Dina Rodriguez v. Laboratory Corporation of America et al
Plaintiff: Dina Rodriguez
Defendant: Laboratory Corporation of America, Does 1 through 20 and Does 1 through 20 inclusive
Case Number: 2:2021cv00399
Filed: January 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Chooljian
Referring Judge: Michael W Fitzgerald
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER RE JURY TRIAL by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Last Day to Add Parties/Amend Pleadings 6/28/2021. Non-expert Discovery Cut-off 11/12/2021. Last Day to Hear Motions 12/13/2021. File Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law, Exhibit and Witness Lists, Status Report regarding settlement, and all Motions in Limine 2/7/2022. Final Pretrial Conference and Hearing on Motions in Limine set for 2/28/2022 at 11:00 AM. Trial Date (Est. 5 to 7 Days) set for 3/22/2022 at 8:30 AM. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (iv)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 1/3/2022. (iv)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING NOTICE and ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Pursuant to General Order 20-09, the Court VACATES the Scheduling Conference set for 3/8/2021 at 11:00 a.m. No appearances shall be made. The Court will review the parties' Joint Rule 26(f) Report and issue pretrial and trial dates by separate order. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (smom) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 22, 2021 Filing 10 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial Plaintiff requests 7 days; Defendant requests 3-5 days, filed by Defendant Laboratory Corporation of America.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Schedule of PreTrial and Trial Dates Worksheet)(Hummel, Kate)
February 21, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Dina Rodriguez, (De Golier, Rochelle)
February 19, 2021 Filing 8 DECLARATION of Rochelle R. De Golier, Esq. Declaration of Lead Trial Counsel, Rochelle R. De Golier, Esq. filed by Plaintiff Dina Rodriguez. (De Golier, Rochelle)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This case has been assigned to Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. This matter is set for a scheduling conference 03/08/21 at 11:00 AM. (pg)
January 25, 2021 Filing 6 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Laboratory Corporation of America, re Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,, #1 served on January 15, 2021. (Hummel, Kate)
January 15, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
January 15, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (lh)
January 14, 2021 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, Laboratory Corporation of America. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Dina Rodriguez. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 8/18/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
January 14, 2021 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, Laboratory Corporation of America amending Complaint,, filed by Plaintiff Dina Rodriguez. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 8/21/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 )(lh)
January 14, 2021 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER to First Amended Complaint, filed by Defendant Laboratory Corporation of America. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 1/14/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 )(lh)
January 14, 2021 Filing 3 Notice & CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Laboratory Corporation of America, identifying Laboratory Corporation of America Holdings. (Hummel, Kate)
January 14, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Laboratory Corporation of America. (Hummel, Kate)
January 14, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 20STCV31448 Receipt No: ACACDC-30053758 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Laboratory Corporation of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Summons, #3 Exhibit 3 - State Court Civil Case Cover Sheet & Addendum, #4 Exhibit 4 - State Court Notice of Case Assignment, #5 Exhibit 5 - State Court First Amended Complaint, #6 Exhibit 6 - State Court Amended Summons, #7 Exhibit 7 - State Court First Amended General Order, #8 Exhibit 8 - State Court Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulations, #9 Exhibit 9 - State Court ADR Package, #10 Exhibit 10 - CSC Notice of Service of Process, #11 Exhibit 11 - State Court Notice of Case Management Conference, #12 Exhibit 12 - State Court Case Management Statement (Rodriguez), #13 Exhibit 13 - State Court Notice of Posting Jury Fees, #14 Exhibit 14 - State Court Minute Order, #15 Exhibit 15 - State Court Answer to First Amended Complaint) (Attorney Kate G Hummel added to party Laboratory Corporation of America(pty:dft))(Hummel, Kate)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dina Rodriguez v. Laboratory Corporation of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laboratory Corporation of America
Represented By: Kate G Hummel
Represented By: Christopher J Kondon
Represented By: Saman M Rejali
Represented By: Vanuhi Karapetian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 20 inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dina Rodriguez
Represented By: Gabriel J Pimentel
Represented By: Rochelle Reyes De Golier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?