Norman Hollett v. Dennis J. Gilmore et al
Plaintiff: Norman Hollett
Defendant: Martha B. Wyrsch, Dennis J Gilmore, Parker S Kennedy, Reginald H. Gilyard, First American Financial Corporation, Michael D. McKee, Margaret M. McCarthy, Thomas V. McKernan, James L Doti, Mark C. Oman and Mark E. Seaton
Case Number: 2:2021cv00525
Filed: January 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Paul L Abrams
Referring Judge: Fernando L Aenlle-Rocha
2 Judge: Charles F Eick
3 Judge: Dale S Fischer
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer GRANTING Joint Stipulation Regarding Defendants' Response to the Complaint #29 . Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint on or before 5/21/2021. See Order for specifics. (jp)
February 10, 2021 Filing 29 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File an Amended Complaint and for Defendants to Respond to the Amended Complaint filed by Defendants James L Doti, First American Financial Corporation, Dennis J Gilmore, Reginald H. Gilyard, Parker S Kennedy, Margaret M. McCarthy, Michael D. McKee, Thomas V. McKernan, Mark C. Oman, Mark E. Seaton, Martha B. Wyrsch. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Colin B. Davis, #2 Proposed Order)(Davis, Colin)
January 29, 2021 Filing 28 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Robert C Moest counsel for Plaintiff Norman Hollett. Adding Robert C. Moest as counsel of record for Norman Hollett for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff Norman Hollett. (Moest, Robert)
January 29, 2021 Filing 27 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) #25 . The document is stricken for the reasons indicated on the Notice of Filer of Deficiencies #26 . Counsel shall file a corrected document should appearance still be desired. (jre)
January 29, 2021 Filing 26 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #25 . The following error(s) was/were found: Case number is incorrect or missing. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
January 28, 2021 Filing 25 STRICKEN PER #27 - Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Robert C Moest counsel for Plaintiff Norman Hollett. Adding Robert C. Moest as counsel of record for Norman Hollett for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff Norman Hollett. (Attorney Robert C Moest added to party Norman Hollett(pty:pla))(Moest, Robert) Modified on 1/29/2021 (jre).
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (rfi)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 8:19-cv-01009 DSF(Ex). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams and Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha to Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:21-cv-00525 DSF(Ex). Signed by Judge Dale S. Fischer (rn)
January 22, 2021 Filing 22 RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney John M. O'Toole on behalf of Defendants James L Doti, et al. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. Attorney will not be appearing as attorney of record on this case and will be removed pursuant to G109 Notice. (Thrasher, Lupe)
January 22, 2021 Filing 21 RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Raymond J. DiCamillo on behalf of Defendants James L Doti, et al. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. Attorney will not be appearing as attorney of record on this case and will be removed pursuant to G109 Notice. (Thrasher, Lupe)
January 22, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by defendant James L Doti, First American Financial Corporation, Dennis J Gilmore, Reginald H. Gilyard, Parker S Kennedy, Margaret M. McCarthy, Michael D. McKee, Thomas V. McKernan, Mark C. Oman, Mark E. Seaton, Martha B. Wyrsch. Related Case(s): 8:19-cv-01105-DSF-E; 8:19-cv-01180-DSF-E; 8:19-cv-01305-DSF-E; 8:19-cv-01533-DSF-E; 2:20-cv-09781-DSF-E (Mendro, Jason)
January 22, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant All Defendants, identifying Dennis J. Gilmore, Mark E. Seaton, Parker S. Kennedy, James L. Doti, Reginald H. Gilyard, Margaret M. McCarthy, Michael D. McKee, Thomas V. McKernan, Mark C. Oman, Martha B. Wyrsch, First American Financial Corp., Norman Hollett, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, Pa., Ace American Insurance Company, Axis Insurance Company, XL Specialty Insurance Company, RSUI Indemnity Company, Zurich American Insurance Company, Everest National Insurance Company, Continental Casualty Company, Freedom Specialty Insurance Company. (Mendro, Jason)
January 22, 2021 Filing 18 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Colin Brynmor Davis counsel for Defendants James L Doti, First American Financial Corporation, Dennis J Gilmore, Reginald H. Gilyard, Parker S Kennedy, Margaret M. McCarthy, Michael D. McKee, Thomas V. McKernan, Mark C. Oman, Mark E. Seaton, Martha B. Wyrsch. Adding Colin B. Davis as counsel of record for Dennis J. Gilmore, Mark E. Seaton, Parker S. Kennedy, James L. Doti, Reginald H. Gilyard, Margaret M. McCarthy, Michael D. McKee, Thomas V. McKernan, Mark C. Oman, Martha B. Wyrsch, and First American Financial Corp. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant Colin B. Davis. (Attorney Colin Brynmor Davis added to party James L Doti(pty:dft), Attorney Colin Brynmor Davis added to party First American Financial Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Colin Brynmor Davis added to party Dennis J Gilmore(pty:dft), Attorney Colin Brynmor Davis added to party Reginald H. Gilyard(pty:dft), Attorney Colin Brynmor Davis added to party Parker S Kennedy(pty:dft), Attorney Colin Brynmor Davis added to party Margaret M. McCarthy(pty:dft), Attorney Colin Brynmor Davis added to party Michael D. McKee(pty:dft), Attorney Colin Brynmor Davis added to party Thomas V. McKernan(pty:dft), Attorney Colin Brynmor Davis added to party Mark C. Oman(pty:dft), Attorney Colin Brynmor Davis added to party Mark E. Seaton(pty:dft), Attorney Colin Brynmor Davis added to party Martha B. Wyrsch (pty:dft))(Davis, Colin)
