Vicki Ingraham et al v. Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd.
Plaintiff: Vicki Ingraham and Gregory Rioux
Defendant: Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd.
Case Number: 2:2021cv01916
Filed: March 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Pedro V Castillo
Referring Judge: Mark C Scarsi
2 Judge: Michael R Wilner
3 Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: granting #26 Non-Resident Attorney Christopher M. Odell APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd., designating Angel Tang Nakamura as local counsel. (et)
April 16, 2021 Filing 26 First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Christopher M. Odell to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31129950) filed by Defendant Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Nakamura, Angel)
April 16, 2021 Filing 25 TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - IN CHAMBERS: by Judge George H. Wu: In light of the 4/15/2021 Joint Status Report #21 filed by the parties, the scheduling conference now set for April 19, 2021 is continued to May 20, 2021 at 8:30 a.m. The parties will file a joint status report by May 17. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 16, 2021 Filing 24 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Angel Tang Nakamura counsel for Defendant Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd.. Adding Angel Tang Nakamura as counsel of record for Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd.. (Attorney Angel Tang Nakamura added to party Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd.(pty:dft))(Nakamura, Angel)
April 16, 2021 Filing 23 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jonathan W. Hughes counsel for Defendant Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd.. Adding Jonathan W. Hughes as counsel of record for Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd.. (Attorney Jonathan W. Hughes added to party Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd.(pty:dft))(Hughes, Jonathan)
April 15, 2021 Filing 22 TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - IN CHAMBERS: by Judge George H. Wu: Counsel are to appear telephonically for Monday's 04/19/2021 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE at 8:30 a.m. by contacting the court clerk at javier_gonzalez@cacd.uscourts.gov for dial-in information. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 15, 2021 Filing 21 STATUS REPORT , Joint, Pursuant to the Court's April 2, 2021 Test-Only Entry (ECF No. 20) filed by Defendant Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd.. (Hughes, Jonathan)
April 2, 2021 Filing 20 TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - IN CHAMBERS: by Judge George H. Wu; The Court sets a SCHEDULING CONFERENCE for April 19, 2021 at 8:30 a.m. The parties are to file a joint scheduling report by noon on April 15, 2021.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 11, 2021 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Vicki Ingraham, Gregory Rioux. upon Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 3/9/2021, answer due 5/10/2021. Waiver of Service signed by Edgar R. Nield. (Coone, Aksana)
March 10, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by defendant Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd., identifying Carnival Corporation. (Nield, Edgar)
March 10, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Edgar R Nield on behalf of Defendant Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd. (Attorney Edgar R Nield added to party Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd.(pty:dft))(Nield, Edgar)
March 10, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jeffrey B Maltzman on behalf of Defendant Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd. (Attorney Jeffrey B Maltzman added to party Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd.(pty:dft))(Maltzman, Jeffrey)
March 10, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Rafaela Patricia Castells on behalf of Defendant Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd. (Attorney Rafaela Patricia Castells added to party Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd.(pty:dft))(Castells, Rafaela)
March 10, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Gabrielle DeSantis Nield on behalf of Defendant Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd. (Attorney Gabrielle DeSantis Nield added to party Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd.(pty:dft))(DeSantis Nield, Gabrielle)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS BEFORE JUDGE GEORGE H. WU by Judge George H. Wu. (See document for details) (mrgo)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: granting #10 Non-Resident Attorney Glenn J. Holzberg APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of plaintiffs Vicki Ingraham and Gregory Rioux, designating Aksana M. Coone as local counsel. (mrgo)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 21-01-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:20-cv-06218 GW(MRWx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo and Judge Mark C. Scarsi to Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:21-cv-01916 GW(MRWx). Signed by Judge George H. Wu (rn)
March 3, 2021 Filing 10 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Glenn J. Holzberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Vicki Ingraham, Gregory Rioux (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-30835879) filed by Plaintiffs Vicki Ingraham, Gregory Rioux. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Coone, Aksana)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE MARK C. SCARSI upon filing of the complaint by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (smo)
March 2, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Glenn J. Holzberg on behalf of Plaintiffs. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (et)
March 2, 2021 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd. (et)
March 2, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
March 2, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Mark C. Scarsi and Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (et)
March 1, 2021 Filing 4 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Vicki Ingraham, Gregory Rioux, (Coone, Aksana)
March 1, 2021 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Vicki Ingraham, Gregory Rioux. (Coone, Aksana)
March 1, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Vicki Ingraham, Gregory Rioux. (Coone, Aksana)
March 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-30787020 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiffs Vicki Ingraham, Gregory Rioux. (Attorney Aksana Moshaiv Coone added to party Vicki Ingraham(pty:pla), Attorney Aksana Moshaiv Coone added to party Gregory Rioux(pty:pla))(Coone, Aksana)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vicki Ingraham et al v. Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vicki Ingraham
Represented By: Aksana Moshaiv Coone
Represented By: Glenn J. Holzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Rioux
Represented By: Aksana Moshaiv Coone
Represented By: Glenn J. Holzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd.
Represented By: Jeffrey B Maltzman
Represented By: Angel Tang Nakamura
Represented By: Rafaela Patricia Castells
Represented By: Gabrielle DeSantis Nield
Represented By: Jonathan W. Hughes
Represented By: Christopher M. Odell
Represented By: Edgar R. Nield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?