Brent Lofton v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Brent Lofton
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2021cv01922
Filed: March 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andre Birotte
Referring Judge: Alexander F MacKinnon
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2021 Filing 10 Mail Returned addressed to Brent Lofton re Summons Issued #7 . (gk)
March 23, 2021 Filing 9 Mail Returned addressed to Brent Lofton re Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) #5 . (gk)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
March 3, 2021 Filing 7 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery), #1 as to Defendant United States of America. (es)
March 3, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
March 3, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (jtil)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon: Granting #3 REQUEST for Leave to Proceed without Prepayment of Filing Fee. Re REQUEST to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support #3 . (es)
March 1, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Brent Lofton. (jtil)
March 1, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (jtil)
March 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Brent Lofton against Defendant United States of America. Case assigned to Judge Andre Birotte Jr for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (Attachments: #1 CV71, #2 Summons Request) (jtil)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brent Lofton v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brent Lofton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?