Carlos Lozano et al v. Wellpath LLC et al
Plaintiff: Oscar Puentes, Karla Gutierrez and Carlos Lozano
Defendant: Paul Adler, Wellpath LLC, County of Ventura, Does 1-10, individually, jointly, and severally, H.I.G. Capital, LLC, Gerard Boyle, William Ayub, William T. Fithian, III, California Forensic Medical Group, Inc. a California professional corporation doing business as Wellpath, Jorge A. Dominicis, Ronald Pollack and Janice Thomas MD
Case Number: 2:2021cv03153
Filed: April 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Fernando L Aenlle-Rocha
Referring Judge: Douglas F McCormick
2 Judge: Christina A Snyder
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2021 Filing 38 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to H.I.G. Capital, LLC answer now due 6/28/2021, filed by defendant H.I.G. Capital, LLC.(Gentry, Evelina)
June 9, 2021 Filing 37 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Paul Adler, Gerard Boyle, Jorge A. Dominicis, William T. Fithian, III, Janice Thomas MD, identifying Wellpath and CFMG. (Bertling, Peter)
June 9, 2021 Filing 36 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendants Paul Adler, Gerard Boyle, Jorge A. Dominicis, William T. Fithian, III, Janice Thomas MD.(Attorney Peter G Bertling added to party Paul Adler(pty:dft), Attorney Peter G Bertling added to party Gerard Boyle(pty:dft), Attorney Peter G Bertling added to party Jorge A. Dominicis(pty:dft), Attorney Peter G Bertling added to party William T. Fithian, III(pty:dft), Attorney Peter G Bertling added to party Janice Thomas MD(pty:dft))(Bertling, Peter)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (vv)
June 4, 2021 Filing 34 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #33 by William Ayub and County of Ventura. The following error(s) was/were found: Case number is incorrect or missing. Case number and document is directed to the Incorrect previous Judge Snyder and her initials "CAS". Other error(s) with document(s): Case was reassigned 4/29/2021 to Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. The Official correct case number is: 2:21-cv-03153 FLA(DFMx). In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
June 4, 2021 Filing 33 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendants William Ayub, County of Ventura.(Zambito, Rocco)
May 25, 2021 Filing 32 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Karla Gutierrez, Oscar Puentes, Carlos Lozano. upon William T. Fithian, III waiver sent by Plaintiff on 4/27/2021, answer due 6/28/2021. Waiver of Service signed by Jemma Parker Saunders, Attorney. (Lyman, Edward)
May 25, 2021 Filing 31 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Karla Gutierrez, Oscar Puentes, Carlos Lozano. upon Jorge A. Dominicis waiver sent by Plaintiff on 4/27/2021, answer due 6/28/2021. Waiver of Service signed by Jemma Parker Saunders, Attorney. (Lyman, Edward)
May 25, 2021 Filing 30 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Karla Gutierrez, Oscar Puentes, Carlos Lozano. upon Janice Thomas MD waiver sent by Plaintiff on 4/27/2021, answer due 6/28/2021. Waiver of Service signed by Jemma Parker Saunders, Attorney. (Lyman, Edward)
May 25, 2021 Filing 29 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Karla Gutierrez, Oscar Puentes, Carlos Lozano. upon Gerard Boyle waiver sent by Plaintiff on 4/27/2021, answer due 6/28/2021. Waiver of Service signed by Jemma Parker Saunders, Attorney. (Lyman, Edward)
May 24, 2021 Filing 28 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants California Forensic Medical Group, Inc., Ronald Pollack, Wellpath LLC, identifying Wellpath and CFMG. (Attorney Jemma A Parker Saunders added to party California Forensic Medical Group, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Jemma A Parker Saunders added to party Ronald Pollack(pty:dft), Attorney Jemma A Parker Saunders added to party Wellpath LLC(pty:dft))(Saunders, Jemma)
May 24, 2021 Filing 27 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #26 by California Forensic Medical Group, Inc., Ronald Pollack, Wellpath LLC.. The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
May 21, 2021 Filing 26 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendants California Forensic Medical Group, Inc., Ronald Pollack, Wellpath LLC.(Attorney Peter G Bertling added to party California Forensic Medical Group, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Peter G Bertling added to party Ronald Pollack(pty:dft), Attorney Peter G Bertling added to party Wellpath LLC(pty:dft))(Bertling, Peter)
