Lawrence Reichelt v. The City of Los Angeles et al
Plaintiff: Lawrence Reichelt
Defendant: The City of Los Angeles and Does 1 through 10
Case Number: 2:2021cv03389
Filed: April 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John E McDermott
Referring Judge: Fernando M Olguin
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER ON STIPULATION #12 EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Defendant CITY OF LOS ANGELES shall have until Monday, July 26, 2021, to serve and file a response to Plaintiff LAWRENCE REICHELT's initial Complaint. (iv)
May 27, 2021 Filing 12 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 07/26/2021 re Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less), #11 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Lawrence Reichelt. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cole, Russell)
May 10, 2021 Filing 11 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to The City of Los Angeles answer now due 6/11/2021, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant The City of Los Angeles.(Attorney Kelly P Welch added to party The City of Los Angeles(pty:dft))(Welch, Kelly)
May 7, 2021 Filing 10 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 21-01. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Ronald S.W. Lew to Judge Fernando M. Olguin for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:21-cv-03389 FMO(JEMx). (rn)
April 21, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Miscellaneous Document #3 , Miscellaneous Document #4 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Incorrect event selected in the e-filing of Notice of Interested Parties and Summons. No Further action is required unless the Court so directs. (et)
April 21, 2021 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant The City of Los Angeles. (et)
April 21, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
April 21, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Ronald S. W. Lew and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (et)
April 20, 2021 Filing 4 Summons filed by Plaintiff Lawrence Reichelt re: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 (Cole, Russell)
April 20, 2021 Filing 3 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Lawrence Reichelt re: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 (Cole, Russell)
April 20, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Lawrence Reichelt. (Cole, Russell)
April 20, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31151392 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Lawrence Reichelt. (Attorney Russell James Cole added to party Lawrence Reichelt(pty:pla))(Cole, Russell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lawrence Reichelt v. The City of Los Angeles et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Reichelt
Represented By: Russell James Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of Los Angeles
Represented By: Kelly P Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?