea Robin, Debbie Robinson, Terenitia Rodriguez, Tina Samaniego, Beatriz Sandoval, Kimberly Schuler, Nina Schultz, Martha Serres, Janice Simons, Kandyce Singletary, Mamie Stanga, Charlotte Storms, Virdona Strube, Sheree Sweetland, Susann Thrasher, Ottie Turnmyre, Beryl Velguth, Maria White, Cathy Wilson, Daria Worley. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)(Robinson, Mark) [Transferred from California Central on 5/6/2015.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/6/2021.]
April 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 34 SCHEDULING NOTICE and ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction [Doc. No. 31] is hereby continued to 4/13/2015 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mga) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from California Central on 5/6/2015.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/6/2021.]
March 23, 2015 Filing 33 REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #31 filed by Defendants Ethicon Inc, Ethicon LLC, Johnson & Johnson. (Wes, Joshua) [Transferred from California Central on 5/6/2015.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/6/2021.]
March 16, 2015 Filing 32 NON-RESIDENT, CO-PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO CONDUCT PERSONAL JURISDICTION DISCOVERY, AND, SUBJECT THERETO, THEIR RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR DISMISSAL OF NON-CALIFORNIA PLAINTIFFS BASED ON LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION re MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #31 filed by Plaintiffs Mary Albecker, Connie Arnette, Sandra Bailey, Fran Banach, Annette Barrows, Nicole Bettin, Sally Bissell, Karin Boyer, Deline Boyse, Dorothy Breytenbach, Debbie Brock, Malissa Brown, Jacoueline Capponi, Katherine Carnahan, Doris Castilleja, Donna Clark, Peggy Clawson, Andrea Cogley, Tammy Cook, Bonnie Crawford, Linda Davis, Paula Davis, Patricia De La Fuentte, Peggy Dosch, Patricia Edenborg-Gorman, Llewelly Edwards, Darlene Endl, Nancy Esidor, Marsha Faircloth, Rosemary Flores, Jacouelyn Friend, Debra Galbraith, Rosa Graciani, Glenda Griffin, Betty Jean Hall, Debra Hammitt, Debbie Horton, Angela Howard, Sharon Iverson, Natalie Jackson, Josephine Karstetter, Barbara King, Gwendolyn Knox, Linda Kuenzli, Terri Leith, Amparo Libreros, Martha Lopez, Paula Lubinsky, Michelle Marini, Lorna Marple, Gina McSweeney, Janet Meacham, Faith Meyer, Irene Mikula, Maria Morales, Amy Moreira, Willie Morgan, Sharon Mullay, Cheryl Murphy, Susan Murzycki, Elizabeth Mustin, JoAnne Nichols, Rose Ellen Pepsin, Rebecca Peterson, Carolanne Potts, Deborah Proctor, Jeri Pryor, Jo Ann Pugh, Gloria Ramirez, Lisa Ramirez, Carol Ranson, Violet Rappuchi, Alice Revells, Georgia Rich, Jennifer Riddle, Andrea Robin, Debbie Robinson, Terenitia Rodriguez, Tina Samaniego, Beatriz Sandoval, Kimberly Schuler, Nina Schultz, Martha Serres, Janice Simons, Kandyce Singletary, Mamie Stanga, Charlotte Storms, Virdona Strube, Sheree Sweetland, Susann Thrasher, Ottie Turnmyre, Beryl Velguth, Maria White, Cathy Wilson, Daria Worley. (Attachments: #1 Non-Resident, Co-Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law In Support of Their Request for Leave to Conduct Personal Jurisdiction Discovery, and, Subject Thereto, Their Response to Defendants' Motion for Dismissal of Non-California Plaintiffs Based on Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, #2 Declaration of Mark P. Robinson, Jr., In Support of Plaintiffs' Request for Leave to Conduct Personal Jurisdiction Discovery, and, Subject Thereto, Their Response to Defendants' Motion for Dismissal of Non-California Plaintiffs Based on Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, #3 Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Mark P. Robinson, Jr., #4 Exhibit 2 to the Declaration of Mark P. Robinson, Jr., #5 Proposed Order)(Robinson, Mark) [Transferred from California Central on 5/6/2015.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/6/2021.]
March 9, 2015 Filing 31 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendants Ethicon Inc, Ethicon LLC, Johnson & Johnson. Motion set for hearing on 4/6/2015 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration of Joshua J. Wes, #3 Declaration Melissa Szanto, #4 Declaration John K. Kim, #5 Proposed Order)(Wes, Joshua) [Transferred from California Central on 5/6/2015.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/6/2021.]
January 15, 2015 Filing 30 NOTIFICATION as to Appellate Number 15-55095 Re Petition for permission to appeal. (car) [Transferred from California Central on 5/6/2015.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/6/2021.]
January 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER from 9th CCA filed, CCA # 14-80175. Petitioner's motion for voluntary dismissal of this petition for permission to appeal is granted. This petition for permission to appeal is dismissed. See Fed. R.App. P. 42(b). Order received in this district on 1/14/15. (car) [Transferred from California Central on 5/6/2015.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/6/2021.]
December 23, 2014 Filing 28 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Exhibit #25 . The following error(s) was found: Title page is missing. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (ad) [Transferred from California Central on 5/6/2015.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/6/2021.]
December 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER (1) GRANTING Defendants Motion for Reconsideration (Doc. No. 23); (2) VACATING the Courts November 13, 2014 Order (Doc. No. 22); (3) DENYING Plaintiffs Motion to Remand (Doc. No. 19); and (4) VACATING the December 22, 2014 Hearing by Judge Jesus G. Bernal re: #23 Motion for Reconsideration. (mrgo) [Transferred from California Central on 5/6/2015.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/6/2021.]
December 3, 2014 Filing 26 REPLY in support of MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion to Stay Case,,, Order on Motion to Remand Case to State Court,, #22 #23 filed by Defendants Ethicon Inc, Ethicon LLC, Johnson & Johnson. (Wes, Joshua) [Transferred from California Central on 5/6/2015.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/6/2021.]
