Erica Henderson et al v. Alejandro Villanueva
Petitioner: Jeffrey Pierce Henderson and Erica Michelle Henderson
Respondent: Alejandro Villanueva
Case Number: 2:2021cv00802
Filed: January 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Percy Anderson
Referring Judge: John E McDermott
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2021 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE re: Petition for Certificate of Appealability #8 , Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #7 , Declaration In Support of Petitioners' Application for Issuance of a Certificate of Appelability #9 (car)
March 4, 2021 Filing 9 DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF PETITIONERS' APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF A CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY #8 (car)
March 4, 2021 Filing 8 APPLICATION for Issuance of a Certificate of Appealability to the 9th CCA by Petitioners Erica Michelle Henderson, Jeffrey Pierce Henderson (car)
March 4, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA filed by Plaintiffs Erica Michelle Henderson, Jeffrey Pierce Henderson. Appeal of Order Dismissing Case #4 Filed On: 02/11/2021; Entered On: 02/11/2021; Certificate of Appealability ruled on 2/11/21 see item 4. (car)
March 4, 2021 Filing 6 NOTIFICATION from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals of case number assigned and briefing schedule. Appeal Docket No. 21-55198 assigned to Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #5 as to Petitioners Erica Michelle Henderson, Jeffrey Pierce Henderson. (et)
March 4, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA filed by petitioner Erica Michelle Henderson, Jeffrey Pierce Henderson. Appeal of Order Dismissing Case #4 Filed On: 2/11/21; Entered On: 2/11/21; Certificate of Appealability has been ruled on 2/11/21, see item 4. (mat)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER SUMMARILY DISMISSING PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AND DENYING CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY by Judge Percy Anderson. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (es)
February 1, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge Percy Anderson and referred to Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (jtil)
January 25, 2021 Filing 2 ELECTION REGARDING CONSENT to Proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge Declined, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636c filed by Petitioners Erica Michelle Henderson and Jeffrey Pierce Henderson. The Petitioners does not consent. (jtil)
January 25, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person In State Custody (28:2254) filed by Petitioners Erica Michelle Henderson and Jeffrey Pierce Henderson. Case assigned to Judge Percy Anderson and referred to Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (jtil)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Erica Henderson et al v. Alejandro Villanueva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Alejandro Villanueva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jeffrey Pierce Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Erica Michelle Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?