Judith Karmon v. 3M Company et al
Plaintiff: Judith Karmon
Defendant: Fisher Scientific Company L.L.C., Vanderbilt Minerals LLC, ACCO Engineered Systems, Inc., VWR International, LLC, Metalclad Insulation LLC, Soco West, Inc., Pfizer, Inc., Kelly-Moore Paint Company, Inc., Kewaunee Scientific Corporation, 3M Company, Doe, Stinnes-Western Chemical Corporation, Brenntag West Inc., Hill Brothers Chemical Company, Does 1-300, RT Vanderbilt, Labconco Corporation, Blue-M, Soco-Lynch Corporation, Soco-Western Chemical Corporation, Metalcald Insulation Corporation, Van Water and Rogers Inc., Lindberg MPH, A Company of Thermo Fisher Scientific Inc., Union Carbide Corporation and Arthur H. Thomas Co.
Case Number: 2:2021cv02023
Filed: March 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale S Fischer
Referring Judge: Steve Kim
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER DISMISSING DEFENDANT UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION WITHOUT PREJUDICE #14 by Judge Dale S. Fischer. (lom)
April 12, 2021 Filing 26 MINUTES OF VIDEO SCHEDULING CONFERENCE (Held and Completed) held before Judge Dale S. Fischer: The case is stayed pending the substitution of the plaintiff. Counsel are to file a joint statement once the 90 days has passed as to the issue of the substitution. If a substitution of the plaintiff is filed, the parties are to advise the court within 10 days. Court Reporter: Mary Riordan Rickey - VTC. (bm)
April 12, 2021 Filing 25 REPLY NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #8 filed by Defendant Fisher Scientific Company L.L.C.. (Powell, Glen)
April 12, 2021 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #13 filed by Defendant Fisher Scientific Company L.L.C.. (Powell, Glen)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer: GRANTING #15 , #19 Non-Resident Attorney John T. Williams APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Fisher Scientific Company L.L.C, designating Michael J. Pietrykowski as local counsel. (shb)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer: GRANTING #16 , #20 Non-Resident Attorney Michael J. Morrison APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Fisher Scientific Company L.L.C, designating Michael J. Pietrykowski as local counsel. (shb)
April 9, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Bradford J DeJardin counsel for Defendant Metalclad Insulation LLC. Changing Husch Blackwell LLP to 300 South Grand Avenue, Suite 1500, Los Angeles, CA 90071. Filed by Defendant Metalclad Insulation LLC. (Attorney Bradford J DeJardin added to party Metalclad Insulation LLC(pty:dft))(DeJardin, Bradford)
April 9, 2021 Filing 20 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Michael J. Morrison to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Fisher Scientific Company L.L.C. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 4/8/2021, Receipt No. 31070737) filed by Defendant Fisher Scientific Company L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Powell, Glen)
April 9, 2021 Filing 19 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney John T. Williams to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Fisher Scientific Company L.L.C. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 4/8/2021, Receipt No. 31070637) filed by Defendant Fisher Scientific Company L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Powell, Glen)
April 9, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Michael J. Morrison to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Fisher Scientific Company L.L.C. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31070737) #16 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney John T. Williams to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Fisher Scientific Company L.L.C. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31070637) #15 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.4 Local counsel does not maintain an office within the District. Other error(s) with document(s): Application information is inconsistent. DKT. #15 has email listed as mmorrison@hww-law.com on application and jwilliams@hww-law.com on the proposed order. (lt)
April 9, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Erin M Carpenter counsel for Defendant Metalclad Insulation LLC. Changing Husch Blackwell LLP to 300 South Grand Avenue, Los Angeles, CA 90071. Filed by Defendant Metalclad Insulation LLC. (Attorney Erin M Carpenter added to party Metalclad Insulation LLC(pty:dft))(Carpenter, Erin)
April 8, 2021 Filing 16 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Michael J. Morrison to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Fisher Scientific Company L.L.C. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31070737) filed by Defendant Fisher Scientific Company L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Powell, Glen)
April 8, 2021 Filing 15 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney John T. Williams to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Fisher Scientific Company L.L.C. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31070637) filed by Defendant Fisher Scientific Company L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Powell, Glen)
April 7, 2021 Filing 14 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION Judith Karmon filed by Defendant Union Carbide Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order DISMISSING DEFENDANT UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION WITHOUT PREJUDICE)(Attorney Joseph L Greenslade added to party Union Carbide Corporation(pty:dft))(Greenslade, Joseph)
April 5, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by Plainitff's Judith Karmon. Motion set for hearing on 5/3/2021 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Declaration, #6 Exhibit A, #7 Exhibit B, #8 Exhibit C, #9 Proposed Order) (Eyerly, Michael)
April 5, 2021 Filing 12 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 10, filed by Defendant Fisher Scientific Company L.L.C... (Powell, Glen)
April 5, 2021 Filing 11 OPPOSITION re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #8 Declaration of John C. Heubeck in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Judith Karmon. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Eyerly, Michael)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer GRANTING Stipulation to Continue the Hearing #9 on Specially Appearing Defendant Fisher Scientific Company LLC's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of personal Jurisdiction Pursuant to FRCP 12(B)(2) #8 to 4/26/2021 at 01:30 PM. See Order for specifics. (jp)
March 24, 2021 Filing 9 STIPULATION to Continue Specially Appearing Defendant Fisher Scientific Company L.L.C. Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction from April 5, 2021 to April 26, 2021 filed by Plainitff Judith Karmon. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Proposed Order)(Eyerly, Michael)
March 11, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendant Fisher Scientific Company L.L.C.. Motion set for hearing on 4/5/2021 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Preliminary Fact Sheet, #3 Exhibit C - Werley Declaration, #4 Exhibit D - Plaintifff's Opposition, #5 Exhibit E - 11-6-20 Order, #6 Exhibit F - 1-31-21 Order, #7 Exhibit G - Transcript, #8 Proposed Order) (Powell, Glen)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Joint Report must include the completed Schedule of Pretrial and Trial dates. Lead trial counsel are ordered to appear in person unless counsel have been excused by the Court. Scheduling Conference set for 4/12/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (rfi)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (rfi)