December 2, 2014 Filing 25 EXHIBIT Filed filed by Plaintiffs Mary Albecker, Connie Arnette, Sandra Bailey, Fran Banach, Annette Barrows, Nicole Bettin, Sally Bissell, Karin Boyer, Deline Boyse, Dorothy Breytenbach, Debbie Brock, Malissa Brown, Jacoueline Capponi, Katherine Carnahan, Doris Castilleja, Donna Clark, Peggy Clawson, Andrea Cogley, Tammy Cook, Bonnie Crawford, Linda Davis, Paula Davis, Patricia De La Fuentte, Peggy Dosch, Patricia Edenborg-Gorman, Llewelly Edwards, Darlene Endl, Nancy Esidor, Marsha Faircloth, Rosemary Flores, Jacouelyn Friend, Debra Galbraith, Rosa Graciani, Glenda Griffin, Betty Jean Hall, Debra Hammitt, Debbie Horton, Angela Howard, Sharon Iverson, Natalie Jackson, Josephine Karstetter, Barbara King, Gwendolyn Knox, Linda Kuenzli, Terri Leith, Amparo Libreros, Martha Lopez, Paula Lubinsky, Michelle Marini, Lorna Marple, Gina McSweeney, Janet Meacham, Faith Meyer, Irene Mikula, Maria Morales, Amy Moreira, Willie Morgan, Sharon Mullay, Cheryl Murphy, Susan Murzycki, Elizabeth Mustin, JoAnne Nichols, Rose Ellen Pepsin, Rebecca Peterson, Carolanne Potts, Deborah Proctor, Jeri Pryor, Jo Ann Pugh, Gloria Ramirez, Lisa Ramirez, Carol Ranson, Violet Rappuchi, Alice Revells, Georgia Rich, Jennifer Riddle, Andrea Robin, Debbie Robinson, Terenitia Rodriguez, Tina Samaniego, Beatriz Sandoval, Kimberly Schuler, Nina Schultz, Martha Serres, Janice Simons, Kandyce Singletary, Mamie Stanga, Charlotte Storms, Virdona Strube, Sheree Sweetland, Susann Thrasher, Ottie Turnmyre, Beryl Velguth, Maria White, Cathy Wilson, Daria Worley. Exhibit A as to Response in Opposition to Motion,,,,, #24 . (Robinson, Mark) [Transferred from California Central on 5/6/2015.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/6/2021.]
December 1, 2014 Filing 24 OPPOSITION Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration of Remand Order filed by Plaintiffs Mary Albecker, Connie Arnette, Sandra Bailey, Fran Banach, Annette Barrows, Nicole Bettin, Sally Bissell, Karin Boyer, Deline Boyse, Dorothy Breytenbach, Debbie Brock, Malissa Brown, Jacoueline Capponi, Katherine Carnahan, Doris Castilleja, Donna Clark, Peggy Clawson, Andrea Cogley, Tammy Cook, Bonnie Crawford, Linda Davis, Paula Davis, Patricia De La Fuentte, Peggy Dosch, Patricia Edenborg-Gorman, Llewelly Edwards, Darlene Endl, Nancy Esidor, Marsha Faircloth, Rosemary Flores, Jacouelyn Friend, Debra Galbraith, Rosa Graciani, Glenda Griffin, Betty Jean Hall, Debra Hammitt, Debbie Horton, Angela Howard, Sharon Iverson, Natalie Jackson, Josephine Karstetter, Barbara King, Gwendolyn Knox, Linda Kuenzli, Terri Leith, Amparo Libreros, Martha Lopez, Paula Lubinsky, Michelle Marini, Lorna Marple, Gina McSweeney, Janet Meacham, Faith Meyer, Irene Mikula, Maria Morales, Amy Moreira, Willie Morgan, Sharon Mullay, Cheryl Murphy, Susan Murzycki, Elizabeth Mustin, JoAnne Nichols, Rose Ellen Pepsin, Rebecca Peterson, Carolanne Potts, Deborah Proctor, Jeri Pryor, Jo Ann Pugh, Gloria Ramirez, Lisa Ramirez. (Robinson, Mark) [Transferred from California Central on 5/6/2015.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/6/2021.]
November 24, 2014 Filing 23 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion to Stay Case,,, Order on Motion to Remand Case to State Court,, #22 filed by Defendants Ethicon Inc, Ethicon LLC, Johnson & Johnson. Motion set for hearing on 12/22/2014 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Wes, Joshua) [Transferred from California Central on 5/6/2015.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/6/2021.]
November 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order (1) DENYING AS MOOT Defendants' Motion to Stay (Doc. No.11); (2) GRANTING Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand (Doc. No. 19); (3) REMANDING the Action to the Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles; and (4) VACATING the November 17, 2014, Hearing (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Jesus G. Bernal, re: Motion to Stay Case #11 ; Motion to Remand Case to State Court #19 . Case Remanded to Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles;. MD JS-6. Case Terminated. (dml) [Transferred from California Central on 5/6/2015.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/6/2021.]
November 3, 2014 Filing 21 REPLY In Support of MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #19 filed by Plaintiffs Mary Albecker, Connie Arnette, Sandra Bailey, Fran Banach, Annette Barrows, Nicole Bettin, Sally Bissell, Karin Boyer, Deline Boyse, Dorothy Breytenbach, Debbie Brock, Malissa Brown, Jacoueline Capponi, Katherine Carnahan, Doris Castilleja, Donna Clark, Peggy Clawson, Andrea Cogley, Tammy Cook, Bonnie Crawford, Linda Davis, Paula Davis, Patricia De La Fuentte, Peggy Dosch, Patricia Edenborg-Gorman, Llewelly Edwards, Darlene Endl, Nancy Esidor, Marsha Faircloth, Rosemary Flores, Jacouelyn Friend, Debra Galbraith, Rosa Graciani, Glenda Griffin, Betty Jean Hall, Debra Hammitt, Debbie Horton, Angela Howard, Sharon Iverson, Natalie Jackson, Josephine Karstetter, Barbara King, Gwendolyn Knox, Linda Kuenzli, Terri Leith, Amparo Libreros, Martha Lopez, Paula Lubinsky, Michelle Marini, Lorna Marple, Gina McSweeney, Janet Meacham, Faith Meyer, Irene Mikula, Maria Morales, Amy Moreira, Willie Morgan, Sharon Mullay, Cheryl Murphy, Susan Murzycki, Elizabeth Mustin, JoAnne Nichols, Rose Ellen Pepsin, Rebecca Peterson, Carolanne Potts, Deborah Proctor, Jeri Pryor, Jo Ann Pugh, Gloria Ramirez, Lisa Ramirez, Carol Ranson, Violet Rappuchi, Alice Revells, Georgia Rich, Jennifer Riddle, Andrea Robin, Debbie Robinson, Terenitia Rodriguez, Tina Samaniego, Beatriz Sandoval, Kimberly Schuler, Nina Schultz, Martha Serres, Janice Simons, Kandyce Singletary, Mamie Stanga, Charlotte Storms, Virdona Strube, Sheree Sweetland, Susann Thrasher, Ottie Turnmyre, Beryl Velguth, Maria White, Cathy Wilson, Daria Worley. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mark P. Robinson, Jr., In Support of Plaintiffs' Reply, #2 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Mark P. Robinson, Jr., #3 Exhibit B to the Declaration of Mark P. Robinson, Jr., #4 Exhibit C to the Declaration of Mark P. Robinson, Jr.)(Robinson, Mark) [Transferred from California Central on 5/6/2015.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/6/2021.]
