Joseph Gamaty v. BMW of North America, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Joseph Gamaty
Defendant: BMW of North America, LLC and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2021cv01063
Filed: February 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: R Gary Klausner
Referring Judge: Alexander F MacKinnon
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 2301 Magnuson-Moss Warranty Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 163 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) Corrected Order Re: Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs [DE #129 ]; Plaintiff's Motion to Re-tax Costs [DE #150 ] by Judge R. Gary Klausner: The Court issues the following Corrected Order, which accords with the analysis conducted the original Order and remedies the above-referenced errors: (1) The Court GRANTS in part Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys' Fees at Dkt. No. 129, and AWARDS Plaintiff $141,354.00 in attorneys' fees. (2) The Court DENIES Plaintiff's Motion to Re-Tax Costs at Dkt. No. 150. The final award of costs shall be in the amount taxed by the Clerk, $7,079.74. (jp)
July 26, 2022 Filing 162 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Tionna Dolin counsel for Plaintiff Joseph Gamaty. Kareem Shereef Aref is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Joseph Gamaty. (Dolin, Tionna)
July 6, 2022 Filing 161 Defendant's Objections to Order Re Plaintiff's Attorneys' Fees and Costs Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Re-Tax Costs against All Defendants #150 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees #129 filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. (Oaks, Ashley)
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 160 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order Re: Plaintiff's Motion For Attorneys' Fees and Costs [DE #129 ]; Plaintiff's Motion to Re-tax Costs [DE #150 ] by Judge R. Gary Klausner: The Court GRANTS in part Plaintiff's Motion, awarding Plaintiff $342,782.50 in attorneys' fees and costs. (See Civil Minutes for further specifics. (jp)
June 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 159 SCHEDULING NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES AND ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge R. Gary Klausner: Plaintiff's Motion to Re-Tax Costs #150 , calendared for hearing on 6/27/2022, has been taken under submission and off the motion calendar. No appearances by counsel are necessary. The Court will issue a ruling after full consideration of properly submitted pleadings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jre) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner re Reply (Motion related), #156 . The following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order for the following reason(s): Memorandum/Brief excceds 10 pages in violation of the Court's Standing Order. (jre)
June 14, 2022 Filing 157 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Tionna Dolin counsel for Plaintiff Joseph Gamaty. Karin Kuemerle is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Joseph Gamaty. (Dolin, Tionna)
June 13, 2022 Filing 156 REPLY in support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Re-Tax Costs against All Defendants #150 filed by Plaintiff Joseph Gamaty. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of J. Clark, #2 Exhibit Ex 1 - Application to the Clerk to Tax Costs, #3 Exhibit Ex 2 - ECF Notice, #4 Exhibit Ex 3 - Accepted Application to Tax Costs from Clerk, #5 Exhibit Ex 4 - Application to the Clerk to Tax Costs - signed)(Clark, Jason)
June 13, 2022 Filing 155 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jason Patrick Clark on behalf of Plaintiff Joseph Gamaty (Clark, Jason)
June 6, 2022 Filing 154 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Re-Tax Costs against All Defendants #150 filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. (Oaks, Ashley)
May 26, 2022 Filing 153 Notice of Electronic Filing re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Re-Tax Costs against All Defendants #150 , Notice of Lodging #152 , Notice of Motion #151 , Bill of Costs (CV-59) #148 e-mailed to Karin Kuemerle bounced due to unknown address error. The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cbr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 24, 2022 Filing 152 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Re-Tax Costs against All Defendants #150 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Retax Costs Under L.R. 54-2.5)(Clark, Jason)
May 24, 2022 Filing 151 NOTICE OF MOTION re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Re-Tax Costs against All Defendants #150 filed by Plaintiff Joseph Gamaty. Motion set for hearing on 6/27/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Clark, Jason)
May 24, 2022 Filing 150 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Re-Tax Costs against All Defendants filed by plaintiff Joseph Gamaty. Motion set for hearing on 6/27/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Jason Clark In support of plaintiff's motion to retax costs under L.R. 54-2.5) (Clark, Jason)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 149 SCHEDULING NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES AND ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge R. Gary Klausner: Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Fees #129 , calendared for hearing on 5/23/2022, has been taken under submission and off the motion calendar. No appearances by counsel are necessary. The Court will issue a ruling after full consideration of properly submitted pleadings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jre) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 17, 2022 Filing 148 BILL OF COSTS. Costs Taxed in amount of $ $7,079.74 in favor of Plaintiff and against Defendant re Application to the Clerk to Tax Costs against Defendant BMW of North America, LLC #134 . (dgo)
