Hanna Kayali et al v. Robinhood Financial, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Hanna Kayali and Mohammed A. Doleh
Defendant: DOES 1-10, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Melvin Capital Management, LP, The Depository Trust Company, Charles Schwab and Co. Inc., Citadel Enterprise Americas, LLC, Robinhood Financial, LLC, TD Ameritrade, Inc., The Depository Trust & Clearing Corporation and Robinhood Securities, LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv00835
Filed: January 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Virginia A Phillips
Referring Judge: Michael R Wilner
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1337
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2021 Filing 38 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Summons Issued #34 . Document 34 - Summons on First Amended Complaint was issued incorrectly to the incorrect defendant. The summons has been issued on the correct defendant docket entry 37. (shb)
March 17, 2021 Filing 37 21 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint/Petition, #10 as to Defendant The Charles Schwab Corporation. (shb)
March 17, 2021 Filing 36 21 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint/Petition, #10 as to Defendant Charles Schwab and Co. Inc.. (shb)
March 17, 2021 Filing 35 21 DAY Summons Issued on Amended Complaint #10 as to Defendant Melvin Capital Management, LP. (yl)
March 17, 2021 Filing 34 [REFER TO NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR, DKT #38 - 21 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint/Petition, #10 as to Defendant Charles Schwab and Co. Inc.. (shb) Modified on 3/17/2021 (shb).
March 17, 2021 Filing 33 21 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint/Petition, #10 as to Defendant TD Ameritrade, Inc.. (shb)
March 12, 2021 Filing 32 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Mohammed A. Doleh, Hanna Kayali. upon Citadel Enterprise Americas, LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 3/11/2021, answer due 5/10/2021. Waiver of Service signed by Dawson K. Robinson. (Blaise, Heather)
March 11, 2021 Filing 31 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition, #10 filed by Plaintiffs Mohammed A. Doleh, Hanna Kayali. (Attachments: #1 TD Ameritrade, Inc, #2 The Charles Schwab Corporation, #3 Charles Schwab & Co. Inc.)(Blaise, Heather)
March 11, 2021 Filing 30 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Mohammed A. Doleh, Hanna Kayali. upon The Depository Trust & Clearing Corporation waiver sent by Plaintiff on 3/4/2021, answer due 5/3/2021. Waiver of Service signed by Gregory M. Boyle. (Blaise, Heather)
March 11, 2021 Filing 29 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Mohammed A. Doleh, Hanna Kayali. upon The Depository Trust Company waiver sent by Plaintiff on 3/4/2021, answer due 5/3/2021. Waiver of Service signed by Gregory M. Boyle. (Blaise, Heather)
March 4, 2021 Filing 28 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Mohammed A. Doleh, Hanna Kayali. upon Robinhood Markets, Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 3/3/2021, answer due 5/3/2021. Waiver of Service signed by Kevin J. Orsini. (Blaise, Heather)
March 4, 2021 Filing 27 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Mohammed A. Doleh, Hanna Kayali. upon Robinhood Securities, LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 3/3/2021, answer due 5/3/2021. Waiver of Service signed by Kevin J. Orsini. (Blaise, Heather)
March 4, 2021 Filing 26 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Mohammed A. Doleh, Hanna Kayali. upon Robinhood Financial, LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 3/3/2021, answer due 5/3/2021. Waiver of Service signed by Kevin J. Orsini. (Blaise, Heather)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER DISCHARGING THE OBLIGATION TO SUBMIT CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, EXTENDING TIME TO FILE CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING by Judge Virginia A. Phillips: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the obligation for Kevin J. Orsini to file a Certificate of Good Standing from the New Jersey State Bar in this action is discharged. IT IS SO ORDERED. (yl)
February 17, 2021 Filing 23 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Discharging the Obligation to Submit Certificate of Good Standing Or, in the Alternative, Extending Time to File Certificate of Good Standing filed by Defendants Robinhood Financial, LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kevin J. Orsini, #2 Proposed Order) (Kang, Grace)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER by Judge Virginia A. Phillips: granting #15 Non-Resident Attorney Anthony L. Ryan APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Robinhood Financial, LLC, Robinhood Securities, LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., designating Naeun Rim as local counsel. (yl)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING AND CONDITIONALLY GRANTING PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION #21 by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. See order for further information. (lom)
February 8, 2021 Filing 21 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Extension of Time to File Certificate of Good Standing and Conditionally Granting Pro Hac Vice Application filed by Defendants Robinhood Financial, LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kevin J. Orsini, #2 Proposed Order) (Kang, Grace)
February 8, 2021 Filing 20 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Robinhood Financial, LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC, (Rim, Naeun)
February 5, 2021 Filing 19 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS. Counsel shall submit the Certificate of Good Standing for every state court listed to which counsel has been admitted in compliance with Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) no later than 4 pm of February 8, 2021. See Notice to Filer of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application filed on 02/04/21 #18 . (cch)
February 4, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Kevin J. Orsini to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Robinhood Financial, LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-30390409) #14 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. Other error(s) with document(s): NJ missing. A declaration is required regarding unavailability to provide GSC due to COVID-19. See Court's website on Coronavirus (COVID-19) Guidance. (Thrasher, Lupe)
