City of Downey v. 3M Company
Plaintiff: City of Downey
Defendant: 3M Company, AGC, Inc., Ratheon Technologies Corporation, Dynax Corporation, Angus International Safety Group, Ltd., Tyco Fire Products, LP, Deepwater Chemicals, Inc., Chubb Fire, Ltd., Clariant Corporation, Kidde-Fenwall, Inc., Chemguard, Inc., DuPont De Nemours, Inc., Buckeye Fire Equipment Company, Johnson Controls Fire Protection, LP, BASF Corporation, E.I. Du Pont De Nemours & Company, Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Co., United Technologies Corporation, Central Sprinkler LLC, AGC Chemicals Americas, Inc., Asahi Glass Co., Ltd., National Foam Inc., Nation Ford Chemical Company, John Doe Defendants, The Chemours Company, Archroma Management, LLC, UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation, Inc., Archroma U.S., Inc., Carrier Global Corporation, Corteva, Inc., Arkema Inc., ChemDesign Products, Inc., Chemicals Inc., Kidde PLC, Inc., Johnson Controls International PLC, Fire Products GP Holding, LLC and The Chemours Company FC, LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv01898
Filed: March 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Percy Anderson
Referring Judge: Patricia Donahue
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2021 Filing 15 TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - RECEIVED Notice of Receipt of Electronic Case Transfer from District of South Carolina, 2:21-CV-00848 filed 3/24/2021. (iv)
March 23, 2021 Filing 14 Conditional Transfer Order - 47 from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 2873, transferring case to USDC, District of South Carolina and assigned to Honorable Richard M. Gergel. Case transferred electronically on 3/24/2021. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (mrgo)
March 11, 2021 Filing 13 SUPPLEMENT to Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant 3M Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Supplement, #2 Exhibit B to Supplement, #3 Exhibit C to Supplement, #4 Certificate of Service)(Queen, Daniel)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL [FRCP 16, 26(f)] ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. (Scheduling Conference set for 4/19/2021 at 10:30 AM before Judge Percy Anderson.) (mrgo)
March 8, 2021 Filing 11 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to 3M Company answer now due 4/7/2021, re Complaint - (Discovery),,,, filed by Defendant 3M Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Queen, Daniel)
March 4, 2021 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant 3M Company, re Order #9 - (Standing Order) served on 03/04/21. (Queen, Daniel)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (See document for details) (mrgo)
March 3, 2021 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant 3M Company, re Notice of Clerical Error (G-11), #7 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #6 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #5 served on 03/02/21. (Queen, Daniel)
March 2, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error the Case has been reassigned from Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo and Judge Otis D. Wright, II to Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue for all further proceedings. The case will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2:21-cv-01898 PA (PDx). (esa)
March 2, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
March 2, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (esa)
March 1, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants 3M Company, AGC Chemicals Americas, Inc., AGC, Inc., Angus International Safety Group, Ltd., Archroma Management, LLC, Archroma U.S., Inc., Arkema Inc., BASF Corporation, Buckeye Fire Equipment Company, Carrier Global Corporation, Central Sprinkler LLC, ChemDesign Products, Inc., Chemguard, Inc., Chemicals Inc., Chubb Fire, Ltd., Clariant Corporation, Corteva, Inc., Deepwater Chemicals, Inc., DuPont De Nemours, Inc., Dynax Corporation, E.I. Du Pont De Nemours & Company, Fire Products GP Holding, LLC, John Doe Defendants, Johnson Controls Fire Protection, LP, Johnson Controls International PLC, Kidde PLC, Inc., Kidde-Fenwall, Inc., Nation Ford Chemical Company, National Foam Inc., Ratheon Technologies Corporation, The Chemours Company, The Chemours Company FC, LLC, Tyco Fire Products, LP, UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation, Inc., Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiff City of Downey. (filed in state court 1/27/21, submitted as document 1, attachment 1) (esa)
March 1, 2021 COPY OF NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS executed by Plaintiff City of Downey, upon Defendant 3M Company served on 1/29/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CSC, Agent for Service of Process by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. (non-conformed, submitted as document 1, attachment 1, p. 2) (esa)
March 1, 2021 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant 3M Company, re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 served on 03/01/2021. (Queen, Daniel)
March 1, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant 3M Company, (Queen, Daniel)
March 1, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant 3M Company. (Queen, Daniel)
March 1, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 21STCV03250 Receipt No: ACACDC-30785979 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant 3M Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal) (Attorney Daniel David Queen added to party 3M Company(pty:dft))(Queen, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Downey v. 3M Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company
Represented By: Daniel David Queen
Represented By: John Nadolenco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AGC, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ratheon Technologies Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dynax Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angus International Safety Group, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyco Fire Products, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deepwater Chemicals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chubb Fire, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clariant Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kidde-Fenwall, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemguard, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DuPont De Nemours, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson Controls Fire Protection, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BASF Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E.I. Du Pont De Nemours & Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Co.
Represented By: Daniel David Queen
Represented By: John Nadolenco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Technologies Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Sprinkler LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AGC Chemicals Americas, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asahi Glass Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Foam Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nation Ford Chemical Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Defendants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Chemours Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Archroma Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Archroma U.S., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrier Global Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corteva, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkema Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ChemDesign Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemicals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kidde PLC, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson Controls International PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fire Products GP Holding, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Chemours Company FC, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Downey
Represented By: John P Fiske
Represented By: Celeste A Evangelisti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?