October 27, 2014 Filing 20 OPPOSITION to MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #19 filed by Defendants Ethicon Inc, Ethicon LLC, Johnson & Johnson. (Wes, Joshua) [Transferred from California Central on 5/6/2015.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/6/2021.]
October 17, 2014 Filing 19 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by Plaintiffs Mary Albecker, Connie Arnette, Sandra Bailey, Fran Banach, Annette Barrows, Nicole Bettin, Sally Bissell, Karin Boyer, Deline Boyse, Dorothy Breytenbach, Debbie Brock, Malissa Brown, Jacoueline Capponi, Katherine Carnahan, Doris Castilleja, Donna Clark, Peggy Clawson, Andrea Cogley, Tammy Cook, Bonnie Crawford, Linda Davis, Paula Davis, Patricia De La Fuentte, Peggy Dosch, Patricia Edenborg-Gorman, Llewelly Edwards, Darlene Endl, Nancy Esidor, Marsha Faircloth, Rosemary Flores, Jacouelyn Friend, Debra Galbraith, Rosa Graciani, Glenda Griffin, Betty Jean Hall, Debra Hammitt, Debbie Horton, Angela Howard, Sharon Iverson, Natalie Jackson, Josephine Karstetter, Barbara King, Gwendolyn Knox, Linda Kuenzli, Terri Leith, Amparo Libreros, Martha Lopez, Paula Lubinsky, Michelle Marini, Lorna Marple, Gina McSweeney, Janet Meacham, Faith Meyer, Irene Mikula, Maria Morales, Amy Moreira, Willie Morgan, Sharon Mullay, Cheryl Murphy, Susan Murzycki, Elizabeth Mustin, JoAnne Nichols, Rose Ellen Pepsin, Rebecca Peterson, Carolanne Potts, Deborah Proctor, Jeri Pryor, Jo Ann Pugh, Gloria Ramirez, Lisa Ramirez, Carol Ranson, Violet Rappuchi, Alice Revells, Georgia Rich, Jennifer Riddle, Andrea Robin, Debbie Robinson, Terenitia Rodriguez, Tina Samaniego, Beatriz Sandoval, Kimberly Schuler, Nina Schultz, Martha Serres, Janice Simons, Kandyce Singletary, Mamie Stanga, Charlotte Storms, Virdona Strube, Sheree Sweetland, Susann Thrasher, Ottie Turnmyre, Beryl Velguth, Maria White, Cathy Wilson, Daria Worley. Motion set for hearing on 11/17/2014 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs' Brief In Support of Motion to Remand, #2 Declaration of Mark P. Robinson, Jr., In Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand, #3 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Mark P. Robinson, Jr., #4 Exhibit B to the Declaration of Mark P. Robinson, Jr., #5 Proposed Order)(Robinson, Mark) [Transferred from California Central on 5/6/2015.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/6/2021.]
October 16, 2014 Filing 18 REPLY in Support of MOTION to Stay Case pending Disposition of the Ninth Circuit's En Banc Proceedings #11 filed by Defendants Ethicon Inc, Ethicon LLC, Johnson & Johnson. (Wes, Joshua) [Transferred from California Central on 5/6/2015.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/6/2021.]
October 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING NOTICE AND ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. On the Court's own motion, Defendants Motion to Stay #11 , set for hearing on 11/3/14, is hereby continued to November 17, 2014, at 9:00 a.m. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mga) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from California Central on 5/6/2015.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/6/2021.]
October 9, 2014 Filing 16 OPPOSITION to MOTION to Stay Case pending Disposition of the Ninth Circuit's En Banc Proceedings #11 filed by Plaintiffs Mary Albecker, Connie Arnette, Sandra Bailey, Fran Banach, Annette Barrows, Nicole Bettin, Sally Bissell, Karin Boyer, Deline Boyse, Dorothy Breytenbach, Debbie Brock, Malissa Brown, Jacoueline Capponi, Katherine Carnahan, Doris Castilleja, Donna Clark, Peggy Clawson, Andrea Cogley, Tammy Cook, Bonnie Crawford, Linda Davis, Paula Davis, Patricia De La Fuentte, Peggy Dosch, Patricia Edenborg-Gorman, Llewelly Edwards, Darlene Endl, Nancy Esidor, Marsha Faircloth, Rosemary Flores, Jacouelyn Friend, Debra Galbraith, Rosa Graciani, Glenda Griffin, Betty Jean Hall, Debra Hammitt, Debbie Horton, Angela Howard, Sharon Iverson, Natalie Jackson, Josephine Karstetter, Barbara King, Gwendolyn Knox, Linda Kuenzli, Terri Leith, Amparo Libreros, Martha Lopez, Paula Lubinsky, Michelle Marini, Lorna Marple, Gina McSweeney, Janet Meacham, Faith Meyer, Irene Mikula, Maria Morales, Amy Moreira, Willie Morgan, Sharon Mullay, Cheryl Murphy, Susan Murzycki, Elizabeth Mustin, JoAnne Nichols, Rose Ellen Pepsin, Rebecca Peterson, Carolanne Potts, Deborah Proctor, Jeri Pryor, Jo Ann Pugh, Gloria Ramirez, Lisa Ramirez, Carol Ranson, Violet Rappuchi, Alice Revells, Georgia Rich, Jennifer Riddle, Andrea Robin, Debbie Robinson, Terenitia Rodriguez, Tina Samaniego, Beatriz Sandoval, Kimberly Schuler, Nina Schultz, Martha Serres, Janice Simons, Kandyce Singletary, Mamie Stanga, Charlotte Storms, Virdona Strube, Sheree Sweetland, Susann Thrasher, Ottie Turnmyre, Beryl Velguth, Maria White, Cathy Wilson, Daria Worley. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mark P. Robinson, Jr., In Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Stay, #2 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Mark P. Robinson, Jr., #3 Proposed Order)(Robinson, Mark) [Transferred from California Central on 5/6/2015.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/6/2021.]
