Carolyn Cook v. Gabriel Alan Fore
Plaintiff: Carolyn Cook
Defendant: Gabriel Alan Fore
Case Number: 2:2021cv03365
Filed: April 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale S Fischer
Referring Judge: Alka Sagar
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (rfi)
May 25, 2021 Filing 7 FINANCIAL ENTRY: Received $402.00 from Carolyn Cook. Re: Complaint - (Discovery), #1 . Receipt number LA222834. (fr)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER RE REQUEST TO PROCEEDIN FORMA PAUPERIS #3 by Judge Dale S. Fischer. See order for specifics. (lom)
April 20, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
April 20, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (car)
April 15, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Carolyn Cook. (car)
April 15, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Carolyn Cook (car)
April 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Defendant Gabriel Alan Fore. Case assigned to Judge Dale S. Fischer for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Carolyn Cook. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (car)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carolyn Cook v. Gabriel Alan Fore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gabriel Alan Fore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?