Nathaniel Gulley v. The Hertz Corporation
Plaintiff: Nathaniel Gulley
Defendant: The Hertz Corporation and DOES 1 through 25, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2021cv00732
Filed: January 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Patricia Donahue
Referring Judge: Dale S Fischer
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Dale S. Fischer. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 6/6/22. (rfi)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Order re Jury Trial by Judge Dale S. Fischer. These dates and requirements are firm. The Court is very unlikely to grant continuances unless the parties establish good cause through a concrete showing. Failure to complete discovery in a timely manner does not constitute good cause, nor does the fact that a settlement conference is pending. Each side is limited to five motions in limine, unless the Court orders otherwise. See Trial Order for specifics. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/1/2022 at 3:00 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. Jury Trial set for 8/30/2022 at 8:30 AM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (rfi)
March 10, 2021 Filing 12 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: (IN CHAMBERS) SCHEDULING ORDER. The Court takes the Scheduling Conference off calendar and establishes the case management dates as proposed by parties in the Joint Rule 26(f) Report as further described in the Schedule of Pretrial and Trial dates except as noted in the Order re Trial. (See Order re Trial for specific dates and times.) These dates and requirements are firm. The Court is very unlikely to grant continuances unless the parties establish good cause through a concrete showing. Failure to complete discovery in a timely manner does not constitute good cause, nor does the fact that a settlement conference is pending. Each side is limited to five motions in limine unless the Court orders otherwise. All fictitiously named defendants are dismissed. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rfi) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 5, 2021 Filing 11 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial Plaintiff estimates 5-7 days; Defendant estimates 3-4 days, filed by Defendant The Hertz Corporation.. (Rutschman, Aaron)
February 1, 2021 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant The Hertz Corporation, Certification of Service and Filing of Notice to Plaintiff and Clerk of the Superior Court of Removal of Civil Action to United States District Court (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service to Certification of Service and Filing of Notice to Plaintiff)(Bromley, Richard)
January 29, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF INITIAL STANDING ORDER filed by Defendant The Hertz Corporation. (Rutschman, Aaron)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Joint Report must include the completed Schedule of Pretrial and Trial dates. Lead trial counsel are ordered to appear in person unless counsel have been excused by the Court. Scheduling Conference set for 3/15/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (rfi)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (rfi)
January 28, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
January 28, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue. (jtil)
January 27, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant The Hertz Corporation in Los Angeles Superior Court on 1/26/2021, attached as Exhibit 4.(jtil)
January 27, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Nathaniel Gulley in Los Angelse Superior Court on 12/28/2020, attached as Exhibit 2. (jtil)
January 27, 2021 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant The Hertz Corporation identifying Hertz Global Holdings, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service to Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Bromley, Richard)
January 27, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant The Hertz Corporation, identifying Nathaniel Gulley, The Hertz Corporation, Hertz Global Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service to Notice of Interested Parties)(Bromley, Richard)
January 27, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant The Hertz Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service to USDC Civil Cover Sheet)(Bromley, Richard)
January 27, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 20STCV49477 Receipt No: ACACDC-30265146 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant The Hertz Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service to Notice of Removal, #2 Complaint, #3 Service of Process for The Hertz Corporation, #4 Answer) (Attorney Richard E Bromley added to party The Hertz Corporation(pty:dft))(Bromley, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nathaniel Gulley v. The Hertz Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathaniel Gulley
Represented By: Alexander Wallin
Represented By: Elizabeth Marion Votra
Represented By: Young W Ryu
Represented By: Sarah Hannah Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Hertz Corporation
Represented By: Richard E Bromley
Represented By: Aaron M Rutschman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 25, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?