L.M.B. v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: L M B
Defendant: Richard C Shin, United Imaging of Gardena, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, United Medical Imaging Healthcare, Inc., Does 1 through 20, inclusive and Richard C. Shin
Case Number: 2:2021cv01683
Filed: February 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Ronald SW Lew
Referring Judge: Alexander F MacKinnon
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2674
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2021 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND and NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by Defendant United Medical Imaging Healthcare, Inc..(Attorney Nikko Salvatore Stevens added to party United Medical Imaging Healthcare, Inc.(pty:dft))(Stevens, Nikko)
March 29, 2021 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff L M B, upon Defendant United Imaging of Gardena served on 3/22/2021, answer due 4/12/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Anthony Perez-Medical Administrator in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Lew, Jin)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER RE PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that RAEGAN BROWN be appointed as guardian ad litem for L.M.B., a plaintiff in the above-entitled action, and she is authorized to institute and prosecute the action named in the petition. #6 (es)
February 25, 2021 Filing 12 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Richard C. Shin. (ghap)
February 25, 2021 Filing 11 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant United Imaging of Gardena. (ghap)
February 25, 2021 Filing 10 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant United States of America. (ghap)
February 25, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
February 25, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Ronald S. W. Lew and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (ghap)
February 23, 2021 Filing 7 PETITION for Order for Re Petition for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem filed by plaintiff L M B. (Lew, Jin)
February 23, 2021 Filing 6 PETITION for Appointment of Raegan Brown as Guardian ad Litem for L.M.B. filed by plaintiff L M B. (Lew, Jin)
February 23, 2021 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff L M B. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Lew, Jin)
February 23, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jin N Lew on behalf of Plaintiff L M B (Lew, Jin)
February 23, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff L M B. (Lew, Jin)
February 23, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff L M B, (Lew, Jin)
February 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-30671753 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff L M B. (Attorney Jin N Lew added to party L M B(pty:pla))(Lew, Jin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: L.M.B. v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard C Shin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Imaging of Gardena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Medical Imaging Healthcare, Inc.
Represented By: Richard J Ryan
Represented By: Aaron J Weissman
Represented By: Nikko Salvatore Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 20, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard C. Shin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L M B
Represented By: Jin N Lew
Represented By: Philip Michels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?