County of Mono et al v. Liberty Utilities Calpeco Electric, LLC et al
Plaintiff: County of Mono, Toiyabe Indian Health Project, Inc., Antelope Valley Fire Protection District and Bridgeport Indian Colony
Defendant: Algonquin Power and Utilities Corp, Does 1 through 50, inclusive and Liberty Utilities Calpeco Electric, LLC
Petitioner: Liberty Utilities (CalPeco Electric) LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv00769
Filed: January 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jean P Rosenbluth
Referring Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2021 Filing 15 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Leave to File Document, #14 , Response in Opposition to Motion, #13 filed by Plaintiff Antelope Valley Fire Protection District, Bridgeport Indian Colony, County of Mono, Toiyabe Indian Health Project, Inc.. (Fiske, John)
March 18, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to file First Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Antelope Valley Fire Protection District, Bridgeport Indian Colony, County of Mono, Toiyabe Indian Health Project, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 4/15/2021 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration of John Fiske, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Proposed Order) (Fiske, John)
March 18, 2021 Filing 13 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to Eastern District of California Defendant Liberty Utilities (CALPECO ELECTRIC) LLC'S Motion to Transfer Venue for Convenience #10 filed by Plaintiffs Antelope Valley Fire Protection District, Bridgeport Indian Colony, County of Mono, Toiyabe Indian Health Project, Inc.. (Attorney John P Fiske added to party Bridgeport Indian Colony(pty:pla))(Fiske, John)
March 17, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Ahmed S Diab counsel for Plaintiff County of Mono. Changing Attorney name to Ed Diab. Filed by Plaintiff County of Mono. (Diab, Ahmed)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER CONTINUING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge George H. Wu. The Court has received and reviewed the parties Joint Rule 26(f) Report (Docket No. #8 ) and a scheduling conference is now set for March 15, 2021. However, Defendant Liberty Utilities has filed a motion to transfer this lawsuit to the Eastern District of California which is now set for hearing on April 8, 2021. See Docket No. #10 . In order to avoid duplicative appearances, the Court continues the March 15, 2021 scheduling conference to April 8, 2021 at 8:30 a.m. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (gga) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 11, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to Eastern District of California Defendant Liberty Utilities (CALPECO ELECTRIC) LLC'S Motion to Transfer Venue for Convenience filed by Defendant Liberty Utilities Calpeco Electric, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 4/8/2021 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum of Points and Authorities ISO Defendant Liberty Utilities (CALPECO ELECTRIC) LLC'S Motion to Transfer Venue, #2 Declaration Declaration of Krsto Mijanovic, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration of Krsto Mijanovic, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B to Declaration of Krsto Mijanovic, #5 Exhibit Exhibit C to Declaration of Krsto Mijanovic, #6 Exhibit Exhibit D to Declaration of Krsto Mijanovic, #7 Exhibit Exhibit E to Declaration of Krsto Mijanovic, #8 Exhibit Exhibit F to Declaration of Krsto Mijanovic, #9 Exhibit Exhibit G to Declaration of Krsto Mijanovic, #10 Exhibit Exhibit H to Declaration of Krsto Mijanovic) (McIntyre, Patrick)
March 10, 2021 Filing 9 TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - IN CHAMBERS: by Judge George H. Wu: Counsel are to appear telephonically for Monday's 03/15/2021 scheduling conference at 8:30 a.m. by contacting the court clerk at javier_gonzalez@cacd.uscourts.gov for dial-in information. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 2, 2021 Filing 8 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial TBD, filed by Defendant Liberty Utilities Calpeco Electric, LLC.. (Mijanovic, Krsto)
February 16, 2021 Filing 7 DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Plaintiffs Antelope Valley Fire Protection District, County of Mono, Toiyabe Indian Health Project, Inc., Bridgeport Indian Colony.. (Fiske, John)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge George H. Wu. (Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/1/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 3/15/2021 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu.) (mrgo)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS BEFORE JUDGE GEORGE H. WU by Judge George H. Wu. (See document for details) (mrgo)
January 29, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachments No. 4 Notice of Interested Parties and No. 6 Civil Case Cover Sheet should not have been attached to Docket Entry No. 1. Each document should have been filed separately. You are not required to take any action to correct this deficiency unless the Court so directs. (lh)
January 29, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
January 29, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (lh)
January 28, 2021 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Algonquin Power and Utilities Corp, Bridgeport Indian Colony, Does, Liberty Utilities Calpeco Electric, LLC. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiffs Antelope Valley Fire Protection District, Toiyabe Indian Health Project, Inc., County of Mono. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 1/19/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
January 28, 2021 NON-CONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint, filed by Defendant Liberty Utilities Calpeco Electric, LLC. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 )(lh)
January 28, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles, case number 21STCV01855 Receipt No: ACACDC-30282898 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Liberty Utilities (CalPeco Electric) LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Declaration of Krsto Mijanovic, #4 Notice of Interested Parties, #5 Demand for Jury Trial, #6 Civil Case Cover Sheet) (Attorney Krsto Mijanovic added to party Liberty Utilities (CalPeco Electric) LLC(pty:bkmov))(Mijanovic, Krsto)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: County of Mono et al v. Liberty Utilities Calpeco Electric, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Liberty Utilities (CalPeco Electric) LLC
Represented By: Krsto Mijanovic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: County of Mono
Represented By: John P Fiske
Represented By: Edward S Diab
Represented By: Deborah S. Dixon
Represented By: Robert J Chambers, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Toiyabe Indian Health Project, Inc.
Represented By: John P Fiske
Represented By: Edward S Diab
Represented By: Deborah S. Dixon
Represented By: Robert J Chambers, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antelope Valley Fire Protection District
Represented By: John P Fiske
Represented By: Edward S Diab
Represented By: Deborah S. Dixon
Represented By: Robert J Chambers, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bridgeport Indian Colony
Represented By: John P Fiske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Algonquin Power and Utilities Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 50, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Utilities Calpeco Electric, LLC
Represented By: Steven Andrew Scordalakis
Represented By: Patrick Francis McIntyre
Represented By: Krsto Mijanovic
Represented By: Lisa Tamiko Omoto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?