Middlesex Insurance Co v. SLS Freight, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Middlesex Insurance Co
Defendant: SLS Freight, LLC, Edith Valencia an individual doing business as Morfins Empire Transportation, DOES 1 through 10 inclusive and JTS Express, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv03106
Filed: April 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dolly M Gee
Referring Judge: Autumn D Spaeth
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2021 Filing 21 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant SLS Freight, LLC, re Notice of Settlement #20 mail service on non-ECF parties served on 05/21/2021. (Kazi, Ruby)
May 20, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Settlement as to Defendants SLS Freight, LLC and JTS Express, Inc. filed by Defendant SLS Freight, LLC. (Kazi, Ruby)
May 6, 2021 Filing 19 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against DEFENDANT All Defendants amending Complaint - (Discovery),, filed by PLAINTIFF Middlesex Insurance Co(Tapper, Brian)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANT SLS FREIGHT, LLC TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Upon Stipulation #17 , Defendant SLS Freight, LLC's response deadline is extended to 5/7/2021. (gk)
April 30, 2021 Filing 17 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint filed by Defendant SLS Freight, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proof of mail service on non-ECF parties)(Kazi, Ruby)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Clare Taft to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant SLS Freight, LLC, designating Hillary A. Booth as local counsel #13 . (iv)
April 22, 2021 Filing 15 DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Defendant SLS Freight, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Kazi, Ruby)
April 21, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Clare R. Taft. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (gk)
April 21, 2021 Filing 13 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Clare R. Taft to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant SLS Freight, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31159258) filed by Defendants SLS Freight, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Booth, Hillary)
April 21, 2021 Filing 12 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Hillary Arrow Booth counsel for Defendant SLS Freight, LLC. Adding Hillary Arrow Booth as counsel of record for SLS Freight, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant SLS Freight, LLC. (Attorney Hillary Arrow Booth added to party SLS Freight, LLC(pty:dft))(Booth, Hillary)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANT SLS FREIGHT, LLC TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Upon Stipulation #10 , Defendant SLS Freight, LLC's response deadline is extended to 4/30/2021. (gk)
April 16, 2021 Filing 10 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint filed by Defendant SLS Freight, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proof of mail service on non-ECF parties)(Kazi, Ruby)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti)
April 13, 2021 Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant SLS Freight, LLC, re Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #5 , Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form,,, #7 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #6 served on 04/13/2021. (Kazi, Ruby)
April 13, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Eric L. Zalud. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (car)
April 13, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
April 13, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (car)
April 9, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 10, inclusive, JTS Express, Inc., SLS Freight, LLC, Edith Valencia, filed by Plaintiff Middlesex Insurance Co. Filed in State Court on 3/5/2021 Submitted with Attachment 1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
April 9, 2021 Filing 4 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant SLS Freight, LLC, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 served on 04/09/2021. (Kazi, Ruby)
April 9, 2021 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant SLS Freight, LLC, identifying Avalon Risk Management. (Kazi, Ruby)
April 9, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant SLS Freight, LLC. (Kazi, Ruby)
April 9, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 21STCV08883 Receipt No: ACACDC-31084077 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant SLS Freight, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Summons, #3 Exhibit C - Notice of Filing Removal) (Attorney Ruby H. Kazi added to party SLS Freight, LLC(pty:dft))(Kazi, Ruby)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Middlesex Insurance Co v. SLS Freight, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Middlesex Insurance Co
Represented By: Todd F Haines
Represented By: Brian P Tapper
Represented By: Shan H Yamamoto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SLS Freight, LLC
Represented By: Ruby H. Kazi
Represented By: Clare R. Taft
Represented By: Krista M Enns
Represented By: Hillary Arrow Booth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edith Valencia an individual doing business as Morfins Empire Transportation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10 inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JTS Express, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?