May 10, 2022 Filing 147 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of APPLICATION to the Clerk to Tax Costs against Defendant BMW of North America, LLC #134 filed by Plaintiff Joseph Gamaty. (Clark, Jason)
May 9, 2022 Filing 146 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Joseph Gamatyto Objection/Opposition (Motion related) #141 , Objection/Opposition (Motion related) #142 (Clark, Jason)
May 9, 2022 Filing 145 OBJECTIONS to Declaration (Motion related), #140 filed by Plaintiff Joseph Gamaty. (Clark, Jason)
May 9, 2022 Filing 144 REPLY in Support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees #129 filed by Plaintiff Joseph Gamaty. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Of Eliana Amirian In Support Of Plaintiffs Reply In Support Of Motion For Attorney Fees, Costs And Expenses)(Clark, Jason)
May 6, 2022 Filing 143 DEFENDANTS OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFSAPPLICATIONTO THE CLERK TO TAX COSTS OPPOSITION re: APPLICATION to the Clerk to Tax Costs against Defendant BMW of North America, LLC #134 filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. (Oaks, Ashley)
May 2, 2022 Filing 142 OBJECTION Evidentiary Objections to Declaration of Payam Shahian ISO Opposition to Motion for Attorneys Fees re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees #129 filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. (Oaks, Ashley)
May 2, 2022 Filing 141 OBJECTION Evidentiary Objections to Declaration of Matthew Pardo ISO Opposition to Motion for Attorneys Fees. re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees #129 filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. (Oaks, Ashley)
May 2, 2022 Filing 140 DECLARATION of Andrew K. Stefatos in opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees #129 filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Oaks, Ashley)
May 2, 2022 Filing 139 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees #129 filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. (Oaks, Ashley)
April 26, 2022 Filing 138 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ariel Harman-Holmes counsel for Plaintiff Joseph Gamaty. Adding Ariel Harman-Holmes as counsel of record for Joseph Gamaty for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Joseph Gamaty. (Attorney Ariel Harman-Holmes added to party Joseph Gamaty(pty:pla))(Harman-Holmes, Ariel)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 137 SCHEDULING NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES AND ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge R. Gary Klausner. The hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Fees #129 is ADVANCED and reset to 5/23/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. Briefing shall be due accordingly. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jre) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 25, 2022 Filing 136 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Motion #130 . The following error(s) was/were found: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lom)
April 22, 2022 Filing 135 DECLARATION of Eliana Amirian re APPLICATION to the Clerk to Tax Costs against Defendant BMW of North America, LLC #134 filed by Plaintiff Joseph Gamaty. (Attachments: #1 TABS 2A-12Z)(Clark, Jason)
April 22, 2022 Filing 134 APPLICATION to the Clerk to Tax Costs against Defendant BMW of North America, LLC filed by Plaintiff Joseph Gamaty. (Clark, Jason)
April 22, 2022 Filing 133 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees #129 filed by Plaintiff Joseph Gamaty. (Clark, Jason)
April 22, 2022 Filing 132 DECLARATION of Payam Shahian in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees #129 filed by Plaintiff Joseph Gamaty. (Clark, Jason)
April 22, 2022 Filing 131 DECLARATION of Matthew Pardo in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees #129 filed by Plaintiff Joseph Gamaty. (Clark, Jason)
April 22, 2022 Filing 130 NOTICE OF MOTION re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees #129 filed by Plaintiff Joseph Gamaty. Motion set for hearing on 6/6/2022 at 08:30 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Clark, Jason)
April 22, 2022 Filing 129 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Plaintiff Joseph Gamaty. Motion set for hearing on 6/6/2022 at 08:30 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Jason Patrick Clark added to party Joseph Gamaty(pty:pla)) (Clark, Jason)
April 8, 2022 Filing 128 JUDGMENT OF JURY VERDICT by Judge R. Gary Klausner in favor of Joseph Gamaty against BMW of North America, LLC as follows: (1) Total payment of $37,660.02; (2) Attorneys' Fees as determined by the Court via post-trial motion; and (3) Costs as determined by Court via post-trial motion. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (See Judgment for further specifics). (jp)
April 4, 2022 Filing 127 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Jury Verdict #125 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's [Proposed] Judgment of Jury Verdict)(Pardo, Matthew)
March 11, 2022 Filing 126 SEALED - UNREDACTED - VERDICT re: Redacted - Verdict #125 . (jp)
March 11, 2022 Filing 125 REDACTED - VERDICT. (jp)
March 11, 2022 Filing 124 RECEIPT FOR RELEASE OF EXHIBITS to Counsel Upon Verdict/Judgment at Trial; Pursuant to stip of counsel and/or by Order of the Court, all exhibits listed on Joint exhibits list are returned to counsel for respective party(ies). (jp)
