James Shayler v. Eddie Baharians et al
Plaintiff: James Shayler
Defendant: Perry Cooper, Eddie Baharians, Does 1-10, inclusive, Stella Matavousian and Shari Cooper
Case Number: 2:2021cv03261
Filed: April 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Stanley Blumenfeld
Referring Judge: Pedro V Castillo
2 Judge: Jean P Rosenbluth
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: The parties filed a notice of settlement on 6/2/2021 #19 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties are to show cause why the action should not be dismissed with prejudice on 8/6/2021 08:30 AM before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr. If the parties file a proposed order to dismiss the entire action with prejudice by 7/30/2021, the OSC shall be taken off calendar without further notice. Otherwise, the parties shall file a status conference report by July 30, 2021 and appear at the OSC hearing even if they subsequently file a request for dismissal. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all other hearings and deadlines are vacated. (gk)
June 2, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff James Shayler. (Manning, Joseph)
May 25, 2021 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 (amended Answer) filed by Defendants Perry Cooper, Shari Cooper.(Halavais, Coby)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. The Court sets a Scheduling Conference for 6/25/2021 at 08:30 AM before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr. The parties shall file a joint Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/18/2021. (vcr)
May 18, 2021 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Perry Cooper, Shari Cooper, (Halavais, Coby)
May 18, 2021 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Stella Matavousian.(Attorney Coby R Halavais added to party Stella Matavousian(pty:dft))(Halavais, Coby)
May 18, 2021 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Perry Cooper, Shari Cooper.(Attorney Coby R Halavais added to party Perry Cooper(pty:dft), Attorney Coby R Halavais added to party Shari Cooper(pty:dft))(Halavais, Coby)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. (vcr)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT UPON RECUSAL by Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment Discovery pursuant to General Order 05-07. Case randomly reassigned from Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth to Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:21-cv-03261 SB(PVCx). (rn)
April 15, 2021 Filing 11 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Perry Cooper, Shari Cooper. (et)
April 15, 2021 Filing 10 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Stella Matavousian. (et)
April 15, 2021 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Eddie Baharians. (et)
April 15, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
April 15, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (et)
April 15, 2021 Filing 6 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff JAMES SHAYLER, an individual,. (Manning, Joseph)
April 15, 2021 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff JAMES SHAYLER, an individual,. (Manning, Joseph)
April 15, 2021 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff JAMES SHAYLER, an individual,. (Manning, Joseph)
April 15, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff JAMES SHAYLER, an individual,. (Manning, Joseph)
April 15, 2021 Filing 2 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff JAMES SHAYLER, an individual,, (Manning, Joseph)
April 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31121152 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff JAMES SHAYLER, an individual,. (Attorney Joseph Richard Manning, Jr added to party JAMES SHAYLER, an individual, (pty:pla))(Manning, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: James Shayler v. Eddie Baharians et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perry Cooper
Represented By: Coby R Halavais
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eddie Baharians
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stella Matavousian
Represented By: Coby R Halavais
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shari Cooper
Represented By: Coby R Halavais
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Shayler
Represented By: Joseph Richard Manning, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?