October 9, 2014 Filing 15 DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by plaintiff Mary Albecker, Connie Arnette, Sandra Bailey, Fran Banach, Annette Barrows, Nicole Bettin, Sally Bissell, Karin Boyer, Deline Boyse, Dorothy Breytenbach, Debbie Brock, Malissa Brown, Jacoueline Capponi, Katherine Carnahan, Doris Castilleja, Donna Clark, Peggy Clawson, Andrea Cogley, Tammy Cook, Bonnie Crawford, Linda Davis, Paula Davis, Patricia De La Fuentte, Peggy Dosch, Patricia Edenborg-Gorman, Llewelly Edwards, Darlene Endl, Nancy Esidor, Marsha Faircloth, Rosemary Flores, Jacouelyn Friend, Debra Galbraith, Rosa Graciani, Glenda Griffin, Betty Jean Hall, Debra Hammitt, Debbie Horton, Angela Howard, Sharon Iverson, Natalie Jackson, Josephine Karstetter, Barbara King, Gwendolyn Knox, Linda Kuenzli, Terri Leith, Amparo Libreros, Martha Lopez, Paula Lubinsky, Michelle Marini, Lorna Marple, Gina McSweeney, Janet Meacham, Faith Meyer, Irene Mikula, Maria Morales, Amy Moreira, Willie Morgan, Sharon Mullay, Cheryl Murphy, Susan Murzycki, Elizabeth Mustin, JoAnne Nichols, Rose Ellen Pepsin, Rebecca Peterson, Carolanne Potts, Deborah Proctor, Jeri Pryor, Jo Ann Pugh, Gloria Ramirez, Lisa Ramirez, Carol Ranson, Violet Rappuchi, Alice Revells, Georgia Rich, Jennifer Riddle, Andrea Robin, Debbie Robinson, Terenitia Rodriguez, Tina Samaniego, Beatriz Sandoval, Kimberly Schuler, Nina Schultz, Martha Serres, Janice Simons, Kandyce Singletary, Mamie Stanga, Charlotte Storms, Virdona Strube, Sheree Sweetland, Susann Thrasher, Ottie Turnmyre, Beryl Velguth, Maria White, Cathy Wilson, Daria Worley.. (Robinson, Mark) [Transferred from California Central on 5/6/2015.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/6/2021.]
October 7, 2014 Filing 14 NOTICE of Court's Standing Order filed by Defendants Ethicon Inc, Ethicon LLC, Johnson & Johnson. (Wes, Joshua) [Transferred from California Central on 5/6/2015.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/6/2021.]
October 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima) [Transferred from California Central on 5/6/2015.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/6/2021.]
October 3, 2014 Filing 12 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendants Ethicon Inc, Ethicon LLC. correcting MOTION to Stay Case pending Disposition of the Ninth Circuit's En Banc Proceedings #11 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wes, Joshua) [Transferred from California Central on 5/6/2015.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/6/2021.]
October 3, 2014 Filing 11 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Disposition of the Ninth Circuit's En Banc Proceedings filed by Defendants Ethicon Inc, Ethicon LLC, Johnson & Johnson. Motion set for hearing on 11/3/2014 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Proposed Order)(Wes, Joshua) [Transferred from California Central on 5/6/2015.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/6/2021.]
September 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE Pursuant General Order 14-03 (identical case) by Judge Virginia A. Phillips, Case Management and Assignment Committee Chair. Case transferred to the calendar of Judge Jesus G. Bernal for all further proceedings. All discovery matters are transferred to Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. Case number now reads as 2:14-cv-7392 JGB(SPx). (esa) [Transferred from California Central on 5/6/2015.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/6/2021.]
September 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 14-03 by Judge Margaret M. Morrow. Case transferred from Judge Margaret M. Morrow to the calendar of Judge Fernando M. Olguin for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as CV 14-07392 FMO(Ex). (rn) [Transferred from California Central on 5/6/2015.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/6/2021.]
September 24, 2014 Filing 8 NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to attorney Scott A Love for Plaintiffs Mary Albecker, Connie Arnette, Sandra Bailey, Fran Banach, Annette Barrows, Nicole Bettin, Sally Bissell, Karin Boyer, Deline Boyse, Dorothy Breytenbach, Debbie Brock, Malissa Brown, Jacoueline Capponi, Katherine Carnahan, Doris Castilleja, Donna Clark, Peggy Clawson, Andrea Cogley, Tammy Cook, Bonnie Crawford, Linda Davis, Paula Davis, Patricia De La Fuentte, Peggy Dosch, Patricia Edenborg-Gorman, Llewelly Edwards, Darlene Endl, Nancy Esidor, Marsha Faircloth, Rosemary Flores, Jacouelyn Friend, Debra Galbraith, Rosa Graciani, Glenda Griffin, Betty Jean Hall, Debra Hammitt, Debbie Horton, Angela Howard, Sharon Iverson, Natalie Jackson, Josephine Karstetter, Barbara King, Gwendolyn Knox, Linda Kuenzli, Terri Leith, Amparo Libreros, Martha Lopez, Paula Lubinsky, Michelle Marini, Lorna Marple, Gina McSweeney, Janet Meacham, Faith Meyer, Irene Mikula, Maria Morales, Amy Moreira, Willie Morgan, Sharon Mullay, Cheryl Murphy, Susan Murzycki, Elizabeth Mustin, JoAnne Nichols, Rose Ellen Pepsin, Rebecca Peterson, Carolanne Potts, Deborah Proctor, Jeri Pryor, Jo Ann Pugh, Gloria Ramirez, Lisa Ramirez, Carol Ranson, Violet Rappuchi, Alice Revells, Georgia Rich, Jennifer Riddle, Andrea Robin, Debbie Robinson, Terenitia Rodriguez, Tina Samaniego, Beatriz Sandoval, Kimberly Schuler, Nina Schultz, Martha Serres, Janice Simons, Kandyce Singletary, Mamie Stanga, Charlotte Storms, Virdona Strube, Sheree Sweetland, Susann Thrasher, Ottie Turnmyre, Beryl Velguth, Maria White, Cathy Wilson, Daria Worley. re Notice of Removal, #1 . Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application;no filing fee is required. You have been removed as counsel of record from this case for failure to submit this filing fee. (et) [Transferred from California Central on 5/6/2015.][Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/6/2021.]
