Ann M. Cannarozzo et al v. Princess Cruise Lines, LTD et al
Plaintiff: Michael R. Cannarozzo and Ann M. Cannarozzo
Defendant: Does 1-5 and Princess Cruise Lines, LTD doing business as Princess Cruises
Case Number: 2:2021cv01950
Filed: March 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Fernando L Aenlle-Rocha
Referring Judge: Charles F Eick
2 Judge: Steve Kim
3 Judge: R Gary Klausner
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2021 Filing 20 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , filed by Plaintiffs Ann M. Cannarozzo, Michael R. Cannarozzo(Llinas Negret, Carlos)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER(IN CHAMBERS) Order Re: Stipulation to Amend Complaint [DE 18] by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Pursuant to the stipulation, Plaintiffs may file a first amended complaint. Plaintiffs shall file the amended complaint attached as Exhibit 1 to the Joint Stipulation, (ECF No. #18 -1), within 1 day of this Order's issuance. See minute order for details. (lom)
April 16, 2021 Filing 18 Joint STIPULATION to AMEND Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Ann M. Cannarozzo, Michael R. Cannarozzo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Declaration, #3 Proposed Order)(Llinas Negret, Carlos)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER TO STRIKE ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENT(S) by Judge R. Gary Klausner: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: First Amended Complaint #16 , for the following reasons: Requires leave of Court or opposing party's consent to amend. Federal Rules of Civil Procedure - Rule 15. (jp)
April 14, 2021 Filing 16 [DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER ORDER DATED ON 4/15/2021, SEE DOCKET ENTRY NO. #17 ] - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against DEFENDANTS All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , filed by Plaintiff Ann M. Cannarozzo, Michael R. Cannarozzo(Llinas Negret, Carlos). Modified on 4/15/2021 (jp).
March 8, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by defendant Princess Cruise Lines, LTD, identifying Carnival Corporation. (Nield, Edgar)
March 8, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Edgar R Nield on behalf of Defendant Princess Cruise Lines, LTD (Attorney Edgar R Nield added to party Princess Cruise Lines, LTD(pty:dft))(Nield, Edgar)
March 8, 2021 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Ann M. Cannarozzo, Michael R. Cannarozzo. upon Princess Cruise Lines, LTD waiver sent by Plaintiff on 3/6/2021, answer due 5/5/2021. Waiver of Service signed by Edgar R. Nield, Esq.. (Llinas Negret, Carlos)
March 8, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jeffrey B Maltzman on behalf of Defendant Princess Cruise Lines, LTD (Attorney Jeffrey B Maltzman added to party Princess Cruise Lines, LTD(pty:dft))(Maltzman, Jeffrey)
March 8, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Rafaela Patricia Castells on behalf of Defendant Princess Cruise Lines, LTD (Attorney Rafaela Patricia Castells added to party Princess Cruise Lines, LTD(pty:dft))(Castells, Rafaela)
March 8, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Gabrielle DeSantis Nield on behalf of Defendant Princess Cruise Lines, LTD (Attorney Gabrielle DeSantis Nield added to party Princess Cruise Lines, LTD(pty:dft))(DeSantis Nield, Gabrielle)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (sw)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 21-01-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:20-cv-02267 RGK(SKx). Case transferred from Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick to Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:21-cv-01950 RGK(SKx). Signed by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (aco)
March 3, 2021 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Princess Cruise Lines, LTD. (lh)
March 3, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
March 3, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando L Aenlle-Rocha and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (lh)
March 2, 2021 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff ANN M. CANNAROZZO, MICHAEL R. CANNAROZZO. (Llinas Negret, Carlos)
March 2, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff ANN M. CANNAROZZO, MICHAEL R. CANNAROZZO, (Llinas Negret, Carlos)
March 2, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs ANN M. CANNAROZZO, MICHAEL R. CANNAROZZO. (Llinas Negret, Carlos)
March 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-30814729 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff ANN M. CANNAROZZO, MICHAEL R. CANNAROZZO. (Attorney Carlos Felipe Llinas Negret added to party ANN M. CANNAROZZO(pty:pla), Attorney Carlos Felipe Llinas Negret added to party MICHAEL R. CANNAROZZO(pty:pla))(Llinas Negret, Carlos)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ann M. Cannarozzo et al v. Princess Cruise Lines, LTD et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Princess Cruise Lines, LTD doing business as Princess Cruises
Represented By: Jeffrey B Maltzman
Represented By: Rafaela Patricia Castells
Represented By: Gabrielle DeSantis Nield
Represented By: Edgar R. Nield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael R. Cannarozzo
Represented By: Carlos Felipe Llinas Negret
Represented By: Gretchen M. Nelson
Represented By: Gretchen M Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ann M. Cannarozzo
Represented By: Carlos Felipe Llinas Negret
Represented By: Gretchen M. Nelson
Represented By: Gretchen M Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?