Shon Oliventa Williams v. L Bird
Petitioner: Shon Oliventa Williams
Respondent: L Bird
Case Number: 2:2021cv03375
Filed: April 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Paul L Abrams
Referring Judge: Michael W Fitzgerald
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by petitioner Shon Oliventa Williams. This action is dismissed by the petitioner in its entirety. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (ch) Modified on 5/19/2021 (ch).
April 29, 2021 Filing 9 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Petitioner Shon Oliventa Williams. (es)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL OF HABEAS PETITION by Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. No later than May 24, 2021, petitioner must submit to the Court a response making clear his arguments, if any, as to why the 3375 Petition should not be dismissed as not cognizable. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (Attachments: #1 blank Notice of Dismissal) (ch)
April 22, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and referred to Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (Attachments: #1 CV-38 Letter Re Habeas Corpus Transfer In) (car)
April 22, 2021 Filing 6 ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from California Eastern
April 19, 2021 SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Order, Case Transferred Out to Another District served on Shon Oliventa Williams. (Yin, K) [Transferred from California Eastern on 4/22/2021.]
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 4/17/2021, TRANSFERRING this matter to the USDC for the Central District of California. CASE CLOSED. (Yin, K) [Transferred from California Eastern on 4/22/2021.]
April 15, 2021 SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Shon Oliventa Williams. (Henshaw, R) [Transferred from California Eastern on 4/22/2021.]
April 14, 2021 Filing 4 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 5/17/2021 (Attachments: #1 Litigant Letter) (Mena-Sanchez, L) [Transferred from California Eastern on 4/22/2021.]
April 13, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for APPOINTMENT of COUNSEL by Shon Oliventa Williams. (Mena-Sanchez, L) [Transferred from California Eastern on 4/22/2021.] Modified on 4/22/2021 (car).
April 13, 2021 Filing 2 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Shon Oliventa Williams. (Mena-Sanchez, L) [Transferred from California Eastern on 4/22/2021.]
April 13, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against L Bird by Shon Oliventa Williams.(Mena-Sanchez, L) [Transferred from California Eastern on 4/22/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shon Oliventa Williams v. L Bird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: L Bird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Shon Oliventa Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?