September 24, 2014 Filing 7 NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to attorney Clayton A Clark for Plaintiffs Mary Albecker, Connie Arnette, Sandra Bailey, Fran Banach, Annette Barrows, Nicole Bettin, Sally Bissell, Karin Boyer, Deline Boyse, Dorothy Breytenbach, Debbie Brock, Malissa Brown, Jacoueline Capponi, Katherine Carnahan, Doris Castilleja, Donna Clark, Peggy Clawson, Andrea Cogley, Tammy Cook, Bonnie Crawford, Linda Davis, Paula Davis, Patricia De La Fuentte, Peggy Dosch, Patricia Edenborg-Gorman, Llewelly Edwards, Darlene Endl, Nancy Esidor, Marsha Faircloth, Rosemary Flores, Jacouelyn Friend, Debra Galbraith, Rosa Graciani, Glenda Griffin, Betty Jean Hall, Debra Hammitt, Debbie Horton, Angela Howard, Sharon Iverson, Natalie Jackson, Josephine Karstetter, Barbara King, Gwendolyn Knox, Linda Kuenzli, Terri Leith, Amparo Libreros, Martha Lopez, Paula Lubinsky, Michelle Marini, Lorna Marple, Gina McSweeney, Janet Meacham, Faith Meyer, Irene Mikula, Maria Morales, Amy Moreira, Willie Morgan, Sharon Mullay, Cheryl Murphy, Susan Murzycki, Elizabeth Mustin, JoAnne Nichols, Rose Ellen Pepsin, Rebecca Peterson, Carolanne Potts, Deborah Proctor, Jeri Pryor, Jo Ann Pugh, Gloria Ramirez, Lisa Ramirez, Carol Ranson, Violet Rappuchi, Alice Revells, Georgia Rich, Jennifer Riddle, Andrea Robin, Debbie Robinson, Terenitia Rodriguez, Tina Samaniego, Beatriz Sandoval, Kimberly Schuler, Nina Schultz, Martha Serres, Janice Simons, Kandyce Singletary, Mamie Stanga, Charlotte Storms, Virdona Strube, Sheree Sweetland, Susann Thrasher, Ottie Turnmyre, Beryl Velguth, Maria White, Cathy Wilson, Daria Worley. re Notice of Removal, #1 . Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application;no filing fee is required. You have been removed as counsel of record from this case for failure to submit this filing fee. (et) [Transferred from California Central on 5/6/2015.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/6/2021.]
September 22, 2014 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) [Transferred from California Central on 5/6/2015.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/6/2021.]
September 22, 2014 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Margaret M. Morrow and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (et) [Transferred from California Central on 5/6/2015.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/6/2021.]
September 22, 2014 Filing 4 NOTICE of Related Case(s) and Pendency of Other Action or Proceeding filed by Defendants Ethicon Inc, Ethicon LLC, Johnson & Johnson. Related Case(s): 8:14-cv-00591-JGB (SPx); 8:14-cv-00596-LGB (SPx); 2:14-cv-02916-JGB (SPx) and 2:14-cv-02915-JGB (SPx). (et) (mg). [Transferred from California Central on 5/6/2015.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/6/2021.]
September 22, 2014 Filing 3 CERTIFICATION AS TO Interested Parties filed by Defemdants Ethicon Inc, Ethicon LLC, Johnson & Johnson, identifying Corporate Parent Johnson & Johnson for Ethicon Inc; Corporate Parent Ethicon PR Holdings, Corporate Parent EES Holdings de Mexico S. de R.L. de C.V. for Ethicon LLC. (et) (mg). [Transferred from California Central on 5/6/2015.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/6/2021.]
September 22, 2014 Filing 2 DECLARATION of JOSHUA J. WES in Support of Notice of Removal #1 filed by Defendants Ethicon Inc, Ethicon LLC, Johnson & Johnson. [STATE COURT CONFORMED FILED COPY OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT A.] (et) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/26/2014: #1 Exhibit, #2 Part 2 to Exhibits) (mg). [Transferred from California Central on 5/6/2015.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/6/2021.]