January 22, 2021 Filing 17 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jason Jacob Mendro counsel for Defendants James L Doti, First American Financial Corporation, Dennis J Gilmore, Reginald H. Gilyard, Parker S Kennedy, Margaret M. McCarthy, Michael D. McKee, Thomas V. McKernan, Mark C. Oman, Mark E. Seaton, Martha B. Wyrsch. Adding Jason J. Mendro as counsel of record for Dennis J. Gilmore, Mark E. Seaton, Parker S. Kennedy, James L. Doti, Reginald H. Gilyard, Margaret M. McCarthy, Michael D. McKee, Thomas V. McKernan, Mark C. Oman, Martha B. Wyrsch, and First American Financial Corp. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant Jason J. Mendro. (Attorney Jason Jacob Mendro added to party James L Doti(pty:dft), Attorney Jason Jacob Mendro added to party First American Financial Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Jason Jacob Mendro added to party Dennis J Gilmore(pty:dft), Attorney Jason Jacob Mendro added to party Reginald H. Gilyard(pty:dft), Attorney Jason Jacob Mendro added to party Parker S Kennedy(pty:dft), Attorney Jason Jacob Mendro added to party Margaret M. McCarthy(pty:dft), Attorney Jason Jacob Mendro added to party Michael D. McKee(pty:dft), Attorney Jason Jacob Mendro added to party Thomas V. McKernan(pty:dft), Attorney Jason Jacob Mendro added to party Mark C. Oman(pty:dft), Attorney Jason Jacob Mendro added to party Mark E. Seaton(pty:dft), Attorney Jason Jacob Mendro added to party Martha B. Wyrsch (pty:dft))(Mendro, Jason)
January 22, 2021 Filing 16 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Craig Varnen counsel for Defendants James L Doti, First American Financial Corporation, Dennis J Gilmore, Reginald H. Gilyard, Parker S Kennedy, Margaret M. McCarthy, Michael D. McKee, Thomas V. McKernan, Mark C. Oman, Mark E. Seaton, Martha B. Wyrsch. Adding Craig Varnen as counsel of record for Dennis J. Gilmore, Mark E. Seaton, Parker S. Kennedy, James L. Doti, Reginald H. Gilyard, Margaret M. McCarthy, Michael D. McKee, Thomas V. McKernan, Mark C. Oman, Martha B. Wyrsch, and First American Financial Corp. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant Craig Varnen. (Attorney Craig Varnen added to party James L Doti(pty:dft), Attorney Craig Varnen added to party First American Financial Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Craig Varnen added to party Dennis J Gilmore(pty:dft), Attorney Craig Varnen added to party Reginald H. Gilyard(pty:dft), Attorney Craig Varnen added to party Parker S Kennedy(pty:dft), Attorney Craig Varnen added to party Margaret M. McCarthy(pty:dft), Attorney Craig Varnen added to party Michael D. McKee(pty:dft), Attorney Craig Varnen added to party Thomas V. McKernan(pty:dft), Attorney Craig Varnen added to party Mark C. Oman(pty:dft), Attorney Craig Varnen added to party Mark E. Seaton(pty:dft), Attorney Craig Varnen added to party Martha B. Wyrsch (pty:dft))(Varnen, Craig)
January 20, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney John M O Toole on behalf on Defendants. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap)
January 20, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Raymond J DiCamillo on behalf on Defendants. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap)
January 20, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
January 20, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando L Aenlle-Rocha and Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (ghap)
January 20, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE OF RECEIPT OF CASE TRANSFERRED IN: Formerly Case Number: 1:20-cv-01620-RGA, from District of Delaware (Wilmington). The above-referenced case has been transferred to this district and assigned the above civil case number 2:21-cv-525 FLA (PLAx). (ghap)
January 20, 2021 Filing 10 ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from Delaware
January 20, 2021 Case transferred to the United States District Court for the Central District of California. (nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/20/2021.]
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SO ORDERED Granting #8 Joint Stipulation and Proposed Order Regarding Transfer of Action. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/20/2021. (nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/20/2021.]
January 19, 2021 Filing 8 Joint STIPULATION and Proposed Order Regarding Transfer of Action by James L. Doti, Dennis J. Gilmore, Reginald H. Gilyard, Parker S. Kennedy, Margaret M. McCarthy, Michael D. McKee, Thomas V. McKernan, Mark C. Oman, Mark E. Seaton, Martha B. Wyrsch. (DiCamillo, Raymond) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/20/2021.]
