James Shayler v. Alta Dena Drive-In Dairy et al
Plaintiff: JAMES SHAYLER, an individual, and James Shayler
Defendant: ALTA DENA DRIVE-IN DAIRY, a business of unknown form, DOES 1-10 Inclusive, KYUN AN SONG and YONG JUM SONG, individually and as trustees of the KYUN AN SONG AND YONG JUM SONG 2011 REVOCABLE TRUST, Alta Dena Drive-In Dairy, Yong Jum Song, Does 1-10, inclusive and Kyun An Song
Case Number: 2:2021cv03231
Filed: April 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Alka Sagar
Referring Judge: Stephen V Wilson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff James Shayler. (Manning, Joseph)
May 27, 2021 Filing 14 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Yong Jum Song answer now due 6/24/2021; Kyun An Song answer now due 6/24/2021; Alta Dena Drive-In Dairy answer now due 6/24/2021, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants Yong Jum Song; Kyun An Song; Alta Dena Drive-In Dairy.(Attorney Hyunsuk A Chang added to party Alta Dena Drive-In Dairy (pty:dft), Attorney Hyunsuk A Chang added to party Kyun An Song(pty:dft), Attorney Hyunsuk A Chang added to party Yong Jum Song(pty:dft))(Chang, Hyunsuk)
May 21, 2021 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff James Shayler, upon Defendant Alta Dena Drive-In Dairy served on 5/4/2021, answer due 5/25/2021. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Manning, Joseph)
May 21, 2021 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff James Shayler, upon Defendant Kyun An Song served on 5/21/2021, answer due 6/11/2021; Yong Jum Song served on 5/21/2021, answer due 6/11/2021. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Manning, Joseph)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE IN CHAMBERS ORDER TO FILE JOINT STATUS REPORT. by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: The parties are ORDERED to issue a joint status report at least 7 days prior to the initial status conference. In that status report, Defendant should describe the measures it has taken to investigate and/or remedy the alleged barriers. If Defendant implemented remedial measures, Plaintiff should statetheir position regarding those measures. Both parties should state whether and when they intend to move for summary judgment. See order for details. (shb)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
April 15, 2021 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Kyun An Song, Yong Jum Song. (et)
April 15, 2021 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Alta Dena Drive-In Dairy. (et)
April 15, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
April 15, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (et)
April 14, 2021 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff JAMES SHAYLER, an individual,. (Manning, Joseph)
April 14, 2021 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff JAMES SHAYLER, an individual,. (Manning, Joseph)
April 14, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff JAMES SHAYLER, an individual,. (Manning, Joseph)
April 14, 2021 Filing 2 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff JAMES SHAYLER, an individual,, (Manning, Joseph)
April 14, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31115544 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff JAMES SHAYLER, an individual,. (Attorney Joseph Richard Manning, Jr added to party JAMES SHAYLER, an individual, (pty:pla))(Manning, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: James Shayler v. Alta Dena Drive-In Dairy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALTA DENA DRIVE-IN DAIRY, a business of unknown form
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10 Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KYUN AN SONG and YONG JUM SONG, individually and as trustees of the KYUN AN SONG AND YONG JUM SONG 2011 REVOCABLE TRUST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alta Dena Drive-In Dairy
Represented By: Hyunsuk A Chang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yong Jum Song
Represented By: Hyunsuk A Chang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyun An Song
Represented By: Hyunsuk A Chang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES SHAYLER, an individual,
Represented By: Joseph Richard Manning, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Shayler
Represented By: Joseph Richard Manning, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?