Ed Hull v. Jack In The Box Properties, LLC, et al
Plaintiff: Ed Hull
Defendant: JACK IN THE BOX PROPERTIES, LLC, SUNRISE FOODS, LLC and DOES 1-10
Case Number: 2:2021cv01868
Filed: February 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andre Birotte
Referring Judge: Margo A Rocconi
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Settlement signed jointly and filed by Plaintiff Ed Hull. (Steven, Laura)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
April 19, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson to Judge Andre Birotte Jr for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2:21-cv-01868 AB(MARx). (rn)
April 15, 2021 Filing 15 First STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Sunrise Foods, LLC answer now due 4/23/2021, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Sunrise Foods, LLC.(Martirosyan, Edgar)
April 15, 2021 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Sunrise Foods, LLC, (Attorney Edgar Martirosyan added to party Sunrise Foods, LLC(pty:dft))(Martirosyan, Edgar)
March 28, 2021 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Ed Hull, upon Defendant Sunrise Foods, LLC served on 3/28/2021, answer due 4/19/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Leslie Vargas - Authorized to Accept Service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Steven, Laura)
March 24, 2021 Filing 12 First STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Jack In The Box Properties, LLC answer now due 4/23/2021, Jack In The Box Properties, LLC.(Attorney Edgar Martirosyan added to party Jack In The Box Properties, LLC(pty:dft))(Martirosyan, Edgar)
March 24, 2021 Filing 11 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Jack In The Box Properties, LLC (Martirosyan, Edgar)
March 16, 2021 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Ed Hull, upon Defendant Jack In The Box Properties, LLC served on 3/4/2021, answer due 3/25/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CSC - Lawyers Incorporating Service c/o Susie Vang - Registered Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Steven, Laura)
March 15, 2021 Filing 9 REMINDER NOTICE re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. Each party must file form CV-11C within the consent deadlines pursuant to L.R. 73-2. Additionally, the parties are directed to L.R. 73-2.2 Proof of Service. In any case in which only a magistrate judge is initially assigned, plaintiff must file a proof of service within 10 days of service of the summons and complaint as to each defendant. (hr)
March 1, 2021 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Sunrise Foods, LLC. (esa)
March 1, 2021 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Jack In The Box Properties, LLC. (esa)
March 1, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (Attachments: #1 CV 11C) (esa)
February 26, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Ed Hull, (Shahriari, Peter)
February 26, 2021 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Ed Hull. (Shahriari, Peter)
February 26, 2021 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Ed Hull. (Shahriari, Peter)
February 26, 2021 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Ed Hull. (Shahriari, Peter)
February 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-30756057 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff Ed Hull. (Attorney Peter Shahriari added to party Ed Hull(pty:pla))(Shahriari, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ed Hull v. Jack In The Box Properties, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ed Hull
Represented By: Peter Shahriari
Represented By: Laura Anne Steven
Represented By: Ani A Avetisyan
Represented By: Anoush Hakimi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JACK IN THE BOX PROPERTIES, LLC
Represented By: Azniv Ksachikyan
Represented By: Edgar Martirosyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUNRISE FOODS, LLC
Represented By: Azniv Ksachikyan
Represented By: Edgar Martirosyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?