March 11, 2022 Filing 123 LIST OF EXHIBITS AND WITNESSES at trial. (jp)
March 11, 2022 Filing 122 SEALED - UNREDACTED - Jury Notes # 3 filed re: Redacted - Jury Notes # 3 #121 . (jp)
March 11, 2022 Filing 121 REDACTED - Jury Notes # 3 filed. (jp)
March 11, 2022 Filing 120 SEALED - UNREDACTED - Jury Notes # 2 filed re: Redacted - Jury Notes # 2 #119 . (jp)
March 11, 2022 Filing 119 REDACTED - Jury Notes # 2 filed. (jp)
March 11, 2022 Filing 118 SEALED - UNREDACTED - Jury Notes # 1 filed re: Redacted - Jury Notes # 1 #117 . (jp)
March 11, 2022 Filing 117 REDACTED - Jury Notes # 1 filed. (jp)
March 11, 2022 Filing 116 JURY INSTRUCTIONS (Given at Trial) by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (jp)
March 11, 2022 Filing 115 MINUTES OF Jury Trial - 4th Day Completed by jury verdict/submitted to court before Judge R. Gary Klausner: Jury resumes deliberations. Jury Verdict in favor of plaintiff(s). Jury polled. Filed Witness and Exhibit Lists. Filed jury notes. Filed jury instructions. Counsel stipulate to the return of exhibits upon the conclusion of trial. Exhibit Release Form prepared and filed. As more fully reflected on the record, Defendant's objection to the verdict form is overruled. Prevailing party to lodge a proposed judgment for the Court's consideration. Court Reporter: Miriam Baird. (jp)
March 10, 2022 Filing 114 MINUTES OF Jury Trial - 3rd Day Held and Continued before Judge R. Gary Klausner: Witnesses called, sworn and testified. Exhibits identified and admitted. Closing arguments made by plaintiff(s), defendant(s). Court instructs jury. Bailiff(s) sworn. Jury retires to deliberate. Case continued to 3/11/2022 at 8:30 AM., for further trial/further jury deliberation. As more fully reflected on the record, Defendants Motion to Exclude Additional Opinions and Related Testimony of Plaintiffs Expert Witness, Randall Bounds #109 is DENIED. Plaintiff's Motion For Directed Verdict is due on or before 3/14/22, at noon. Any replies due 3/16/2022, by noon. Court Reporter: Miranda Algorri. (jp)
March 10, 2022 Filing 112 PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS filed by Plaintiff Joseph Gamaty.. (Pardo, Matthew)
March 9, 2022 Filing 113 AMENDED MINUTES OF Jury Trial - 2nd Day Held and Continued before Judge R. Gary Klausner: Witnesses called, sworn and testified. Exhibits identified and admitted. Plaintiff(s) rest. Case continued to 3/10/2022 at 8:30 AM., for further trial/further jury deliberation. As more fully reflected on the record, Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude Undisclosed Surprise Witness #101 is DENIED. Plaintiffs Motion to Exclude Untimely Expert Opinion #103 is GRANTED. Court Reporter: Miranda Algorri. (jp)
March 9, 2022 Filing 111 MINUTES OF Jury Trial - 2nd Day Held and Continued before Judge R. Gary Klausner: Witnesses called, sworn and testified. Exhibits identified and admitted. Plaintiff(s) rest. Case continued to 3/10/2022 at 8:30 AM., for further trial/further jury deliberation. Court Reporter: Miranda Algorri. (jp)
March 9, 2022 Filing 110 DECLARATION of Daniel R. Villegas in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude Additional Opinions And Related Testimony Of Plaintiffs Expert Witness, Randall Bounds #109 filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Villegas, Daniel)
March 9, 2022 Filing 109 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Exclude Additional Opinions And Related Testimony Of Plaintiffs Expert Witness, Randall Bounds filed by defendant BMW of North America, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 3/10/2022 at 08:30 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Villegas, Daniel)
March 9, 2022 Filing 108 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Andrew K Stefatos counsel for Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. Adding Andrew K. Stefatos as counsel of record for BMW of North America, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. (Attorney Andrew K Stefatos added to party BMW of North America, LLC(pty:dft))(Stefatos, Andrew)
March 9, 2022 Filing 107 PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS filed by defendant BMW of North America, LLC.. (Villegas, Daniel)
March 9, 2022 Filing 105 DECLARATION of Daniel R. Villegas in Opposition to MOTION IN LIMINE to Exclude Undisclosed Surprise Witness #101 filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. (Villegas, Daniel)
March 9, 2022 Filing 104 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION IN LIMINE to Exclude Untimely Expert Opinion #103 filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. (Oaks, Ashley)
March 8, 2022 Filing 106 MINUTES OF Jury Trial - 1st Day Held and Continued before Judge R. Gary Klausner: Jury impaneled and sworn. Opening statements made by Plaintiff and Defense. Witnesses called, sworn and testified. Exhibits identified and admitted. Case continued to 3/9/2022 at 8:30 AM. Counsel shall provide the Court with proposed model jury instructions as instructed in the Court's Order for Jury Trial #14 by 8:00 AM., on 3/9/2022. Counsel to file any motions regarding witness issues by 8:00 AM., on 3/9/2022. Court Reporter: Sherri Kleeger. (jp)
March 8, 2022 Filing 103 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE to Exclude Untimely Expert Opinion filed by Plaintiff Joseph Gamaty. Motion set for hearing on 3/9/2022 at 08:30 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Aref, Kareem)
March 8, 2022 Filing 102 DECLARATION of Matthew Pardo In Support Of MOTION IN LIMINE to Exclude Undisclosed Surprise Witness #101 filed by Plaintiff Joseph Gamaty. (Aref, Kareem)