March 8, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
March 8, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (ghap)
March 4, 2021 NON CONFORM COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Pfizer, Inc. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT B, PART 4)(ghap)
March 4, 2021 NON CONFORM COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Union Carbide Corporation. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT B, PART 4)(ghap)
March 4, 2021 NON CONFORM COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Kelly-Moore Paint Company, Inc. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT B, PART 3)(ghap)
March 4, 2021 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants 3M Company, A Company of Thermo Fisher Scientific Inc., Arthur H. Thomas Co., Blue-M, Does 1-300, Fisher Scientific Company Company LLC, Hill Brothers Chemical Company, Kelly-Moore Paint Company, Inc., Kewaunee Scientific Corporation, Labconco Corporation, Lindberg MPH, Metalclad Insulation LLC, Pfizer, Inc., Soco West, Inc., Union Carbide Corporation, VWR International, LLC, Vanderbilt Minerals LLC. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Judith Karmon.(FILED IN STATE COURT ON 8/10/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A) (ghap)
March 4, 2021 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL as to VWR International, LLC without prejudice filed by plaintiff Judith Karmon. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 1/13/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT B, PART 7)(ghap)
March 4, 2021 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT #1 plaintiff being ignorant of the true of the defendant and having designated the defendant in the complaint by the fictitious name of DOE 1 and having discovered the true name of the defendant to be ACCO Engineered Systems, Inc., filed by plaintiff Judith Karmon. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 9/10/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT B, PART 2) (ghap)
March 4, 2021 NON CONFORM COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery),, filed by Defendant Vanderbilt Minerals LLC. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT B, PART 3)(ghap)
March 4, 2021 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL as to Pfizer Inc. without prejudice filed by plaintiff Judith Karmon. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 1/20/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT B, PART 7) (ghap)
March 4, 2021 NON CONFORM FILED COPY OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL as to Lindberg MPH without prejudice filed by plaintiff Judith Karmon. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT B, PART 7) (ghap)
March 4, 2021 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL as to Kelly-Moore Paint Company without prejudice filed by plaintiff Judith Karmon. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 2/1/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT B, PART 7) (ghap)
March 4, 2021 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL as to Kewaunee Scientific Corporation without prejudice filed by plaintiff Judith Karmon. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 2/10/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT B, PART 7) (ghap)
March 4, 2021 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL as to Vanderbilt Minerals LLC Formerly Known As RT Vanderbilt without prejudice filed by plaintiff Judith Karmon. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 2/2/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT B, PART 7)(ghap)
March 4, 2021 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL as to Labconco Corporation without prejudice filed by plaintiff Judith Karmon. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 1/25/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT B, PART 7) (ghap)
March 4, 2021 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Movant Fisher Scientific Company L.L.C. identifying Thermo Fisher Scientific Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Powell, Glen)
March 4, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movant Fisher Scientific Company L.L.C.. (Powell, Glen)
March 4, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles, case number 20STCV30505 Receipt No: ACACDC-30861014 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Fisher Scientific Company L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit B, Part 1 to Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit B, Part 2 to Notice of Removal, #4 Exhibit B, Part 3 to Notice of Removal, #5 Exhibit B, Part 4 to Notice of Removal, #6 Exhibit B, Part 5 to Notice of Removal, #7 Exhibit B, Part 6 to Notice of Removal, #8 Exhibit B, Part 7 to Notice of Removal, #9 Exhibit C to Notice of Removal, #10 Exhibit D, Part 1 to Notice of Removal, #11 Exhibit D, Part 2 to Notice of Removal) (Attorney Glen R Powell added to party Fisher Scientific Company L.L.C.(pty:bkmov))(Powell, Glen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Judith Karmon v. 3M Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fisher Scientific Company L.L.C.
Represented By: Michael J. Morrison
Represented By: Michael J. Pietrykowski
Represented By: John T. Williams
Represented By: Glen R. Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vanderbilt Minerals LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACCO Engineered Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VWR International, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metalclad Insulation LLC
Represented By: Erin M Carpenter
Represented By: Bradford J DeJardin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Soco West, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly-Moore Paint Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kewaunee Scientific Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stinnes-Western Chemical Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenntag West Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hill Brothers Chemical Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-300
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RT Vanderbilt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Labconco Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue-M
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Soco-Lynch Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Soco-Western Chemical Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metalcald Insulation Corporation
Represented By: Erin M Carpenter
Represented By: Bradford J DeJardin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Van Water and Rogers Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lindberg MPH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A Company of Thermo Fisher Scientific Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Represented By: Farah Sohaili Nicol
Represented By: Joseph L Greenslade
Represented By: Stephen M. Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur H. Thomas Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith Karmon
Represented By: Michael C Eyerly
Represented By: Eric L Brown
Represented By: Patrick A DeBlase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?