May 20, 2021 Filing 25 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Karla Gutierrez, Oscar Puentes, Carlos Lozano, upon Defendant Paul Adler served on 5/19/2021, answer due 6/9/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Paul Adler D.O. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Lyman, Edward)
May 19, 2021 Filing 24 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Karla Gutierrez, Oscar Puentes, Carlos Lozano, upon Defendant Wellpath LLC served on 4/16/2021, answer due 5/7/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Corporate Creations Network, Inc. - Tiffany Phillips - Person Authorized to Accept Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Lyman, Edward)
May 19, 2021 Filing 23 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Karla Gutierrez, Oscar Puentes, Carlos Lozano, upon Defendant Ronald Pollack served on 4/18/2021, answer due 5/10/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Ronald Pollack, MD in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Lyman, Edward)
May 19, 2021 Filing 22 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Karla Gutierrez, Oscar Puentes, Carlos Lozano, upon Defendant County of Ventura served on 4/16/2021, answer due 5/7/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Monica Sanchez, Deputy Clerk - Person Authorized to Accept Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Lyman, Edward)
May 19, 2021 Filing 21 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Karla Gutierrez, Oscar Puentes, Carlos Lozano, upon Defendant California Forensic Medical Group, Inc. served on 4/16/2021, answer due 5/7/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Tiffany Phillips Corporate Creations Network, Inc Agents for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Lyman, Edward)
May 19, 2021 Filing 20 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Karla Gutierrez, Oscar Puentes, Carlos Lozano, upon Defendant William Ayub served on 4/16/2021, answer due 5/7/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Monica Sanchez, Clerk of the Board of Supervisors (authorized to accept) in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Lyman, Edward)
May 13, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Paul B Beach on behalf of Defendants William Ayub, County of Ventura (Attorney Paul B Beach added to party William Ayub(pty:dft), Attorney Paul B Beach added to party County of Ventura(pty:dft))(Beach, Paul)
May 13, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Rocco Zambito, Jr on behalf of Defendants William Ayub, County of Ventura (Attorney Rocco Zambito, Jr added to party William Ayub(pty:dft), Attorney Rocco Zambito, Jr added to party County of Ventura(pty:dft))(Zambito, Rocco)
May 7, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, #15 by defendants William Ayub, County of Ventura. The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Stipulation: Extending time to answer (30 days or Less). Due to incorrect event, NO extension of time to answer recorded on docket. Use of the incorrect event requires a proposed order to be submitted as a separate attachment. Other error(s) with document(s): Note: To assist in a search for correct events, please use the "SEARCH" option for a "key word" to narrow the selection process. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
May 7, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants William Ayub, County of Ventura, (Eicher, James)
May 7, 2021 Filing 15 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response filed by Defendants William Ayub, County of Ventura.(Attorney James S Eicher added to party William Ayub(pty:dft), Attorney James S Eicher added to party County of Ventura(pty:dft))(Eicher, James)
May 4, 2021 Filing 14 Notice of Electronic Filing re Returning Case for Reassignment w/i division (CV-89), #13 e-mailed to Gregory J Ramirez at gramirez@gramirezlaw.com bounced due to typo in email address. Primary e-mail address corrected. Notice of Electronic Filing resent addressed to gramirez@gjramirezlaw.com. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ir) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 21-01. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:21-cv-03153 FLA(DFMx). (rn)
April 22, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by defendant H.I.G. Capital, LLC, (Gentry, Evelina)
April 22, 2021 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Evelina Gentry counsel for Defendant H.I.G. Capital, LLC. Adding Evelina Gentry as counsel of record for H.I.G. Capital, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant H.I.G. Capital, LLC. (Attorney Evelina Gentry added to party H.I.G. Capital, LLC(pty:dft))(Gentry, Evelina)