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #7 Joint Stipulation and Proposed Order Regarding Response to Complaint (*Reset Answer Deadline: Defendants' answers due by 2/19/2021). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 12/18/2020. (nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/20/2021.]
December 18, 2020 Filing 7 Joint STIPULATION Regarding Defendant Response to Complaint by James L. Doti, First American Financial Corporation, Dennis J. Gilmore, Reginald H. Gilyard, Parker S. Kennedy, Margaret M. McCarthy, Michael D. McKee, Thomas V. McKernan, Mark C. Oman, Mark E. Seaton, Martha B. Wyrsch. (O'Toole, John) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/20/2021.]
December 18, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Raymond J. DiCamillo on behalf of James L. Doti, First American Financial Corporation, Dennis J. Gilmore, Reginald H. Gilyard, Parker S. Kennedy, Margaret M. McCarthy, Michael D. McKee, Thomas V. McKernan, Mark C. Oman, Mark E. Seaton, Martha B. Wyrsch (DiCamillo, Raymond) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/20/2021.]
December 18, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by John M. O'Toole on behalf of James L. Doti, First American Financial Corporation, Dennis J. Gilmore, Reginald H. Gilyard, Parker S. Kennedy, Margaret M. McCarthy, Michael D. McKee, Thomas V. McKernan, Mark C. Oman, Mark E. Seaton, Martha B. Wyrsch (O'Toole, John) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/20/2021.]
December 2, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/20/2021.]
December 1, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Norman Hollett. First American Financial Corporation served on 11/30/2020, answer due 12/21/2020. (Farnan, Michael) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/20/2021.]
November 30, 2020 Filing 3 Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (amf) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/20/2021.]
November 25, 2020 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (amf) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/20/2021.]
November 25, 2020 Filing 1 VERIFIED SHAREHOLDER DERIVATIVE COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against James L. Doti, Dennis J. Gilmore, Reginald H. Gilyard, Parker S. Kennedy, Margaret M. McCarthy, Michael D. McKee, Thomas V. McKernan, Mark C. Oman, Mark E. Seaton, and Martha B. Wyrsch - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ADEDC-3356660.) - filed by Norman Hollett. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff's Verification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(amf) [Transferred from Delaware on 1/20/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Norman Hollett v. Dennis J. Gilmore et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martha B. Wyrsch
Represented By: John M. O'Toole
Represented By: Raymond J. DiCamillo
Represented By: Craig Varnen
Represented By: Colin Brynmor Davis
Represented By: Jason Jacob Mendro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis J Gilmore
Represented By: John M. O'Toole
Represented By: Raymond J. DiCamillo
Represented By: Craig Varnen
Represented By: Colin Brynmor Davis
Represented By: Jason Jacob Mendro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parker S Kennedy
Represented By: John M. O'Toole
Represented By: Raymond J. DiCamillo
Represented By: Craig Varnen
Represented By: Colin Brynmor Davis
Represented By: Jason Jacob Mendro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reginald H. Gilyard
Represented By: John M. O'Toole
Represented By: Raymond J. DiCamillo
Represented By: Craig Varnen
Represented By: Colin Brynmor Davis
Represented By: Jason Jacob Mendro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First American Financial Corporation
Represented By: John M. O'Toole
Represented By: Raymond J. DiCamillo
Represented By: Craig Varnen
Represented By: Colin Brynmor Davis
Represented By: Jason Jacob Mendro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael D. McKee
Represented By: John M. O'Toole
Represented By: Raymond J. DiCamillo
Represented By: Craig Varnen
Represented By: Colin Brynmor Davis
Represented By: Jason Jacob Mendro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret M. McCarthy
Represented By: John M. O'Toole
Represented By: Raymond J. DiCamillo
Represented By: Craig Varnen
Represented By: Colin Brynmor Davis
Represented By: Jason Jacob Mendro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas V. McKernan
Represented By: John M. O'Toole
Represented By: Raymond J. DiCamillo
Represented By: Craig Varnen
Represented By: Colin Brynmor Davis
Represented By: Jason Jacob Mendro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James L Doti
Represented By: John M. O'Toole
Represented By: Raymond J. DiCamillo
Represented By: Craig Varnen
Represented By: Colin Brynmor Davis
Represented By: Jason Jacob Mendro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark C. Oman
Represented By: John M. O'Toole
Represented By: Raymond J. DiCamillo
Represented By: Craig Varnen
Represented By: Colin Brynmor Davis
Represented By: Jason Jacob Mendro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark E. Seaton
Represented By: John M. O'Toole
Represented By: Raymond J. DiCamillo
Represented By: Craig Varnen
Represented By: Colin Brynmor Davis
Represented By: Jason Jacob Mendro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norman Hollett
Represented By: Michael J Farnan
Represented By: Brian E Farnan
Represented By: Robert C Moest
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?