James Shayler v. Marco Arroyo et al
Plaintiff: James Shayler
Defendant: Peter Joe, Kimberley Wu, Does 1-10, inclusive and Marco Arroyo
Case Number: 2:2021cv02394
Filed: March 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andre Birotte
Referring Judge: Alicia G Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Granting #18 APPLICATION to Stay Case re Early Mediation ADA Disability Access Litigation as to All Defendants. The ADR proceeding is to be completed no later than 7/26/2021. (gk)
April 22, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY Re: Request for Entry of Default against Defendant Peter Joe, individually and as trustee of the Joe Family Living Trust dated November 13, 2015 #17 . The Clerk cannot enter the requested relief as: Time to respond has not expired. An Application for Stay and Early Mediation (Form ADR-21) was filed on behalf of defendants on 4/21/2021. (gk)
April 22, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY Re: Request for Entry of Default against Defendant Kimberley Wu, individually and as trustee of the Joe Family Living Trust dated November 13, 2015 #16 . The Clerk cannot enter the requested relief as: The name of the person served does not exactly match the person named in complaint. An Application for Stay and Early Mediation (Form ADR-21) was filed on behalf of defendants on 4/21/2021. (gk)
April 22, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY Re: Request for Entry of Default against Defendant Marco Arroyo, an individual #15 . The Clerk cannot enter the requested relief as: Time to respond has not expired. An Application for Stay and Early Mediation (Form ADR-21) was filed on behalf of defendants on 4/21/2021. (gk)
April 21, 2021 Filing 18 APPLICATION to Stay Case and Early Mediation re ADA Disability Access Litigation, filed by defendant Marco Arroyo. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Application for Stay and Early Mediation) (Attorney Michael Keith Collins added to party Marco Arroyo(pty:dft)) (Collins, Michael)
April 20, 2021 Filing 17 REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Peter Joe(as trustee of the JOE FAMILY LIVING TRUST DATED NOVEMBER 13, 2015), Peter Joe(individually ) filed by Plaintiff James Shayler. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Entry of Default, #2 Exhibit Proof Of Service) (Manning, Joseph)
April 20, 2021 Filing 16 REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Kimberley Wu(individually), Kimberley Wu(as trustee of the JOE FAMILY LIVING TRUST DATED NOVEMBER 13, 2015) filed by Plaintiff James Shayler. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Entry of Default, #2 Exhibit Proof Of Service) (Manning, Joseph)
April 20, 2021 Filing 15 REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Marco Arroyo filed by Plaintiff James Shayler. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Entry of Default, #2 Exhibit Proof Of Service) (Manning, Joseph)
April 15, 2021 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff James Shayler, upon Defendant Marco Arroyo served on 4/15/2021, answer due 5/6/2021. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Manning, Joseph)
April 15, 2021 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff James Shayler, upon Defendant Peter Joe(as trustee of the JOE FAMILY LIVING TRUST DATED NOVEMBER 13, 2015) served on 4/15/2021, answer due 5/6/2021; Peter Joe(individually ) served on 4/15/2021, answer due 5/6/2021. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Manning, Joseph)
April 14, 2021 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff James Shayler, upon Defendant Kimberley Wu(individually) served on 3/27/2021, answer due 4/19/2021; Kimberley Wu(as trustee of the JOE FAMILY LIVING TRUST DATED NOVEMBER 13, 2015) served on 3/27/2021, answer due 4/19/2021. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Manning, Joseph)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
March 19, 2021 Filing 10 Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (cb)
March 18, 2021 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Peter Joe(as trustee of the JOE FAMILY LIVING TRUST DATED NOVEMBER 13, 2015), Peter Joe(individually ), Kimberley Wu(individually), Kimberley Wu(as trustee of the JOE FAMILY LIVING TRUST DATED NOVEMBER 13, 2015). (ghap)
March 18, 2021 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Marco Arroyo. (ghap)
March 18, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
March 18, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (ghap)
March 18, 2021 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff JAMES SHAYLER, an individual,. (Manning, Joseph)
March 18, 2021 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff JAMES SHAYLER, an individual,. (Manning, Joseph)
March 18, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff JAMES SHAYLER, an individual,. (Manning, Joseph)
March 18, 2021 Filing 2 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff JAMES SHAYLER, an individual,, (Manning, Joseph)
March 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-30941496 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff JAMES SHAYLER, an individual,. (Attorney Joseph Richard Manning, Jr added to party JAMES SHAYLER, an individual, (pty:pla))(Manning, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: James Shayler v. Marco Arroyo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Joe
Represented By: Michael Keith Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberley Wu
Represented By: Michael Keith Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marco Arroyo
Represented By: Michael Keith Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Shayler
Represented By: Joseph Richard Manning, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?