March 8, 2022 Filing 101 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE to Exclude Undisclosed Surprise Witness filed by Plaintiff Joseph Gamaty. Motion set for hearing on 3/9/2022 at 08:30 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner.(Aref, Kareem)
March 8, 2022 Filing 100 PROPOSED Special (Express Warranty) JURY VERDICT filed by defendant BMW of North America, LLC. (Oaks, Ashley)
March 7, 2022 Filing 99 NOTICE OF LODGING filed By Defendant BMW of North America, LLC re Pretrial Conference - Interim,, #71 (Oaks, Ashley)
March 7, 2022 Filing 98 PROPOSED Special JURY VERDICT filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. (Oaks, Ashley)
March 7, 2022 Filing 97 PROPOSED SPECIAL JURY VERDICT filed by Plaintiff Joseph Gamaty. (Pardo, Matthew)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 96 SCHEDULING NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES AND ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge R. Gary Klausner: On the Court's own motion, the Jury Trial set for 3/8/2022 is hereby CONTINUED IN TIME ONLY from 9:00 a.m. to 1:00 p.m. on 3/8/2022. Counsel shall appear at this later time for trial. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jre) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 4, 2022 Filing 95 REPLY in Support of MOTION IN LIMINE # (6) to Exclude Defendant's Untimely Disclosed Expert and Expert Report #34 filed by Plaintiff Joseph Gamaty. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew Pardo in Support of Plaintiff's Reply in Support of Motion in Limine No. 6 to Exclude Defendant's Untimely Disclosed Expert and Expert Report)(Pardo, Matthew)
March 4, 2022 Filing 94 Proposed Voir Dire Questions filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC.. (Villegas, Daniel)
March 3, 2022 Filing 93 STATEMENT of the Case filed by Plaintiff Joseph Gamaty (Pardo, Matthew)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 92 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order Re: Defendant's Ex Parte Application to Compel Completion of the Deposition of Plaintiff's Expert Witness [DE 83] by Judge R. Gary Klausner. For the foregoing reasons, the Court DENIES Defendant's Application #83 . (lom)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 91 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order Re: Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment [DE 76] and Defendant's Motion for Summary Adjudication [DE 72] by Judge R. Gary Klausner. For the foregoing reasons, the Court GRANTS in part and DENIES in part Defendant's Motion #72 . Plaintiff is permitted to aggregate all repairs related to the Engine Stalling Issues, as well as the air-conditioning issue. Plaintiff may not aggregate the remaining Ancillary Issues. Having resolved the aggregation issue, the Court DENIES Plaintiff's Motion as moot #76 . (lom)
February 28, 2022 Filing 90 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Daniel R Villegas counsel for Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. Anthony P. Greco is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. (Villegas, Daniel)
February 28, 2022 Filing 89 DECLARATION of Randall Bounds in Support of EX PARTE APPLICATION to Exclude To Compel Completion Of The Deposition Of Plaintiffs Expert Witness, Or In The Alternative, To Exclude Plaintiffs Expert Witness From Testifying At Trial #83 filed by Plaintiff Joseph Gamaty. (Haw, Christine)
February 28, 2022 Filing 88 OPPOSITION Opposition re: EX PARTE APPLICATION to Exclude To Compel Completion Of The Deposition Of Plaintiffs Expert Witness, Or In The Alternative, To Exclude Plaintiffs Expert Witness From Testifying At Trial #83 filed by Plaintiff Joseph Gamaty. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christine Haw in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Ex Parte Application to Compel Completion of the Deposition of Plaintiff's Expert Witness or in the Alternative, to Exclude Plaintiff's Expert From Trial, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(Haw, Christine)
February 25, 2022 Filing 87 REPLY in support of MOTION IN LIMINE to Exclude MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4 OF DEFENDANT BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC FOR ORDER EXCLUDING PLAINTIFFS EXPERT, RANDALL BOUNDS #40 filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. (Villegas, Daniel)
February 25, 2022 Filing 86 REPLY in support of MIL No. 2 MOTION IN LIMINE to Exclude EXCLUDING EVIDENCE OR ARGUMENT REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S EXPECTATIONS WITH RESPECT TO VEHICLE AND WHETHER VEHICLE MET PLAINTIFF'S EXPECTATIONS #38 filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. (Villegas, Daniel)
February 25, 2022 Filing 85 REPLY in support of MOTION IN LIMINE to Exclude EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF, ARGUMENT OR REFERENCE TO,UNRELATED SERVICE INFORMATION BULLETINS AND RECALL CAMPAIGNS #37 filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. (Villegas, Daniel)
February 25, 2022 Filing 84 DECLARATION of Daniel R. Villegas in support of EX PARTE APPLICATION to Exclude To Compel Completion Of The Deposition Of Plaintiffs Expert Witness, Or In The Alternative, To Exclude Plaintiffs Expert Witness From Testifying At Trial #83 filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit C-1, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Villegas, Daniel)
February 25, 2022 Filing 83 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Exclude To Compel Completion Of The Deposition Of Plaintiffs Expert Witness, Or In The Alternative, To Exclude Plaintiffs Expert Witness From Testifying At Trial filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Proposed Order) (Villegas, Daniel)