September 22, 2014 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of CA for the County of Los Angeles, case number BC536366 with CONFORMED FILED copy of summons and complaint, attached to Declaration of Joshua J. Weis to Exhibit A. Case assigned to Judge Margaret M. Morrow, Discovery to Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (Filing fee $400 PAID.), filed by Defendants Ethicon LLC, Ethicon Inc, Johnson & Johnson. (et) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/26/2014: #1 Exhibit, #2 Part 2 of Exhibits) (mg). [Transferred from California Central on 5/6/2015.] [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 1/6/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Terri Leith v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Clark
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Vaughan
Represented By: Karen Barth Menzies
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Represented By: Shannon Lukei
Represented By: Amanda C. Robinson
Represented By: Mark P. Robinson, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel S. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonnie Crawford
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Vaughan
Represented By: Karen Barth Menzies
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Represented By: Shannon Lukei
Represented By: Amanda C. Robinson
Represented By: Mark P. Robinson, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel S. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Morgan
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Vaughan
Represented By: Karen Barth Menzies
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Represented By: Shannon Lukei
Represented By: Amanda C. Robinson
Represented By: Mark P. Robinson, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel S. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Capponi
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Vaughan
Represented By: Karen Barth Menzies
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Represented By: Shannon Lukei
Represented By: Amanda C. Robinson
Represented By: Mark P. Robinson, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel S. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virdona Strube
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Vaughan
Represented By: Karen Barth Menzies
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Represented By: Shannon Lukei
Represented By: Amanda C. Robinson
Represented By: Mark P. Robinson, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel S. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Galbraith
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Vaughan
Represented By: Karen Barth Menzies
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Represented By: Shannon Lukei
Represented By: Amanda C. Robinson
Represented By: Mark P. Robinson, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel S. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amparo Libreros
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Vaughan
Represented By: Karen Barth Menzies
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Represented By: Shannon Lukei
Represented By: Amanda C. Robinson
Represented By: Mark P. Robinson, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel S. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annette Barrows
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Vaughan
Represented By: Karen Barth Menzies
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Represented By: Shannon Lukei
Represented By: Amanda C. Robinson
Represented By: Mark P. Robinson, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel S. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Albecker
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Vaughan
Represented By: Karen Barth Menzies
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Represented By: Shannon Lukei
Represented By: Amanda C. Robinson
Represented By: Mark P. Robinson, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel S. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debbie Horton
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Vaughan
Represented By: Karen Barth Menzies
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Represented By: William Michael Moreland
Represented By: Shannon Lukei
Represented By: Amanda C. Robinson
Represented By: Mark P. Robinson, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel S. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Kuenzli
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Vaughan
Represented By: Karen Barth Menzies
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Represented By: Shannon Lukei
Represented By: Amanda C. Robinson
Represented By: Mark P. Robinson, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel S. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Violet Rappuchi
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Vaughan
Represented By: Karen Barth Menzies
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Represented By: Shannon Lukei
Represented By: Amanda C. Robinson
Represented By: Mark P. Robinson, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel S. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Serres
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Vaughan
Represented By: Karen Barth Menzies
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Represented By: Shannon Lukei
Represented By: Amanda C. Robinson
Represented By: Mark P. Robinson, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel S. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Mustin
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Vaughan
Represented By: Karen Barth Menzies
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Represented By: Shannon Lukei
Represented By: Amanda C. Robinson
Represented By: Mark P. Robinson, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel S. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Schuler
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Vaughan
Represented By: Karen Barth Menzies
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Represented By: Shannon Lukei
Represented By: Amanda C. Robinson
Represented By: Mark P. Robinson, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel S. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natalie Jackson
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Vaughan
Represented By: Karen Barth Menzies
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Represented By: Shannon Lukei
Represented By: Amanda C. Robinson
Represented By: Mark P. Robinson, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel S. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doris Castilleja
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Vaughan
Represented By: Karen Barth Menzies
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Represented By: Shannon Lukei
Represented By: Amanda C. Robinson
Represented By: Mark P. Robinson, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel S. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Bailey
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Vaughan
Represented By: Karen Barth Menzies
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Represented By: Shannon Lukei
Represented By: Amanda C. Robinson
Represented By: Mark P. Robinson, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel S. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Murphy
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Vaughan
Represented By: Karen Barth Menzies
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Represented By: Shannon Lukei
Represented By: Amanda C. Robinson
Represented By: Mark P. Robinson, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel S. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice Simons
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Vaughan
Represented By: Karen Barth Menzies
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Represented By: Shannon Lukei
Represented By: Amanda C. Robinson
Represented By: Mark P. Robinson, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel S. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JoAnne Nichols
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Vaughan
Represented By: Karen Barth Menzies
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Represented By: Shannon Lukei
Represented By: Amanda C. Robinson
Represented By: Mark P. Robinson, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel S. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Morales
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Vaughan
Represented By: Karen Barth Menzies
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Represented By: Shannon Lukei
Represented By: Amanda C. Robinson
Represented By: Mark P. Robinson, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel S. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Riddle
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Vaughan
Represented By: Karen Barth Menzies
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Represented By: Shannon Lukei
Represented By: Amanda C. Robinson
Represented By: Mark P. Robinson, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel S. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet Meacham
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Vaughan
Represented By: Karen Barth Menzies
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Represented By: Shannon Lukei
Represented By: Amanda C. Robinson
Represented By: Mark P. Robinson, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel S. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Faith Meyer
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Vaughan
Represented By: Karen Barth Menzies
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Represented By: Shannon Lukei
Represented By: Amanda C. Robinson
Represented By: Mark P. Robinson, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel S. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Peterson
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Vaughan
Represented By: Karen Barth Menzies
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Represented By: Shannon Lukei
Represented By: Amanda C. Robinson
Represented By: Mark P. Robinson, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel S. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria Ramirez
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Vaughan
Represented By: Karen Barth Menzies
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Represented By: Shannon Lukei
Represented By: Amanda C. Robinson
Represented By: Mark P. Robinson, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel S. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathy Wilson
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Vaughan
Represented By: Karen Barth Menzies
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Represented By: Shannon Lukei
Represented By: Amanda C. Robinson
Represented By: Mark P. Robinson, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel S. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Connie Arnette
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Vaughan
Represented By: Karen Barth Menzies
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Represented By: Shannon Lukei
Represented By: Amanda C. Robinson
Represented By: Mark P. Robinson, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel S. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paula Davis
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Vaughan
Represented By: Karen Barth Menzies
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Represented By: Shannon Lukei
Represented By: Amanda C. Robinson
Represented By: Mark P. Robinson, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel S. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara King
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Vaughan
Represented By: Karen Barth Menzies
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Represented By: Shannon Lukei
Represented By: Amanda C. Robinson
Represented By: Mark P. Robinson, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel S. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Georgia Rich
