Aldridge Gray v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Aldridge Gray
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Capital One Bank (U.S.A.), N.A. and Capital One Bank U.S.A., N.A.
Case Number: 2:2021cv02335
Filed: March 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Alexander F MacKinnon
Referring Judge: Mark C Scarsi
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 21, 2021 Filing 13 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc. answer now due 5/28/2021, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(Ghazikhanian, Ani)
April 16, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc., identifying Experian plc, Central Source LLC, Online Data Exchange LLC, New Management Services LLC, VantageScore Solutions LLC, Opt-Out Services LLC. (Ghazikhanian, Ani)
April 16, 2021 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ani Ghazikhanian counsel for Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Adding Ani Ghazikhanian as counsel of record for Experian Information Solutions, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Attorney Ani Ghazikhanian added to party Experian Information Solutions, Inc.(pty:dft))(Ghazikhanian, Ani)
April 13, 2021 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Aldridge Gray. upon Capital One Bank U.S.A., N.A. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 3/23/2021, answer due 5/24/2021. Waiver of Service signed by Sarah Warren Howlett. (Kent, Trinette)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE MARK C. SCARSI upon filing of the complaint by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (smo)
March 18, 2021 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (car)
March 18, 2021 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Capital One Bank U.S.A., N.A. (car)
March 18, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
March 18, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Mark C. Scarsi and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (car)
March 18, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Aldridge Gray Aldridge Gray, identifying None. (Kent, Trinette)
March 17, 2021 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Aldridge Gray. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons)(Kent, Trinette)
March 17, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Aldridge Gray. (Kent, Trinette)
March 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-30931118 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff Aldridge Gray. (Attorney Trinette Gragirena Kent added to party Aldridge Gray(pty:pla))(Kent, Trinette)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aldridge Gray v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aldridge Gray
Represented By: Trinette Gragirena Kent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Ani Ghazikhanian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Bank (U.S.A.), N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Bank U.S.A., N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?