Sunny Misun Kim et al v. Scottsdale Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Sunny Misun Kim and LA 1 Realty, Inc.
Defendant: Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Scottsdale Insurance Company and Does 1 through 20
Case Number: 2:2021cv02185
Filed: March 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jean P Rosenbluth
Referring Judge: Otis D Wright
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2021 Filing 10 Notice of Court's Scheduling Meeting of Counsel [FRCP 16, 26(f)] and Scheduling Conference [FRCP 26(F)] filed by Plaintiffs Sunny Misun Kim, LA 1 Realty, Inc. re: Order,, Set/Reset Hearing, #9 (Lipscomb, Steven)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER that the Scheduling Conference is set for July 19, 2021 1:30 PM ; compliance with FRCP 16, and 26(f) and filing of joint report; Counsel for plaintiff shall immediately serve this Order on all parties, including any new parties to the action by Judge Otis D Wright, II (lc)
March 17, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendants Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Scottsdale Insurance Company.(Rojas, Valerie)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS)by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. Counsel are STRONGLY encouraged to review the Central District's website for additional information. The address is "http://www.cacd.uscourts.gov." See minute order for details. (lom)
March 11, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
March 11, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (car)
March 10, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiffs Sunny Misun Kim, LA 1 Realty, Inc., upon Defendant Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company served on 2/10/2021, answer due 3/3/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CSC - Koy Saechao - Person Authorized to Accept Service of Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. Filed in State Court on 2/17/2021 Submitted with Attachment 2 to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
March 10, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiffs Sunny Misun Kim, LA 1 Realty, Inc., upon Defendant Scottsdale Insurance Company served on 2/8/2021, answer due 3/1/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CSC - Koy Saechao - Person Authorized to Accept Service of Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. Filed in State Court on 2/17/2021 Submitted with Attachment 2 to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
March 10, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 20, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Scottsdale Insurance Company. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiffs Sunny Misun Kim, LA 1 Realty, Inc. Filed in State Court on 1/27/2021 Submitted with Attachment 1 to Notice of Removal #1 . (car)
March 10, 2021 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Scottsdale Insurance Company, served on March 10, 2021. (Rojas, Valerie)
March 10, 2021 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Scottsdale Insurance Company, (Rojas, Valerie)
March 10, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Scottsdale Insurance Company. (Rojas, Valerie)
March 10, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 21STCV03323 Receipt No: ACACDC-30894486 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendants Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Scottsdale Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit C to Notice of Removal, #4 Exhibit D to Notice of Removal, #5 Exhibit E to Notice of Removal) (Attorney Valerie D Rojas added to party Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Valerie D Rojas added to party Scottsdale Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Rojas, Valerie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sunny Misun Kim et al v. Scottsdale Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sunny Misun Kim
Represented By: Steven J Lipscomb
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Steven C Shuman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LA 1 Realty, Inc.
Represented By: Steven J Lipscomb
Represented By: Elizabeth Lane Crooke
Represented By: Walter John Lack
Represented By: Steven C Shuman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Valerie D Rojas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scottsdale Insurance Company
Represented By: Valerie D Rojas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?