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Vaughan
Represented By: Karen Barth Menzies
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Represented By: Shannon Lukei
Represented By: Amanda C. Robinson
Represented By: Mark P. Robinson, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel S. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Iverson
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Vaughan
Represented By: Karen Barth Menzies
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Represented By: Shannon Lukei
Represented By: Amanda C. Robinson
Represented By: Mark P. Robinson, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel S. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolanne Potts
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Vaughan
Represented By: Karen Barth Menzies
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Represented By: Shannon Lukei
Represented By: Amanda C. Robinson
Represented By: Mark P. Robinson, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel S. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Esidor
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Vaughan
Represented By: Karen Barth Menzies
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Represented By: Shannon Lukei
Represented By: Amanda C. Robinson
Represented By: Mark P. Robinson, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel S. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alice Revells
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Vaughan
Represented By: Karen Barth Menzies
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Represented By: Shannon Lukei
Represented By: Amanda C. Robinson
Represented By: Mark P. Robinson, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel S. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenda Griffin
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Vaughan
Represented By: Karen Barth Menzies
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Represented By: Shannon Lukei
Represented By: Amanda C. Robinson
Represented By: Mark P. Robinson, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel S. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Llewelly Edwards
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Vaughan
Represented By: Karen Barth Menzies
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Represented By: Shannon Lukei
Represented By: Amanda C. Robinson
Represented By: Mark P. Robinson, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel S. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Hammitt
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Vaughan
Represented By: Karen Barth Menzies
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Represented By: Shannon Lukei
Represented By: Amanda C. Robinson
Represented By: Mark P. Robinson, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel S. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jo Ann Pugh
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Vaughan
Represented By: Karen Barth Menzies
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Represented By: Shannon Lukei
Represented By: Amanda C. Robinson
Represented By: Mark P. Robinson, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel S. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terenitia Rodriguez
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Vaughan
Represented By: Karen Barth Menzies
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Represented By: William Michael Moreland
Represented By: Shannon Lukei
Represented By: Amanda C. Robinson
Represented By: Mark P. Robinson, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel S. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorna Marple
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Vaughan
Represented By: Karen Barth Menzies
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Represented By: Shannon Lukei
Represented By: Amanda C. Robinson
Represented By: Mark P. Robinson, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel S. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosemary Flores
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Vaughan
Represented By: Karen Barth Menzies
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Represented By: Shannon Lukei
Represented By: Amanda C. Robinson
Represented By: Mark P. Robinson, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel S. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Murzycki
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Vaughan
Represented By: Karen Barth Menzies
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Represented By: Shannon Lukei
Represented By: Amanda C. Robinson
Represented By: Mark P. Robinson, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel S. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Moreira
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Vaughan
Represented By: Karen Barth Menzies
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Represented By: Shannon Lukei
Represented By: Amanda C. Robinson
Represented By: Mark P. Robinson, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel S. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria White
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Vaughan
Represented By: Karen Barth Menzies
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Represented By: Shannon Lukei
Represented By: Amanda C. Robinson
Represented By: Mark P. Robinson, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel S. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Proctor
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Vaughan
Represented By: Karen Barth Menzies
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Represented By: Shannon Lukei
Represented By: Amanda C. Robinson
Represented By: Mark P. Robinson, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel S. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Mullay
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Vaughan
Represented By: Karen Barth Menzies
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Represented By: Shannon Lukei
Represented By: Amanda C. Robinson
Represented By: Mark P. Robinson, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel S. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina Samaniego
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Vaughan
Represented By: Karen Barth Menzies
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Represented By: Shannon Lukei
Represented By: Amanda C. Robinson
Represented By: Mark P. Robinson, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel S. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gina McSweeney
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Vaughan
Represented By: Karen Barth Menzies
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Represented By: Shannon Lukei
Represented By: Amanda C. Robinson
Represented By: Mark P. Robinson, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel S. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paula Lubinsky
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Vaughan
Represented By: Karen Barth Menzies
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Represented By: Shannon Lukei
Represented By: Amanda C. Robinson
Represented By: Mark P. Robinson, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel S. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Edenborg-Gorman
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Vaughan
Represented By: Karen Barth Menzies
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Represented By: Shannon Lukei
Represented By: Amanda C. Robinson
Represented By: Mark P. Robinson, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel S. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothy Breytenbach
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Vaughan
Represented By: Karen Barth Menzies
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Represented By: Shannon Lukei
Represented By: Amanda C. Robinson
Represented By: Mark P. Robinson, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel S. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosa Graciani
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Vaughan
Represented By: Karen Barth Menzies
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Represented By: Shannon Lukei
Represented By: Amanda C. Robinson
Represented By: Mark P. Robinson, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel S. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeri Pryor
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Vaughan
Represented By: Karen Barth Menzies
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Represented By: Shannon Lukei
Represented By: Amanda C. Robinson
Represented By: Mark P. Robinson, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel S. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gwendolyn Knox
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Vaughan
Represented By: Karen Barth Menzies
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Represented By: Shannon Lukei
Represented By: Amanda C. Robinson
Represented By: Mark P. Robinson, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel S. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Lopez
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Vaughan
Represented By: Karen Barth Menzies
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Represented By: Shannon Lukei
Represented By: Amanda C. Robinson
Represented By: Mark P. Robinson, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel S. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fran Banach
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Vaughan
Represented By: Karen Barth Menzies
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Represented By: Shannon Lukei
Represented By: Amanda C. Robinson
Represented By: Mark P. Robinson, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel S. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josephine Karstetter
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Vaughan
Represented By: Karen Barth Menzies
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Represented By: Shannon Lukei
Represented By: Amanda C. Robinson
Represented By: Mark P. Robinson, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel S. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beatriz Sandoval
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Vaughan
Represented By: Karen Barth Menzies
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Represented By: Shannon Lukei
Represented By: Amanda C. Robinson
Represented By: Mark P. Robinson, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel S. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlotte Storms
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Vaughan
Represented By: Karen Barth Menzies
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Represented By: Shannon Lukei
Represented By: Amanda C. Robinson
Represented By: Mark P. Robinson, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel S. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malissa Brown
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Vaughan
Represented By: Karen Barth Menzies
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Represented By: Shannon Lukei
Represented By: Amanda C. Robinson
Represented By: Mark P. Robinson, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel S. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Ramirez
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Vaughan
Represented By: Karen Barth Menzies
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Represented By: Shannon Lukei
Represented By: Amanda C. Robinson
Represented By: Mark P. Robinson, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel S. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marsha Faircloth
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Vaughan
Represented By: Karen Barth Menzies
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Represented By: Shannon Lukei
Represented By: Amanda C. Robinson