February 4, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance, #11 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance of Withdrawal of Counsel G123.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
February 3, 2021 Filing 16 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Naeun Rim counsel for Defendants Robinhood Financial, LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC. Adding Naeun Rim as counsel of record for Defendants Robinhood Financial LLC, Robinhood Securities, LLC, and Robinhood Markets, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Robinhood Financial LLC, Robinhood Securities, LLC, and Robinhood Markets, Inc.. (Rim, Naeun)
February 3, 2021 Filing 15 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Antony L. Ryan to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Robinhood Financial, LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-30390480) filed by Defendants Robinhood Financial, LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Rim, Naeun)
February 3, 2021 Filing 14 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Kevin J. Orsini to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Robinhood Financial, LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-30390409) filed by Defendants Robinhood Financial, LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Rim, Naeun)
February 3, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendants Robinhood Financial, LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC. Related Case(s): 2:21-cv-00837-FMO(Ex) and 2:21-cv-00843-CBM(Ex) (Rim, Naeun)
February 3, 2021 Filing 12 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Naeun Rim counsel for Defendants Robinhood Financial, LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC. Adding Naeun Rim as counsel of record for Defendants Robinhood Financial LLC, Robinhood Securities, LLC, and Robinhood Markets, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Robinhood Financial LLC, Robinhood Securities, LLC, and Robinhood Markets, Inc.. (Attorney Naeun Rim added to party Robinhood Financial, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Naeun Rim added to party Robinhood Markets, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Naeun Rim added to party Robinhood Securities, LLC(pty:dft))(Rim, Naeun)
February 3, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Grace W. Kang on behalf of Defendants Robinhood Financial, LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC (Attorney Grace W. Kang added to party Robinhood Financial, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Grace W. Kang added to party Robinhood Markets, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Grace W. Kang added to party Robinhood Securities, LLC(pty:dft))(Kang, Grace)
January 29, 2021 Filing 10 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Charles Schwab and Co. Inc., Citadel Enterprise Americas, LLC, Melvin Capital Management, LP, Robinhood Financial, LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC, TD Ameritrade, Inc., The Charles Schwab Corporation, The Depository Trust Company, The Depository Trust & Clearing Corporation, DOES 1-10 amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , filed by Plaintiffs Mohammed A. Doleh, Hanna Kayali(Blaise, Heather)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (cch)
January 29, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Notice of Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109), #6 was issued in error to attorney Lana B Nassar. Docket item 6 should be disregarded. (car)
January 29, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): A temporary restraining order (TRO) flag was indicated, but no TRO document was filed. (car)
January 29, 2021 Filing 6 [NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR ISSUED ON 1/29/2021, SEE ITEM 8] NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Lana B Nassar. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (car) Modified on 1/29/2021 (car).
January 29, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
January 29, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Virginia A. Phillips and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (car)
January 28, 2021 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Mohammed A. Doleh, Hanna Kayali, identifying Robinhood Financial, LLC; Robinhood Securities, LLC; Robinhood Markets, Inc.; Citadel Enterprise Americas, LLC; Melvin Capital Management, LP; TD Ameritrade, Inc.; The Charles Schwab Corporation; Charles Schwab & Co. Inc.. (Blaise, Heather)
January 28, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Mohammed A. Doleh, Hanna Kayali. (Blaise, Heather)
January 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-30303439 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiffs Mohammed A. Doleh, Hanna Kayali. (Attorney Heather Lea Blaise added to party Mohammed A. Doleh(pty:pla), Attorney Heather Lea Blaise added to party Hanna Kayali(pty:pla))(Blaise, Heather)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hanna Kayali et al v. Robinhood Financial, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Charles Schwab Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robinhood Markets, Inc.
Represented By: Naeun Rim
Represented By: Antony L. Ryan
Represented By: Kevin J. Orsini
Represented By: Grace W. Kang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melvin Capital Management, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Depository Trust Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Schwab and Co. Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citadel Enterprise Americas, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robinhood Financial, LLC
Represented By: Naeun Rim
Represented By: Antony L. Ryan
Represented By: Kevin J. Orsini
Represented By: Grace W. Kang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TD Ameritrade, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Depository Trust & Clearing Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robinhood Securities, LLC
Represented By: Naeun Rim
Represented By: Antony L. Ryan
Represented By: Kevin J. Orsini
Represented By: Grace W. Kang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hanna Kayali
Represented By: Heather Lea Blaise
Represented By: Lana Bajes Nassar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohammed A. Doleh
Represented By: Heather Lea Blaise
Represented By: Lana Bajes Nassar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?