February 18, 2022 Filing 82 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Aggregation of Repair Attempts #76 filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. (Oaks, Ashley)
February 18, 2022 Filing 81 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Adjudication as to Aggregate Unrelated Repair Attempts To Satisfy The "Reasonable Number Of Repair Attempts" Element #72 filed by Plaintiff Joseph Gamaty. (Pardo, Matthew)
February 18, 2022 Filing 80 STATEMENT of Genuine Disputes in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Adjudication as to Aggregate Unrelated Repair Attempts To Satisfy The "Reasonable Number Of Repair Attempts" Element #72 filed by Plaintiff Joseph Gamaty. (Pardo, Matthew)
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER ON STIPULATION TO AMEND COMPLAINT #75 by Judge R. Gary Klausner as follows: (1) The Stipulation is granted. (2) Plaintiffs Amended Complaint dismissing the Sixth Cause of Action for Fraudulent Inducement against Defendant BMW of North America, LLC, without prejudice shall be deemed filed; and, (3) Defendant BMW of North America, LLC's Answer filed in response to the original Complaint ( #9 ) shall serve as Defendant's response to the First Amended Complaint. (jp)
February 16, 2022 Filing 79 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants BMW of North America, LLC, Does amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with Jury Demand, filed by plaintiff Joseph Gamaty. (jp)
February 16, 2022 Filing 77 DECLARATION of Matthew Pardo in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Aggregation of Repair Attempts #76 filed by Plaintiff Joseph Gamaty. (Pardo, Matthew)
February 16, 2022 Filing 76 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Aggregation of Repair Attempts filed by Plaintiff Joseph Gamaty. Motion set for hearing on 3/8/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Aggregation of Repair Attempts, #2 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Aggregation of Repair Attempts) (Pardo, Matthew)
February 16, 2022 Filing 75 STIPULATION to Amend Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Joseph Gamaty. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - First Amended Complaint, #2 Proposed Order on Stipulation to Amend Complaint)(Kuemerle, Karin)
February 16, 2022 Filing 74 DECLARATION of Daniel R. Villages in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Adjudication as to Aggregate Unrelated Repair Attempts To Satisfy The "Reasonable Number Of Repair Attempts" Element #72 filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Villegas, Daniel)
February 16, 2022 Filing 73 STATEMENT of Statement Of Uncontroverted Facts And Conclusions Of Law NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Adjudication as to Aggregate Unrelated Repair Attempts To Satisfy The "Reasonable Number Of Repair Attempts" Element #72 filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. (Oaks, Ashley)
February 16, 2022 Filing 72 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Adjudication as to Aggregate Unrelated Repair Attempts To Satisfy The "Reasonable Number Of Repair Attempts" Element filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Oaks, Ashley)
February 15, 2022 Filing 71 MINUTES OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE before Judge R. Gary Klausner: The Court gives it tentative rulings on Motions in Limine. The parties shall submit separate briefing to the Court, by Wednesday, February 16, 2022, regarding: 1) The applicability of law with respect to Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 5; and 2) Fraud issue as discussed on the record. Any responses are due by Friday, February 18, 2022. Court Reporter: Sherri Kleeger. (See attached Civil Minutes for further specifics). (jp)
February 11, 2022 Filing 70 Witness List Joseph Gamaty.. (Aref, Kareem)
February 11, 2022 Filing 69 JOINT Exhibit List Joseph Gamaty.. (Aref, Kareem)
February 11, 2022 Filing 68 Opposition re: MOTION IN LIMINE to Exclude EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF, ARGUMENT OR REFERENCE TO,UNRELATED SERVICE INFORMATION BULLETINS AND RECALL CAMPAIGNS #37 filed by Plaintiff Joseph Gamaty. (Aref, Kareem)
February 11, 2022 Filing 67 Opposition re: MOTION IN LIMINE to Exclude EXCLUDING EVIDENCE OR ARGUMENT REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S EXPECTATIONS WITH RESPECT TO VEHICLE AND WHETHER VEHICLE MET PLAINTIFF'S EXPECTATIONS #38 filed by Plaintiff Joseph Gamaty. (Aref, Kareem)
February 11, 2022 Filing 66 DECLARATION of Matthew Pardo In Opposition to MOTION IN LIMINE to Exclude MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4 OF DEFENDANT BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC FOR ORDER EXCLUDING PLAINTIFFS EXPERT, RANDALL BOUNDS #40 filed by Plaintiff Joseph Gamaty. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Aref, Kareem)
February 11, 2022 Filing 65 Opposition re: MOTION IN LIMINE to Exclude MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4 OF DEFENDANT BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC FOR ORDER EXCLUDING PLAINTIFFS EXPERT, RANDALL BOUNDS #40 Opposition filed by Plaintiff Joseph Gamaty. (Aref, Kareem)
February 11, 2022 Filing 64 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION IN LIMINE # (8) to Exclude Settlement Discussions #36 filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Oaks, Ashley)
February 11, 2022 Filing 63 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION IN LIMINE # (7) to Exclude Evidence and Argument that Timely Revocation of Acceptance was Required #35 filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. (Oaks, Ashley)