Represented By: Mark P. Robinson, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel S. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daria Worley
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Vaughan
Represented By: Karen Barth Menzies
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Represented By: Shannon Lukei
Represented By: Amanda C. Robinson
Represented By: Mark P. Robinson, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel S. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ottie Turnmyre
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Vaughan
Represented By: Karen Barth Menzies
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Represented By: Shannon Lukei
Represented By: Amanda C. Robinson
Represented By: Mark P. Robinson, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel S. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darlene Endl
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Vaughan
Represented By: Karen Barth Menzies
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Represented By: Shannon Lukei
Represented By: Amanda C. Robinson
Represented By: Mark P. Robinson, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel S. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deline Boyse
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Vaughan
Represented By: Karen Barth Menzies
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Represented By: Shannon Lukei
Represented By: Amanda C. Robinson
Represented By: Mark P. Robinson, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel S. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terri Leith
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Vaughan
Represented By: Karen Barth Menzies
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Represented By: Shannon Lukei
Represented By: Amanda C. Robinson
Represented By: Mark P. Robinson, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel S. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty Jean Hall
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Vaughan
Represented By: Karen Barth Menzies
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Represented By: Shannon Lukei
Represented By: Amanda C. Robinson
Represented By: Mark P. Robinson, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel S. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irene Mikula
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Vaughan
Represented By: Karen Barth Menzies
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Represented By: Shannon Lukei
Represented By: Amanda C. Robinson
Represented By: Mark P. Robinson, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel S. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karin Boyer
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Vaughan
Represented By: Karen Barth Menzies
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Represented By: Shannon Lukei
Represented By: Amanda C. Robinson
Represented By: Mark P. Robinson, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel S. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peggy Dosch
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Vaughan
Represented By: Karen Barth Menzies
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Represented By: Shannon Lukei
Represented By: Amanda C. Robinson
Represented By: Mark P. Robinson, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel S. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mamie Stanga
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Vaughan
Represented By: Karen Barth Menzies
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Represented By: Shannon Lukei
Represented By: Amanda C. Robinson
Represented By: Mark P. Robinson, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel S. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Bettin
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Vaughan
Represented By: Karen Barth Menzies
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Represented By: Shannon Lukei
Represented By: Amanda C. Robinson
Represented By: Mark P. Robinson, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel S. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Marini
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Vaughan
Represented By: Karen Barth Menzies
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Represented By: Shannon Lukei
Represented By: Amanda C. Robinson
Represented By: Mark P. Robinson, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel S. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacquelyn Friend
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Vaughan
Represented By: Karen Barth Menzies
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Represented By: Shannon Lukei
Represented By: Amanda C. Robinson
Represented By: Mark P. Robinson, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel S. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea Robin
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Vaughan
Represented By: Karen Barth Menzies
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Represented By: William Michael Moreland
Represented By: Shannon Lukei
Represented By: Amanda C. Robinson
Represented By: Mark P. Robinson, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel S. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nina Schultz
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Vaughan
Represented By: Karen Barth Menzies
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Represented By: Shannon Lukei
Represented By: Amanda C. Robinson
Represented By: Mark P. Robinson, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel S. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peggy Clawson
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Vaughan
Represented By: Karen Barth Menzies
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Represented By: Shannon Lukei
Represented By: Amanda C. Robinson
Represented By: Mark P. Robinson, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel S. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea Cogley
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Vaughan
Represented By: Karen Barth Menzies
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Represented By: Shannon Lukei
Represented By: Amanda C. Robinson
Represented By: Mark P. Robinson, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel S. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine Carnahan
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Vaughan
Represented By: Karen Barth Menzies
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Represented By: Shannon Lukei
Represented By: Amanda C. Robinson
Represented By: Mark P. Robinson, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel S. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Cook
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Vaughan
Represented By: Karen Barth Menzies
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Represented By: Shannon Lukei
Represented By: Amanda C. Robinson
Represented By: Mark P. Robinson, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel S. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Howard
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Vaughan
Represented By: Karen Barth Menzies
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Represented By: Shannon Lukei
Represented By: Amanda C. Robinson
Represented By: Mark P. Robinson, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel S. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susann Thrasher
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Vaughan
Represented By: Karen Barth Menzies
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Represented By: Shannon Lukei
Represented By: Amanda C. Robinson
Represented By: Mark P. Robinson, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel S. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sally Bissell
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Vaughan
Represented By: Karen Barth Menzies
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Represented By: Shannon Lukei
Represented By: Amanda C. Robinson
Represented By: Mark P. Robinson, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel S. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kandyce Singletary
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Vaughan
Represented By: Karen Barth Menzies
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Represented By: Shannon Lukei
Represented By: Amanda C. Robinson
Represented By: Mark P. Robinson, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel S. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia De La Fuentte
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Vaughan
Represented By: Karen Barth Menzies
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Represented By: Shannon Lukei
Represented By: Amanda C. Robinson
Represented By: Mark P. Robinson, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel S. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rose Ellen Pepsin
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Vaughan
Represented By: Karen Barth Menzies
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Represented By: Shannon Lukei
Represented By: Amanda C. Robinson
Represented By: Mark P. Robinson, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel S. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debbie Brock
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Vaughan
Represented By: Karen Barth Menzies
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Represented By: Shannon Lukei
Represented By: Amanda C. Robinson
Represented By: Mark P. Robinson, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel S. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beryl Velguth
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Vaughan
Represented By: Karen Barth Menzies
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Represented By: Shannon Lukei
Represented By: Amanda C. Robinson
Represented By: Mark P. Robinson, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel S. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Ranson
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Vaughan
Represented By: Karen Barth Menzies
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Represented By: Shannon Lukei
Represented By: Amanda C. Robinson
Represented By: Mark P. Robinson, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel S. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Davis
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Vaughan
Represented By: Karen Barth Menzies
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Represented By: Shannon Lukei
Represented By: Amanda C. Robinson
Represented By: Mark P. Robinson, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel S. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheree Sweetland
Represented By: Scott A. Love
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Vaughan
Represented By: Karen Barth Menzies
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Represented By: Shannon Lukei
Represented By: Amanda C. Robinson
Represented By: Mark P. Robinson, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel S. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 500
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon Inc
Represented By: David B. Thomas
Represented By: Joshua J. Wes
Represented By: Christy D. Jones
Represented By: Susan M. Robinson
Represented By: Kari L. Sutherland
Represented By: William M. Gage
Represented By: Lauren H. Bragin
Represented By: Mollie Fleming Benedict
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon LLC
Represented By: Joshua J. Wes
Represented By: Kari L. Sutherland
Represented By: William M. Gage
Represented By: Lauren H. Bragin
Represented By: Mollie Fleming Benedict
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: David B. Thomas
Represented By: Joshua J. Wes
Represented By: Christy D. Jones
Represented By: Susan M. Robinson
Represented By: Kari L. Sutherland
Represented By: William M. Gage
Represented By: Lauren H. Bragin
Represented By: Mollie Fleming Benedict
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?