Dole Packaged Foods, LLC v. The Dow Chemical Company et al
Plaintiff: Dole Packaged Foods, LLC
Defendant: Shell Oil Company doing business as Shell Chemical Company, The Dow Chemical Company and DOES 1 through 300, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2021cv02958
Filed: April 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andre Birotte
Referring Judge: Michael W Fitzgerald
2 Judge: Sheri Pym
3 Judge: Alka Sagar
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2021 Filing 20 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant The Dow Chemical Company, identifying Dow Inc.. (Langner, Bailey)
May 14, 2021 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant The Dow Chemical Company.(Langner, Bailey)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This case has been assigned to Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. This matter is set for a scheduling conference 06/21/21 at 11:00 AM. (pg)
May 6, 2021 Filing 17 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to The Dow Chemical Company answer now due 5/14/2021, filed by Defendant The Dow Chemical Company.(Attorney Bailey J Langner added to party The Dow Chemical Company(pty:dft))(Langner, Bailey)
May 6, 2021 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Shell Oil Company identifying Royal Dutch Shell plc as Corporate Parent. (Smith, Jay)
May 6, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Shell Oil Company, identifying Dole Packaged Foods, LLC (Plaintiff); Dole International Holdings, Inc. (a Japanese corporation, which is Plaintiff's sole member); The Dow Chemical Company (Defendant). (Smith, Jay)
May 6, 2021 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Shell Oil Company.(Attorney Jay E Smith added to party Shell Oil Company(pty:dft))(Smith, Jay)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 21-01-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 5:18-cv-02022 MWF(SPx). Case transferred from Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar to Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:21-cv-02958 MWF(SPx). Signed by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald (rn)
April 16, 2021 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Dole Packaged Foods, LLC, upon Defendant Shell Oil Company served on 4/15/2021, answer due 5/6/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Daisy Montenegro, Process Specialist, CT Corporation, Registered Agent for Service of Process in compliance with statute not specified by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Sansone, Kenneth)
April 16, 2021 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Dole Packaged Foods, LLC, upon Defendant The Dow Chemical Company served on 4/15/2021, answer due 5/6/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Daisy Montenegro, Process Specialist, CT Corporation, Registered Agent for Service of Process in compliance with statute not specified by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Sansone, Kenneth)
April 12, 2021 Filing 10 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Shell Oil Company, The Dow Chemical Company. (et)
April 12, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
April 12, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (et)
April 6, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff Dole Packaged Foods, LLC. Related Case(s): Multiple (Mansergh, Seth)
April 6, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff Dole Packaged Foods, LLC. Related Case(s): 2:18- cv-10139-MWF-SPx; 5:19-cv-00842-MWF-SPx; 5:20-cv-00881-MWF-SPx; 2:20-cv-07765-MWF-SPx; 5:20-cv-02562-MWF-SPx; 5:21-cv-00173-MWF-SPx (Mansergh, Seth)
April 6, 2021 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Dole Packaged Foods, LLC identifying Dole International Holdings, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Mansergh, Seth)
April 6, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Dole Packaged Foods, LLC, identifying Dole International Holdings, Inc.. (Mansergh, Seth)
April 6, 2021 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plainitff Dole Packaged Foods, LLC. (Mansergh, Seth)
April 6, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Dole Packaged Foods, LLC. (Mansergh, Seth)
April 6, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31051147 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Dole Packaged Foods, LLC. (Attorney Seth D Mansergh added to party Dole Packaged Foods, LLC(pty:pla))(Mansergh, Seth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dole Packaged Foods, LLC v. The Dow Chemical Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shell Oil Company doing business as Shell Chemical Company
Represented By: Jay E Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Dow Chemical Company
Represented By: Alessandra M Givens
Represented By: Bailey J Langner
Represented By: Nicholas D Kayhan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 300, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dole Packaged Foods, LLC
Represented By: Seth D Mansergh
Represented By: Kenneth A Sansone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?