February 11, 2022 Filing 62 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION IN LIMINE # (6) to Exclude Defendant's Untimely Disclosed Expert and Expert Report #34 filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Oaks, Ashley)
February 11, 2022 Filing 61 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION IN LIMINE # (4) to Exclude Evidence of or References to Attorney Marketing or Advertising #32 filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. (Oaks, Ashley)
February 11, 2022 Filing 60 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION IN LIMINE # (3) to Exclude Evidence of or References to Plaintiff's Application for Financing #31 filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. (Oaks, Ashley)
February 11, 2022 Filing 59 MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Opposition filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. Re: MOTION IN LIMINE 1 to Exclude Evidence or Argument Referring or Relating to Defendant's Arbitration Program #29 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Oaks, Ashley)
February 10, 2022 Filing 58 NOTICE OF LODGING Proposed Pretrial Conference Order Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. Amended [Proposed] Final Pre-Trial Conference Order (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Oaks, Ashley)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order Re: Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 5 and Defendant's Motion in Limine No. 3 by Judge R. Gary Klausner: These issues should be resolved prior to trial and are inappropriate subjects for motions in limine. Accordingly, the Court: DENIES Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 5 #33 ; DENIES Defendant's Motion in Limine No. 3 #33 . ORDERS each party to file a motion for Summary adjudication on the issue of whether a plaintiff may aggregate unrelated repair attempts to his vehicle in order to satisfy the "reasonable number of repair attempts" element of a claim under the Act. Each party must file their opening brief no later than 2/16/2022. Any opposition briefs shall be filed by 2/21/2022. Reply briefs are not permitted. (jp)
February 9, 2022 Filing 56 NOTICE OF LODGING Proposed Pretrial Conference Order Plaintiff Joseph Gamaty. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pardo, Matthew)
February 9, 2022 Filing 55 STATEMENT of Expert Qualifications and Expected Testimony (Pardo, Matthew)
February 9, 2022 Filing 54 STATEMENT Of Qualifications And Opinions Of Defendants Expert Anthony Randazzo filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Oaks, Ashley)
February 4, 2022 Filing 53 AMENDED Exhibit List filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC.. (Villegas, Daniel)
February 2, 2022 Filing 52 MINUTES OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE held before Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon: Settlement conference held via Zoom. The parties do not agree to the terms of a settlement. Court Reporter: Not Recorded. (es)
January 31, 2022 Filing 51 TRIAL BRIEF filed by Plaintiff Joseph Gamaty.. (Pardo, Matthew)
January 31, 2022 Filing 50 Witness List filed by Plaintiff Joseph Gamaty.. (Pardo, Matthew)
January 31, 2022 Filing 49 Proposed Exhibit List filed by Plaintiff Joseph Gamaty.. (Pardo, Matthew)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon: Defendant shall promptly respond to plaintiff's settlement demand, and the parties shall continue their communications to resolve the case via settlement in advance of the settlement conference. Each side shall submit an update to its settlement conference statement by 5:00pm on February 1, 2022, reflecting the status of their efforts to settle the case. Failure to comply with this order or the settlement conference order may result in sanctions against the party and/or its counsel. (See document for details). (ib)
January 29, 2022 Filing 47 NOTICE of Change of address by Tionna Dolin attorney for Plaintiff Joseph Gamaty. Changing attorneys address to 1888 Century Park East, 19th Floor, Los Angeles,CA 90067. Filed by Plaintiff Joseph Gamaty. (Dolin, Tionna)
January 24, 2022 Filing 46 MEMORANDUM of CONTENTIONS of FACT and LAW filed by Defedant BMW of North America, LLC BMW of North America, LLC. (Oaks, Ashley)
January 24, 2022 Filing 45 Proposed Exhibit List Defendant BMW of North America, LLC's Exhibit LIst filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC.. (Oaks, Ashley)
January 24, 2022 Filing 44 Witness List filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC.. (Oaks, Ashley)
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER RE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon: A Settlement Conference is set for 2/2/22 at 10:00AM before Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon, to be held on Zoom. The Clerk will contact the parties prior to the settlement conference with connection instructions. Confidential Settlement Conference Statements due by 5pm on 1/28/22. (See document for further details.) (ib)
