Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd. v. Viking Range, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd.
Defendant: Viking Range, LLC, Northland Corporation, Haskel International, LLC, C&K Components, LLC, Tres Holding, LLC, Does 2-20, inclusive, Doe and C and K Components, LLC
Cross Defendant: DOES 1-20 Inclusive, Servwell Kitchen Appliances and Plumbing LLC a Delaware limited liability company doing business as Serv-Well LLC and Servwell Kitchen Appliances and Plumbing LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv01055
Filed: February 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles F Eick
Referring Judge: Otis D Wright
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Ryan C. Edwards to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Haskel International, LLC #19 and designating Bart L Kessel as local counsel by Judge Otis D. Wright, II (lc)
March 12, 2021 Filing 19 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Ryan C. Edwards to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Haskel International, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-30905963) filed by Defendant Haskel International, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Kessel, Bart)
March 3, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice (Other) #17 by C and K Components, LLC. The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice: Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties. Other error(s) with document(s): Note: To assist in a search for correct events, please use the "SEARCH" option for a "key word" to narrow the selection process. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
March 3, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE filed by defedant and cross-complainant C and K Components, LLC. (Starinieri, Teresa)
March 2, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint (Discovery) #14 by C and K Components, LLC. The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
March 2, 2021 Filing 15 CROSSCLAIM against Cross-defendant Servwell Kitchen Appliances and Plumbing LLC ; jury demand, filed by cross complainant C and K Components, LLC.(Starinieri, Teresa)
March 2, 2021 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant C and K Components, LLC.(Attorney Teresa Marie Starinieri added to party C and K Components, LLC(pty:dft))(Starinieri, Teresa)
February 17, 2021 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd. identifying The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Delinko, Matthew)
February 17, 2021 Filing 12 DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Plaintiff Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd... (Delinko, Matthew)
February 12, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Northland Corporation, Viking Range, LLCATTACHMENT 1 TO, Answer to Complaint (Discovery) #10 . The following error(s) was/were found: Filer should have e-filed the notice separately under its own specific event. Other error(s) with document(s): Note: To assist in a search for correct events, please use the "SEARCH" option for a "key word" to narrow the selection process. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
February 11, 2021 CROSS COMPLAINT against cross defendants C and K Components, LLC, Tres Holding, LLC, filed by cross claimants Northland Corporation, Viking Range, LLC. (FILED AS AN ATTACHMENT TO ANSWER SEE DOCKET NO. 10-2) (lc) Modified on 2/12/2021 (lc).
February 11, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to Crossclaim, Complaint - (Discovery), with JURY DEMAND , ANSWER to Crossclaim, Complaint - (Discovery), with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendants Northland Corporation, Viking Range, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Interested Parties and Corporate Disclosure Statement, #2 Cross-Complaint of Viking Range, LLC and Northland Corporation)(Attorney Aaron Belzer added to party Northland Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Aaron Belzer added to party Viking Range, LLC(pty:dft))(Belzer, Aaron)
February 11, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Haskel International, LLC.(Kessel, Bart)
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that the Scheduling Conference is set for May 24, 2021 1:30 PM ; compliance with FRCP 16, and 26(f) and filing of joint report; Counsel for plaintiff shall immediately serve this Order on all parties, including any new parties to the action by Judge Otis D Wright, II (lc)
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. The Court's Electronic Document Submission System (EDSS) allows people without lawyers who havepending cases in the United States District Court for the Central District of California to submit documents electronically to the Clerk's Office The parties may consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge appearing on the voluntary consent list. PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. Please refer to Court's Website and Judge's procedures for information as applicable. (lc)
February 5, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
February 5, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (car)
February 4, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd., upon Defendant Viking Range, LLC served on 1/8/2021, answer due 1/29/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Derek Hackett, Document Specialist, CT Corporation System, Registered Agent in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. Filed in State Court on 1/11/2021 Submitted with Attachment 3 to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
February 4, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants C and K Components, LLC, Does 1-20, inclusive, Haskel International, LLC, Northland Corporation, Viking Range, LLC. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd. Filed in State court on 12/30/2020 Submitted with Attachment 2 to Notice of Removal #1 . (car)
February 4, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd., upon Defendant C and K Components, LLC served on 1/8/2021, answer due 1/29/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Amy McLaren, Intake Specialist, CT Corporation, Registered Agent in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. Filed in State Court on 1/11/2021 Submitted with Attachment 3 to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
February 4, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd., upon Defendant Haskel International, LLC served on 1/5/2021, answer due 1/26/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Carlos Paz, Intake Specialist for CT Corporation System as Agent for service of process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. Filed in State Court on 1/8/2021 Submitted with Attachment 3 to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
February 4, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Tres Holding, LLC. Filed in State Court on 1/29/2021 Submitted with Attachment 3 to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
February 4, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF CROSS-COMPLAINT against Cross-Defendant Viking Range, LLC, Servwell Kitchen Appliances and Plumbing LLC, filed by Defendant and Cross Claimant Tres Holding, LLC. Filed in State Court on 1/29/2020 Submitted with Attachment 3 to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
February 4, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd., upon Defendant Northland Corporation served on 1/13/2021, answer due 2/3/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Kathy Hunt, Intake Specialist, CT Corporation, Registered Agent in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. Filed in State Court on 1/19/2021 Submitted with Attachment 3 to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
February 4, 2021 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Haskel International, LLC, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 served on 2/4/21. (Kessel, Bart)
February 4, 2021 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Haskel International, LLC, (Kessel, Bart)
February 4, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Haskel International, LLC. (Kessel, Bart)
February 4, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the State of California, County of Los Angeles, case number 20TRCV00956 Receipt No: ACACDC-30410899 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Haskel International, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Bart Kessel, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2) (Attorney Bart L. Kessel added to party Haskel International, LLC(pty:dft))(Kessel, Bart)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd. v. Viking Range, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viking Range, LLC
Represented By: Aaron Belzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northland Corporation
Represented By: Aaron Belzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Haskel International, LLC
Represented By: Bart L. Kessel
Represented By: Ryan C. Edwards
Represented By: Jane Harrington Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C&K Components, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tres Holding, LLC
Represented By: Roy D Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 2-20, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe
Represented By: Roy D Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C and K Components, LLC
Represented By: Teresa Marie Starinieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sentinel Insurance Company, Ltd.
Represented By: A. Scott Loewe
Represented By: Matthew Edward Delinko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: DOES 1-20 Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Servwell Kitchen Appliances and Plumbing LLC a Delaware limited liability company doing business as Serv-Well LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Servwell Kitchen Appliances and Plumbing LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?