California Machinery Movers,Inc. v. FedEx Freight, Inc.
Plaintiff: California Machinery Movers,Inc. and California Machinery Movers, Inc.
Defendant: FedEx Freight, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv01189
Filed: February 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Chooljian
Referring Judge: Mark C Scarsi
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. Scheduling Conference set for 5/17/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (smo)
March 18, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant FedEx Freight, Inc..(Booth, Hillary)
February 22, 2021 Filing 9 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ian P Culver counsel for Defendant FedEx Freight, Inc.. Ian P. Culver is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant FedEx Corporation. (Culver, Ian)
February 22, 2021 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ian P Culver counsel for Defendant FedEx Freight, Inc.. Adding Hillary Arrow Booth as counsel of record for FedEx Corporation for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant FedEx Corporation. (Culver, Ian)
February 12, 2021 Filing 7 First STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to FedEx Freight, Inc. answer now due 3/18/2021, filed by Defendant FedEx Freight, Inc..(Culver, Ian)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE MARK C. SCARSI upon filing of the complaint by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (smo)
February 10, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
February 10, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Mark C. Scarsi and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (lh)
February 9, 2021 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants FedEx Freight, Inc., filed by Plaintiff California Machinery Movers, Inc. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 1/21/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
February 9, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant FedEx Freight, Inc., (Culver, Ian)
February 9, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Respondent FedEx Freight, Inc.. (Culver, Ian)
February 9, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles, case number 21STCV01119 Receipt No: ACACDC-30472791 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant FedEx Freight, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Attorney Ian P Culver added to party FedEx Freight, Inc.(pty:res))(Culver, Ian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: California Machinery Movers,Inc. v. FedEx Freight, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FedEx Freight, Inc.
Represented By: Ian P Culver
Represented By: Hillary Arrow Booth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: California Machinery Movers,Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: California Machinery Movers, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey G Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?