Silvia Zamora v. Andrew Saul
Plaintiff: Silvia Zamora
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 2:2021cv02182
Filed: March 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Shashi H Kewalramani
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani for all further proceedings. Please use the case number CV21-2182 SHK on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn)
March 31, 2021 Filing 12 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Plaintiff Silvia Zamora. (Rosales, Steven)
March 31, 2021 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Silvia Zamora, upon Defendant Andrew Saul served on 3/23/2021, answer due 7/21/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Attorney General. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to General Counsel. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Civil Process Clerk. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Rosales, Steven)
March 30, 2021 Filing 10 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Andrew Saul. (Attorney Lara A Bradt added to party Andrew Saul(pty:dft))(Bradt, Lara)
March 12, 2021 Filing 9 60 days DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to dft Andrew Saul. (dc)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER RE: PROCEDURES IN SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL (JOINT SUBMISSION FORMAT) by Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (dc)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani: granting #3 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60) re REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support #3 . (dc)
March 11, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and referred to Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (jtil)
March 10, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Silvia Zamora, (Rosales, Steven)
March 10, 2021 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Silvia Zamora. (Rosales, Steven)
March 10, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Silvia Zamora. (Rosales, Steven)
March 10, 2021 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Silvia Zamora. (Rosales, Steven)
March 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by Plaintiff Silvia Zamora. (Attorney Steven G Rosales added to party Silvia Zamora(pty:pla))(Rosales, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Silvia Zamora v. Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Lara A Bradt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Silvia Zamora
Represented By: Steven G Rosales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?