James Shayler v. NX Solutions, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: James Shayler
Defendant: Does 1-10, inclusive, Koan Young Lay, NX Solutions, Inc. and Koan You Lay
Case Number: 2:2021cv03208
Filed: April 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Autumn D Spaeth
Referring Judge: Stephen V Wilson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2021 Filing 20 DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to NX Solutions, Inc. a California corporation. (mrgo)
June 8, 2021 Filing 19 DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Koan You Lay an individual. (mrgo)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 IN CHAMBERS ORDER/TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Stephen V. Wilson - The Order to Show Cause #14 , issued on 05/26/2021, is DISCHARGED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 7, 2021 Filing 17 REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Koan Young Lay filed by Plaintiff James Shayler. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Entry of Default, #2 Exhibit Proof Of Service) (Manning, Joseph)
June 7, 2021 Filing 16 REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant NX Solutions, Inc. filed by Plaintiff James Shayler. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Entry of Default, #2 Exhibit Proof Of Service) (Manning, Joseph)
June 2, 2021 Filing 15 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff James Shaylerto Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, Set/Reset Deadlines #14 Response to OSC (Manning, Joseph)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Show Cause Response due by 6/2/2021.) (mrgo)
May 12, 2021 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff James Shayler, upon Defendant Koan Young Lay served on 5/4/2021, answer due 5/25/2021. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Manning, Joseph)
May 12, 2021 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff James Shayler, upon Defendant NX Solutions, Inc. served on 5/4/2021, answer due 5/25/2021. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Manning, Joseph)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS TO FILE JOINT REPORT by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. It is the policy of this Court to encourage expedient resolution of civil litigation. Cf. Fed. R. Civ. P. 1 (noting that rules of civil procedure should be construed to "secure the just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of every action and proceeding"). In accordance with that policy, the Court reminds the parties that "a defendant's voluntary removal of alleged barriers prior to trial can have the effect of mooting a plaintiff's ADA claim." Oliver v. Ralphs Grocery Co., 654 F.3d 903, 905 (9th Cir. 2011). (See document for details). In light of the foregoing, the parties are ORDERED to issue a joint status report at least 7 days prior to the initial status conference. In that status report, Defendant should describe the measures it has taken to investigate and/or remedy the alleged barriers. If Defendant implemented remedial measures, Plaintiff should state their position regarding those measures. Both parties should state whether and when they intend to move for summary judgment. (mrgo)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
April 14, 2021 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Koan Young Lay. (et)
April 14, 2021 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant NX Solutions, Inc. (et)
April 14, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
April 14, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (et)
April 14, 2021 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff JAMES SHAYLER, an individual,. (Manning, Joseph)
April 14, 2021 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff JAMES SHAYLER, an individual,. (Manning, Joseph)
April 14, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff JAMES SHAYLER, an individual,. (Manning, Joseph)
April 14, 2021 Filing 2 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff JAMES SHAYLER, an individual,, (Manning, Joseph)
April 14, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31113846 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff JAMES SHAYLER, an individual,. (Attorney Joseph Richard Manning, Jr added to party JAMES SHAYLER, an individual, (pty:pla))(Manning, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: James Shayler v. NX Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Shayler
Represented By: Joseph Richard Manning, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Koan Young Lay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NX Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Koan You Lay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?