April 22, 2021 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ellen S. Robbins counsel for Defendant H.I.G. Capital, LLC. Adding Ellen Robbins as counsel of record for H.I.G. Capital, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant H.I.G. Capital, LLC. (Attorney Ellen S. Robbins added to party H.I.G. Capital, LLC(pty:dft))(Robbins, Ellen)
April 15, 2021 Filing 9 Defendant H.I.G. Capital LLC's WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs' Attorney Karla Gutierrez, Oscar Puentes, Carlos Lozano. upon H.I.G. Capital, LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 4/13/2021, answer due 6/14/2021. Waiver of Service signed by Evelina Gentry. (Lyman, Edward)
April 15, 2021 Filing 8 Plaintiffs' Notice and CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs' Attorney All Plaintiffs, (Lyman, Edward)
April 13, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (ghap)
April 13, 2021 Filing 6 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 as to Defendants Paul Adler, William Ayub, Gerard Boyle, California Forensic Medical Group, Inc., County of Ventura, Jorge A. Dominicis, William T. Fithian, III, H.I.G. Capital, LLC, Ronald Pollack, Wellpath LLC. (ghap)
April 13, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
April 13, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (ghap)
April 13, 2021 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Attorney KARLA ELIZABETH GUIERREZ CENTENO, CARLOS ARTURO LOZANO, OSCAR LOZANO PUENTES. (Lyman, Edward)
April 13, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs KARLA ELIZABETH GUIERREZ CENTENO, OSCAR LOZANO PUENTES, Estate Plaintiff CARLOS ARTURO LOZANO. (Lyman, Edward)
April 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31101561 - Fee: $402, filed by Attorney KARLA ELIZABETH GUIERREZ CENTENO, OSCAR LOZANO PUENTES, CARLOS ARTURO LOZANO. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Successors in Interest, #2 Exhibit Death Certificate, #3 Exhibit Ventura County Contract 7281) (Attorney Edward M Lyman, III added to party KARLA ELIZABETH GUIERREZ CENTENO(pty:pla), Attorney Edward M Lyman, III added to party CARLOS ARTURO LOZANO(pty:estp), Attorney Edward M Lyman, III added to party OSCAR LOZANO PUENTES(pty:pla))(Lyman, Edward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carlos Lozano et al v. Wellpath LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Adler
Represented By: Peter G Bertling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wellpath LLC
Represented By: Jemma A Parker Saunders
Represented By: Peter G Bertling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Ventura
Represented By: Rocco Zambito, Jr
Represented By: Paul B Beach
Represented By: James S Eicher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10, individually, jointly, and severally
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.I.G. Capital, LLC
Represented By: Evelina Gentry
Represented By: Ellen S. Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerard Boyle
Represented By: Peter G Bertling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Ayub
Represented By: Rocco Zambito, Jr
Represented By: Paul B Beach
Represented By: James S Eicher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William T. Fithian, III
Represented By: Peter G Bertling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Forensic Medical Group, Inc. a California professional corporation doing business as Wellpath
Represented By: Jemma A Parker Saunders
Represented By: Peter G Bertling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jorge A. Dominicis
Represented By: Peter G Bertling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Pollack
Represented By: Jemma A Parker Saunders
Represented By: Peter G Bertling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janice Thomas MD
Represented By: Peter G Bertling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oscar Puentes
Represented By: Edward M Lyman, III
Represented By: Gregory J Ramirez
Represented By: Brian T Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karla Gutierrez
Represented By: Edward M Lyman, III
Represented By: Gregory J Ramirez
Represented By: Brian T Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Lozano
Represented By: Edward M Lyman, III
Represented By: Gregory J Ramirez
Represented By: Brian T Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?