Paul Marsalis Brasfield v. Andrew Saul
Plaintiff: Paul Marsalis Brasfield
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 2:2021cv02127
Filed: March 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Alka Sagar
Referring Judge: Stephen V Wilson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 416
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 26, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2021 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Paul Marsalis Brasfield, upon Defendant Andrew Saul served on 3/26/2021, answer due 5/25/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Zimmerman, William)
April 1, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar for all further proceedings. Please use the case number CV21-2127 AS on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn)
March 30, 2021 Filing 11 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Andrew Saul. (Attorney Lynn M Harada added to party Andrew Saul(pty:dft))(Harada, Lynn)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER RE: PROCEDURES IN SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL by Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (see document for details) (Attachments: #1 Blank Consent Form) (hr)
March 12, 2021 Filing 9 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Andrew Saul. (hr)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar: granting #5 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (hr)
March 10, 2021 Filing 7 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Plaintiff Paul Marsalis Brasfield. (Zimmerman, William)
March 9, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and referred to Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (esa)
March 9, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Paul Marsalis Brasfiield. (Zimmerman, William)
March 9, 2021 Filing 4 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Paul Marsalis Brasfiield, (Zimmerman, William)
March 9, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Paul Marsalis Brasfiield. (Zimmerman, William)
March 9, 2021 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Paul Marsalis Brasfiield. (Zimmerman, William)
March 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by Plaintiff Paul Marsalis Brasfiield. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Appeals Court Action) (Attorney William Martin Zimmerman added to party Paul Marsalis Brasfiield(pty:pla))(Zimmerman, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Paul Marsalis Brasfield v. Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Lynn M Harada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Marsalis Brasfield
Represented By: William Martin Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?