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 (IN CHAMBERS) NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES AND ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner. The motions in limine filed by the parties on January 21, 2022 were filed incorrectly. Motions in limine are to be noticed for hearing on the first day of trial - see Order re Jury Trial. Therefore, the motions in limine #29 through #40 , are HEREBY CONTINUED TO 3/8/2022 at 9:00 am. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 (IN CHAMBERS) NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES AND ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner. The parties shall participate in a mandatory settlement conference with Magistrate Judge MacKinnon on February 2, 2022. An order from Judge MacKinnon regarding the settlement conference will be issued shortly. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 22, 2022 Filing 40 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE to Exclude MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4 OF DEFENDANT BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC FOR ORDER EXCLUDING PLAINTIFFS EXPERT, RANDALL BOUNDS filed by defendant BMW of North America, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 2/14/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Expert Report of Randall Bounds, #2 Exhibit Randall Bounds' CV)(Oaks, Ashley)
January 22, 2022 Filing 39 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE to Exclude EXCLUDING EVIDENCE OF ALLEGED DEFECTS THAT WERE NEVER PRESENTED FOR REPAIR OR WERE ONLY SUBJECT TO ONE REPAIR ATTEMPT filed by defendant BMW of North America, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 2/14/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner.(Oaks, Ashley)
January 22, 2022 Filing 38 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE to Exclude EXCLUDING EVIDENCE OR ARGUMENT REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S EXPECTATIONS WITH RESPECT TO VEHICLE AND WHETHER VEHICLE MET PLAINTIFF'S EXPECTATIONS filed by defendant BMW of North America, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 2/14/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner.(Oaks, Ashley)
January 21, 2022 Filing 37 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE to Exclude EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF, ARGUMENT OR REFERENCE TO,UNRELATED SERVICE INFORMATION BULLETINS AND RECALL CAMPAIGNS filed by defendant BMW of North America, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 2/14/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner.(Oaks, Ashley)
January 21, 2022 Filing 36 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE # (8) to Exclude Settlement Discussions filed by Plaintiff Joseph Gamaty. Motion set for hearing on 2/14/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No 8 to Exclude Settlement Discussions)(Pardo, Matthew)
January 21, 2022 Filing 35 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE # (7) to Exclude Evidence and Argument that Timely Revocation of Acceptance was Required filed by Plaintiff Joseph Gamaty. Motion set for hearing on 2/14/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 7: to Exclude Reference and Argument that Timely Revocation of Acceptance was Required)(Pardo, Matthew)
January 21, 2022 Filing 34 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE # (6) to Exclude Defendant's Untimely Disclosed Expert and Expert Report filed by Plaintiff Joseph Gamaty. Motion set for hearing on 2/14/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Re: Motion in Limine #6 to Exclude Defendant's Untimely Disclosed Expert and Expert Report)(Pardo, Matthew)
January 21, 2022 Filing 33 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE # (5) to Exclude Evidence or Argument that Components Repaired After a Single Attempt are not Counted Under the Song-Beverly Act filed by Plaintiff Joseph Gamaty. Motion set for hearing on 2/14/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Re: Motion in Limine #5 to Exclude Evidence or Argument that Components Repaired After a Single Attempt are not Counted Under the Song-Beverly Act)(Pardo, Matthew)
January 21, 2022 Filing 32 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE # (4) to Exclude Evidence of or References to Attorney Marketing or Advertising filed by Plaintiff Joseph Gamaty. Motion set for hearing on 2/14/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Re: Motion in Limine #4 to Exclude Evidence or Argument Referring to Attorney Marketing or Advertising)(Pardo, Matthew)
January 21, 2022 Filing 31 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE # (3) to Exclude Evidence of or References to Plaintiff's Application for Financing filed by Plaintiff Joseph Gamaty. Motion set for hearing on 2/14/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Re Motion in Limine #3 to Exclude Evidence or Argument Referring to Plaintiff's Application for Financing)(Pardo, Matthew)
January 21, 2022 Filing 30 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE # (2) to Exclude Evidence or Argument Referring to Attorney's Fees filed by Plaintiff Joseph Gamaty. Motion set for hearing on 2/14/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Re: Motion in Limine #2 to Exclude Evidence or Argument Referring to Attorney's Fees)(Pardo, Matthew)
January 21, 2022 Filing 29 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION IN LIMINE 1 to Exclude Evidence or Argument Referring or Relating to Defendant's Arbitration Program filed by Plaintiff Joseph Gamaty. Motion set for hearing on 2/14/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Re Motion in Limine #1 to Exclude Evidence or Argument Referring to Defendant's Arbitration Program, #2 Declaration of Matthew Pardo in Support of Plaintiff's Motions in Limine)(Pardo, Matthew)
January 21, 2022 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Kareem Shereef Aref on behalf of Plaintiff Joseph Gamaty (Attorney Kareem Shereef Aref added to party Joseph Gamaty(pty:pla))(Aref, Kareem)
January 14, 2022 Filing 27 STATUS REPORT Joint Report Following ADR Deadline Regarding The Progress Of Settlement Discussions filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. (Oaks, Ashley)
