Ayco Farms, Inc. v. Los Angeles Produce Distributors, LLC
Petitioner: AYCO FARMS, INC.
Respondent: LOS ANGELES PRODUCE DISTRIBUTORS, LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv02082
Filed: March 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Cormac J Carney
Referring Judge: John E McDermott
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07 U.S.C. ยง 499
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: Denying Respondent's MOTION to Dismiss Appeal (Dkt. #7 ). Respondent shall file a responsive pleading to Petitioners Petition by May 11, 2021. (twdb)
April 19, 2021 Filing 11 REPLY In Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case (Appeal) #7 filed by Respondent Los Angeles Produce Distributors, LLC. (Monroe, June)
April 12, 2021 Filing 10 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case (Appeal) #7 filed by Petitioner Ayco Farms, Inc.. (Goldman, Robert)
March 30, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF INTENT by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Scheduling order to be issued on June 10, 2021. (cw)
March 29, 2021 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Respondent Los Angeles Produce Distributors, LLC (Monroe, June)
March 29, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case (Appeal) filed by Respondent-Appellee Los Angeles Produce Distributors, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 5/3/2021 at 01:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support of Motion to Dismiss Appeal, #2 Declaration of June Monroe in Support of Respondent-Appellee's Motion to Dismiss Appeal, #3 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Appeal) (Attorney June T Monroe added to party Los Angeles Produce Distributors, LLC(pty:res)) (Monroe, June)
March 9, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: Attachment #3 Civil Cover Sheet and Attachment # 4 Notice of Interested Parties should not have been attached to Docket Entry No.1 Each document should have been filed separately. You are not required to take any action to correct this deficiency unless the Court so directs. (et)
March 9, 2021 Filing 5 21 DAY Summons Issued re Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #2 as to Respondent Los Angeles Produce Distributors, LLC. (et)
March 9, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
March 9, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (et)
March 8, 2021 Filing 2 PETITION with filing fee previously paid (402.00 paid on 03/08/2021, receipt number ACACDC-30875073), filed by Petitioner AYCO FARMS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Decision and Order, #2 Exhibit B - Order Denying Reconsideration, #3 Exhibit C - Contract, #4 Summons)(Goldman, Robert)
March 8, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION Receipt No: ACACDC-30875073 - Fee: $402, filed by Petitioner AYCO FARMS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Decision and Order, #2 Exhibit B - Order Denying Reconsideration, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Notice of Interested Parties) (Attorney Robert E Goldman added to party AYCO FARMS, INC. (pty:pet))(Goldman, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ayco Farms, Inc. v. Los Angeles Produce Distributors, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: LOS ANGELES PRODUCE DISTRIBUTORS, LLC
Represented By: June T Monroe
Represented By: Bartholomew M Botta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: AYCO FARMS, INC.
Represented By: Robert E Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?