Henry Canani v. Ford Motor Company et al
Plaintiff: Henry Canani
Defendant: Ford Motor Company and Does 1 through 50, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2021cv03346
Filed: April 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Stanley Blumenfeld
Referring Judge: Jacqueline Chooljian
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2021 Filing 19 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: The parties are advised that the Court has updated its standing orders effective June 15, 2021 (i.e., Standing Order for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr., Mandatory Scheduling Conference (MSC) Order, Order Re: Motions for Summary Judgment, Pretrial and Trial Order). These orders apply to all pending cases, except as follows: (1) the updated Order Re: Motions for Summary Judgment (MSJ) does not apply to any MSJ filed on or before July 27, 2021; and (2) the updated Pretrial and Trial Order does not apply to any case with a pretrial conference set on or before July 22, 2021. The parties are directed to read and comply with all these standing orders except as noted in the prior sentence. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrey) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 27, 2021 Filing 18 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. The Court strikes the MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by Plaintiff Henry Canani., Dkt. No. 14, without prejudice to refiling in compliance with the Notice of Deficiencies, see Dkt. No. 16. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vcr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PRETRIAL AND TRIAL ORDER by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. (vcr)
May 24, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #14 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed order not submitted pursuant to Local Rule 52-4.1. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk)
May 21, 2021 Filing 16 MINUTES OF VTC Scheduling Conference held before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: The DOE defendants remaining after 8/2/2021 are dismissed by operation of this Order and without further notice. The Court has reviewed the Joint Rule 26(f) report #13 and sets the pretrial and trial dates noted in this order. Jury Trial set for 12/13/2021 08:30 AM before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr. Final Pretrial Conference and Hearing on Motions in Limine set for 12/3/2021 11:00 AM before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr. Motion to Amend Pleadings/Add Parties (Hearing Deadline) 8/2/2021. Non-Expert Discovery cut-off 10/1/2021. Discovery Motion Hearing Deadline 10/8/2021. Non-Discovery Motion Hearing Deadline 10/8/2021. Settlement Conference Deadline 10/22/2021. Post-Settlement Status Conference set for 11/5/2021 08:30 AM before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr. Status Report Due 11/2/2021. Trial Filings (First Set) Deadline 11/12/2021. Trial Filings (Second Set) Deadline 11/19/2021. See document for further details. Court Reporter: Mariam Baird. (gk)
May 19, 2021 Filing 14 [DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER SCHEDULING NOTICE TEXT ENTRY ON 5/27/2021, SEE DOCKET NO. 18] NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by Plaintiff Henry Canani. Motion set for hearing on 6/18/2021 at 08:30 AM before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum of Points and Authorities ISO Motion to Remand) (Crandall, Sean) Modified on 5/28/2021 (gk).
May 14, 2021 Filing 13 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5-7 Days, filed by Plaintiff Henry Canani.. (Crandall, Sean)
May 14, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Henry Canani, identifying Ford Motor Company; Consumer Law Experts, P.C.; Sanders Roberts LLP. (Crandall, Sean)
May 14, 2021 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Sean William Crandall counsel for Plaintiff Henry Canani. Adding Sean Crandall as counsel of record for Plaintiff for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Henry Canani. (Crandall, Sean)
May 14, 2021 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Carey B Wood counsel for Plaintiff Henry Canani. Adding Carey B. Wood as counsel of record for Plaintiff for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Henry Canani. (Attorney Carey B Wood added to party Henry Canani(pty:pla))(Wood, Carey)
April 26, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company.(Sanders, Justin)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. The Court sets a Scheduling Conference set for 5/21/2021 at 08:30 AM before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr. The parties shall file a joint Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/14/2021. (vcr)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CIVIL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. (vcr)
April 21, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company, (Sanders, Justin)
April 21, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachment 1 Notice of Interested Parties should be e-filed separately. The correct event is located under Civil Events Other Filings Notices.. (car)
April 21, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
April 21, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (car)
April 19, 2021 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 50, inclusive, Ford Motor Company. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Henry Canani. Filed in State Court on 3/17/2021 Submitted with Attachment 2 to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
April 19, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Interest Parties)(Sanders, Justin)
April 19, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 21STCV10394 Receipt No: ACACDC-31142043 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Alexandra Lototsky, #2 Complaint in State Court) (Attorney Justin H Sanders added to party Ford Motor Company(pty:dft))(Sanders, Justin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henry Canani v. Ford Motor Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Canani
Represented By: Sean William Crandall
Represented By: Carey B Wood
Represented By: Benjeman R Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Justin H Sanders
Represented By: Alexandra Lototsky
Represented By: Sabrina Celia Narain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 50, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?