Al Otro Lado, Inc. v. Immigration and Customs Enforcement et al
Plaintiff: Al Otro Lado, Inc.
Defendant: Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Department of Homeland Security, DHS Office for Civil Rights and Civil Liberties and Citizenship & Immigration Services
Case Number: 2:2021cv03462
Filed: April 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Maria A Audero
Referring Judge: Christina A Snyder
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2021 Filing 30 30 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Citizenship & Immigration Services, Department of Homeland Security, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, DHS Office for Civil Rights and Civil Liberties. (shb)
June 4, 2021 Filing 29 30 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Citizenship & Immigration Services. (shb)
June 4, 2021 Filing 28 30 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Department of Homeland Security. (shb)
June 4, 2021 Filing 27 30 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant DHS Office for Civil Rights and Civil Liberties. (shb)
June 4, 2021 Filing 26 30 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (shb)
June 4, 2021 Filing 25 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Summons Issued, #22 : The summons was issued for 60 days instead of 30 days and will be re-issued 6/4/2021. (shb)
June 4, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Summons Request #21 : The summons was issued for 60 days instead of 30 days and will be re-issued 6/4/2021. (shb)
June 4, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Summons Issued #20 , Summons Issued #19 , Summons Issued #18 , Summons Issued #16 , Summons Issued #17 . The summons were issued for 60 days instead of 30 days and will be re-issued 6/4/2021. (shb)
June 1, 2021 Filing 22 [REFER TO NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR, G-11, #25 - 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Attorney General of the United States, US Department of Justice. (shb) Modified on 6/4/2021 (shb).
May 28, 2021 Filing 21 [REFER TO NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR, G-11, #24 - Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Al Otro Lado, Inc.. (Jong, Jeremy) Modified on 6/4/2021 (shb).
May 20, 2021 Filing 20 [REFER TO NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR, G-11, #23 - 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to United States Attorney Department of Homeland Security. (shb) Modified on 6/4/2021 (shb).
May 20, 2021 Filing 19 [REFER TO NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR, G-11, #23 - 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (shb) Modified on 6/4/2021 (shb).
May 20, 2021 Filing 18 [REFER TO NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR, G-11, #23 - 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant DHS Office for Civil Rights and Civil Liberties. (shb) Modified on 6/4/2021 (shb).
May 20, 2021 Filing 17 [REFER TO NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR, G-11, #23 - 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Department of Homeland Security. (shb) Modified on 6/4/2021 (shb).
May 20, 2021 Filing 16 [REFER TO NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR, G-11, #23 - 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Citizenship & Immigration Services. (shb) Modified on 6/4/2021 (shb).
May 19, 2021 Filing 15 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Al Otro Lado, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 DHS CRCL Summons, #2 DHS Summons, #3 USCIS Summons, #4 USA Summons)(Novis, Sasha)
May 19, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE TO COUNSEL upon filing of the complaint by Judge Christina A. Snyder. (rba)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Judge Christina A. Snyder: GRANTING #12 Non-Resident Attorney Jeremy J. Jong APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Al Otro Lado, Inc., designating Sasha R. Novis as local counsel. (shb)
May 11, 2021 Filing 12 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jeremy J. Jong to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Al Otro Lado, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31278038) filed by Plaintiff Al Otro Lado, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Novis, Sasha)
April 29, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Summons Request, #10 . The following error(s) was/were found: The Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties should be filed as a separate document The summons should have the date of issuance blank for the Clerk to fill in Other error(s) with document(s): If all parties are not on one summons, please issue the additional summons separate and not scanned together as one document. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (shb)
April 28, 2021 Filing 10 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 filed by Plaintiff Al Otro Lado, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Additional Summonses)(Novis, Sasha)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 21-01 (Related Case) filed. Transfer of case DECLINED by Judge Otis D. Wright, II, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. 2:20-cv-03512 ODW (JPRx) (aco)
April 27, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Jeremy Jong. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (jtil)
April 27, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons. The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (jtil)
April 26, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
April 26, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (jtil)
April 22, 2021 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 filed by Plaintiff Al Otro Lado, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Additional Summonses)(Novis, Sasha)
April 22, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Al Otro Lado, Inc., identifying Henrika Missick de Lopez; Tera Caudill; Henry Tanyike; Acheleke Fuanya. (Novis, Sasha)
April 22, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Al Otro Lado, Inc.. (Novis, Sasha)
April 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31168801 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Al Otro Lado, Inc.. (Attorney Sasha R. Novis added to party Al Otro Lado, Inc.(pty:pla))(Novis, Sasha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Al Otro Lado, Inc. v. Immigration and Customs Enforcement et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DHS Office for Civil Rights and Civil Liberties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citizenship & Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Al Otro Lado, Inc.
Represented By: Sasha R. Novis
Represented By: Jeremy J. Jong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?