Tomislav Radonjic v. Princess Cruise Lines Ltd.
Plaintiff: Tomislav Radonjic
Defendant: Princess Cruise Lines Ltd.
Case Number: 2:2021cv02174
Filed: March 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dolly M Gee
Referring Judge: Steve Kim
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR REPLY by Judge Dolly M. Gee: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Joint Motion for an Extension of Time #24 is GRANTED. Defendant's Reply in Support of Its Motion to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss shall be filed on or before 5/13/2021. (gk)
May 6, 2021 Filing 25 REPLY to Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Quash filed by Plaintiff Tomislav Radonjic. (Finklehoffe, Carol)
May 5, 2021 Filing 24 Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Motion for an Extension of Time for Defendant to File its Reply in Support of its Motion to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss filed by Defendant Princess Cruise Lines Ltd.. Motion set for hearing on 5/21/2021 at 09:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Maltzman, Jeffrey)
May 5, 2021 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss #19 filed by Plaintiff Tomislav Radonjic. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K)(Finklehoffe, Carol)
April 29, 2021 Filing 22 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Quash Bermudan Antisuit Injunction Order #10 filed by Defendant Princess Cruise Lines Ltd.. (Maltzman, Jeffrey)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER ON PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT'S JOINT MOTION FOR LEAVE OF COURT TO RESCHEDULE HEARING #18 by Judge Dolly M. Gee. The Court GRANTS the Motion and HEREBY ORDERS that the hearing on Plaintiffs Motion for an Order Quashing Bermudan Antisuit Injunction Order #10 shall be on May 21, 2021 at 9:30 a.m. (iv)
April 22, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to to Reschedule Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for an Order Quashing Bermudan Antisuit Injuction Order #18 . The following error(s) was/were found: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. The "Joint Motion" is signed unilaterally by plaintiff's counsel. Lacking statement re conference of counsel, pursuant to Local Rule 7-3. Proposed order not submitted pursuant to Local Rule 52-4.1. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk)
April 21, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss filed by Defendant Princess Cruise Lines Ltd.. Motion set for hearing on 5/21/2021 at 09:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Defendant's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Proposed Order)(Maltzman, Jeffrey)
April 19, 2021 Filing 18 Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to to Reschedule Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for an Order Quashing Bermudan Antisuit Injuction Order filed by plaintiff Tomislav Radonjic. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Finklehoffe, Carol)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee: The following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Court's Case Management Order: Plaintiff's re-notice of hearing filed 4/12/2021 #16 , for the following reasons: The parties may not change dates on the Court's motion calendar without leave of Court. (gk)
April 12, 2021 Filing 16 [DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER ORDER ON 4/16/2021, SEE DOCKET NO. 17] NOTICE Re-Notice of Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Order Quashing Bermudan Antisuit Injunction Order filed by plaintiff Tomislav Radonjic. (Finklehoffe, Carol) Modified on 4/16/2021 (gk).
April 9, 2021 Filing 15 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Quash Bermudan Antisuit Injunction Order #10 Defendant's Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for an Order Quashing Bermudan Antisuit Injunction Order filed by Defendant Princess Cruise Lines Ltd.. (Maltzman, Jeffrey)
April 9, 2021 Filing 14 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Princess Cruise Lines Ltd. answer now due 4/22/2021, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by defendant Princess Cruise Lines Ltd..(Maltzman, Jeffrey)
April 2, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Rafaela Patricia Castells on behalf of Defendant Princess Cruise Lines Ltd. (Attorney Rafaela Patricia Castells added to party Princess Cruise Lines Ltd.(pty:dft))(Castells, Rafaela)
April 2, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jeffrey B Maltzman on behalf of Defendant Princess Cruise Lines Ltd. (Attorney Jeffrey B Maltzman added to party Princess Cruise Lines Ltd.(pty:dft))(Maltzman, Jeffrey)
March 31, 2021 Filing 11 SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Tomislav Radonjic, upon Defendant Princess Cruise Lines Ltd. served on 3/22/2021, answer due 4/12/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Finklehoffe, Carol)
March 30, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Quash Bermudan Antisuit Injunction Order filed by Plaintiff Tomislav Radonjic. Motion set for hearing on 4/30/2021 at 09:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J) (Finklehoffe, Carol)
March 12, 2021 Filing 9 EXHIBIT Filed filed by Plaintiff Tomislav Radonjic. as to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Finklehoffe, Carol)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti)
March 11, 2021 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Princess Cruise Lines Ltd. (ghap)
March 11, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
March 11, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (ghap)
March 11, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Tomislav Radonjic, (Finklehoffe, Carol)
March 11, 2021 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Tomislav Radonjic. (Finklehoffe, Carol)
March 11, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Tomislav Radonjic. (Finklehoffe, Carol)
March 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-30892602 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Tomislav Radonjic. (Attorney Carol Lynn Finklehoffe added to party Tomislav Radonjic(pty:pla))(Finklehoffe, Carol)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tomislav Radonjic v. Princess Cruise Lines Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Princess Cruise Lines Ltd.
Represented By: Rafaela Patricia Castells
Represented By: Jeffrey B Maltzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tomislav Radonjic
Represented By: Carol Lynn Finklehoffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?