December 18, 2021 Filing 26 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Tionna Dolin counsel for Plaintiff Joseph Gamaty. Gregory Sogoyan is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Joseph Gamaty. (Dolin, Tionna)
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER ON JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE AND RELATED PRE-TRIAL DEADLINES #24 by Judge R. Gary Klausner. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: Discovery Cut-Off is continued to JANUARY 3, 2022; Motion Cut-Off is continued to JANUARY 3, 2022. (lom)
December 13, 2021 Filing 24 Joint STIPULATION to Continue Trial, Final Pre-Trial Conference And Related Pre-Trial Deadlines from March 8, 2022 to June 21, 2022 filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Oaks, Ashley)
December 10, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Karin Kuemerle on behalf of Plaintiff Joseph Gamaty (Attorney Karin Kuemerle added to party Joseph Gamaty(pty:pla))(Kuemerle, Karin)
December 8, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Matthew Jeffrey Pardo on behalf of Plaintiff Joseph Gamaty (Attorney Matthew Jeffrey Pardo added to party Joseph Gamaty(pty:pla))(Pardo, Matthew)
December 8, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Christine J Haw on behalf of Plaintiff Joseph Gamaty (Attorney Christine J Haw added to party Joseph Gamaty(pty:pla))(Haw, Christine)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 (IN CHAMBERS) NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES AND ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Due to the President's Day holiday, the Pretrial Conference is HEREBY ADVANCED TO 2/14/2022 at 9:00 am. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 11, 2021 Filing 19 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ashley Elise Oaks counsel for Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. Adding Ashley E. Oaks as counsel of record for BMW of North America, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. (Attorney Ashley Elise Oaks added to party BMW of North America, LLC(pty:dft))(Oaks, Ashley)
June 23, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance #17 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance of Withdrawal of Counsel G123.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
June 22, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Gregory Sogoyan on behalf of Plaintiff Joseph Gamaty (Attorney Gregory Sogoyan added to party Joseph Gamaty(pty:pla))(Sogoyan, Gregory)
June 21, 2021 Filing 16 AMENDED MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge R. Gary Klausner. Amended Pleadings due by 7/20/2021. Discovery cut-off 12/14/2021. Motions due by 12/21/2021. Pretrial Conference set for 2/21/2022 09:00 AM. Jury Trial set for 3/8/2022 09:00 AM. (amended to correct trial date) Court Reporter: Marea Woolrich. (jre)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than January 7, 2021. (jre)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER FOR JURY TRIAL by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Pretrial Conference set for 2/21/2022, 9:00 AM. Jury Trial set for 3/8/2022, 9:00 AM. (jre)
June 21, 2021 Filing 13 MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge R. Gary Klausner. Amended Pleadings due by 7/20/2021. Discovery cut-off 12/14/2021. Motions due by 12/21/2021. Pretrial Conference set for 2/21/2022, 9:00 AM. Jury Trial set for 3/8/2021, 9:00 AM. Court Reporter: Marea Woolrich. (jre)
June 11, 2021 Filing 12 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5-7 days, filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC.. (Greco, Anthony)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/14/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 6/21/2021 at 9:00 am. (sw)
March 10, 2021 Filing 10 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC, identifying BMW (US) Holding Corp.. (Lehrman, Kate)
March 10, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC.(Attorney Kate S Lehrman added to party BMW of North America, LLC(pty:dft))(Lehrman, Kate)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (sw)
February 8, 2021 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. (ghap)
February 8, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
February 8, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (ghap)
February 5, 2021 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Joseph Gamaty. (Dolin, Tionna)
February 5, 2021 Filing 3 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Joseph Gamaty, identifying BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC; and DOES 1 through 10, inclusive. (Dolin, Tionna)
February 5, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Joseph Gamaty. (Dolin, Tionna)
February 5, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-30419105 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Joseph Gamaty. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Complaint) (Attorney Tionna Dolin added to party Joseph Gamaty(pty:pla))(Dolin, Tionna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joseph Gamaty v. BMW of North America, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Gamaty
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Represented By: Gregory Sogoyan
Represented By: Christine J Haw
Represented By: Kareem Shereef Aref
Represented By: Karin Kuemerle
Represented By: Matthew Jeffrey Pardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BMW of North America, LLC
Represented By: Kate S Lehrman
Represented By: Anthony Paul Greco
Represented By: Daniel R Villegas
Represented By: Ashley Elise Oaks
Represented By: Andrew K Stefatos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?